Date Filed | Doc # | Docket Text |
|
2018-08-08 | 1 | Complaint for Disclosure of Information Pursuant to Freedom of Information Act against United States Department of Air Force filed by Axe Murder Tours Guam, Inc. (Attachments: # 1 Cover Sheet)(Cook, Jeffrey) **Modified on 8/8/2018 to correct event type and edit docket text** (fad, ). (Entered: 08/08/2018) |
2018-08-08 | 2 | Notice of Availability of Magistrate Judge (fad, ) (Entered: 08/08/2018) |
2018-08-08 | 3 | Clerk's Notice of Deficiency: FRCP Rule 7.1. Disclosure Statement Due. (fad, ) (Entered: 08/08/2018) |
2018-08-08 | | Filing fee: $ 400, receipt number GUX014600 re 1 Cover Sheet,, Counterclaim, (fad, ) (Entered: 08/23/2018) |
2018-08-08 | | Summons Issued as to United States Department of Air Force. (fad, ) (Entered: 08/23/2018) |
2018-08-09 | 4 | First Corporate Disclosure filed by Axe Murderer Tours Guam, Inc. FRCP Rule 7.1 . (Cook, Jeffrey) (Entered: 08/09/2018) |
2018-08-28 | 5 | Unopposed Motion for Extension of Time to File Answer re 1 Cover Sheet,, Counterclaim, filed by United States Department of Air Force. (Wessling, Jessica) (Entered: 08/28/2018) |
2018-09-28 | 6 | Order granting 5 Motion for Extension of Time to Answer United States Department of Air Force answer due 10/9/2018.. Signed by Magistrate Judge Joaquin V.E. Manibusan, Jr on 9/28/2018. (fad, ) (Entered: 09/28/2018) |
2018-10-03 | 7 | Scheduling Notice. Scheduling and Planning Conference Report due by 11/6/2018. Scheduling Conference set for 11/20/2018 at 10:00 AM in 3rd Floor Courtroom before Magistrate Judge Joaquin V.E. Manibusan Jr.. (fad, ) (Entered: 10/03/2018) |
2018-10-09 | 8 | Unopposed Motion for Extension of Time to File Answer re 1 Cover Sheet,, Counterclaim, 6 Order on Motion for Extension of Time to Answer filed by United States Department of Air Force. (Wessling, Jessica) (Entered: 10/09/2018) |
2018-10-11 | 9 | Order granting 8 Motion for Extension of Time to Answer United States Department of Air Force answer due 10/16/2018.. Signed by Magistrate Judge Joaquin V.E. Manibusan, Jr on 10/11/2018. (fad, ) (Entered: 10/11/2018) |
2018-10-16 | 10 | ANSWER to Complaint by United States Department of Air Force.(Wessling, Jessica) (Entered: 10/16/2018) |
2018-10-18 | 11 | Notice of Availability of Settlement Judge. Senior Judge Munson has offered to oversee settlement conferences during the week of November 5, 2018 on Guam. If interested, please notify the court by filing a Stipulated Request for Settlement Conference by 3:00 p.m. Monday, October 22, 2018.(fad, ) (Entered: 10/18/2018) |
2018-11-06 | 12 | Scheduling and Planning Report . (Wessling, Jessica) (Entered: 11/06/2018) |
2018-11-06 | 13 | Erratum filed by United States Department of Air Force re 12 Scheduling and Planning Report (Wessling, Jessica) (Entered: 11/06/2018) |
2018-11-20 | 14 | Minute Entry for proceedings held before Magistrate Judge Joaquin V.E. Manibusan, Jr.: Scheduling Conference held on 11/20/2018. Trial set for 8/19/2019 at 9:30 AM. Court to issue order. (Court Recorder Walter Tenorio.)(Start Time: 10:03, End Time: 10:07.) (vtk) (Entered: 11/20/2018) |
2018-12-13 | 15 | Scheduling and Planning Order. Motions to Add Parties and Claims due by 12/11/2018. Amended Pleadings due by 12/21/2018. Discovery Motions due by 4/9/2019. Discovery cut-off 4/2/2019. Dispositive Motions due by 5/14/2019. First Preliminary P/T Conference set for 3/1/2019 at 10:00 AM; Second Preliminary P/T Conference set for 5/17/2019 at 10:00 AM and Third Preliminary P/T Conference set for 7/30/2019 at 10:00 AM all in 3rd Floor Courtroom before Magistrate Judge Joaquin V.E. Manibusan, Jr. Trial Briefs due by 7/19/2019. P/T Documents and Proposed P/T Order due by 8/5/2019. Designations and Exhibit List due by 8/5/2019. Witness List due by 8/5/2019. Final Pretrial Conference set for 8/12/2019 at 09:30 AM in 4th Floor Courtroom before Chief Judge Frances M. Tydingco-Gatewood. Bench Trial set for 8/19/2019 at 09:30 AM in 4th Floor Courtroom before Chief Judge Frances M. Tydingco-Gatewood. Signed by Magistrate Judge Joaquin V.E. Manibusan, Jr. on 12/13/2018. (vtk) (Entered: 12/14/2018) |
2019-01-16 | 16 | Unopposed Motion to Stay Case filed by United States Department of Air Force. (Wessling, Jessica) (Entered: 01/16/2019) |
2019-01-16 | 17 | Order granting 16 Unopposed Motion to Stay Case. Counsel for the United States of America shall notify the court as soon as Congress has appropriated funds for the Department of Justice. Signed by Magistrate Judge Joaquin V.E. Manibusan, Jr on 1/16/2019. (fad, ) (Entered: 01/16/2019) |
2019-01-16 | | Case Stayed (fad, ) (Entered: 01/16/2019) |
2019-01-29 | 18 | Notice filed by United States Department of Air Force re 17 Order on Motion to Stay, Case Stayed Notice that Congress has Appropriated Funds for the Department of Justice (Wessling, Jessica) (Entered: 01/29/2019) |
2019-01-30 | 19 | Order Lifting Stay. All discovery and motion filing deadlines shall be extended by 35 calendar days, commensurate with the duration of the lapse in appropriations. Signed by Magistrate Judge Joaquin V.E. Manibusan, Jr on 1/30/2019. (fad, ) (Entered: 01/30/2019) |
2019-02-11 | 20 | Stipulation to Continue Hearing filed by Axe Murderer Tours Guam, Inc.. (Cook, Jeffrey) (Entered: 02/11/2019) |
2019-02-13 | 22 | Minute Entry for proceedings held before Chief Judge Frances M. Tydingco-Gatewood: Telephone Conference held on 2/13/2019. Parties to email clerk with status of possible settlement conference with Judge Munson by 2/22/2019. (Court Reporter Veronica Flores.)(Start Time: 3:59, End Time: 4:05.) (fad, ) (Entered: 02/15/2019) |
2019-02-14 | 21 | Order granting 20 Stipulation to Continue. First Preliminary P/T Conference set for 3/1/2019 continued to 3/14/2019 at 09:30 AM in 3rd Floor Courtroom before Magistrate Judge Joaquin V.E. Manibusan, Jr. Signed by Magistrate Judge Joaquin V.E. Manibusan, Jr. on 2/14/2019. (vtk) (Entered: 02/14/2019) |
2019-03-14 | 23 | Minute Entry for proceedings held before Magistrate Judge Joaquin V.E. Manibusan, Jr: First Preliminary Pretrial Conference held on 3/14/2019. Discovery cut-off 5/7/2019. Discovery motions due by 5/14/2019. Dispositive Motions due by 6/18/2019. (Court Recorder Walter Tenorio. )(Start Time: 9:30, End Time: 9:37.) (fad, ) (Entered: 03/14/2019) |
2019-05-07 | 24 | Notice of Hearing: Second Preliminary Pretrial Conference set for 5/17/2019 rescheduled to 5/23/2019 at 11:00 AM in 3rd Floor Courtroom before Magistrate Judge Joaquin V.E. Manibusan Jr.. (fad, ) (Entered: 05/07/2019) |
2019-05-23 | 25 | Minute Entry for proceedings held before Magistrate Judge Joaquin V.E. Manibusan, Jr.: Second Preliminary Pretrial Conference held on 5/23/2019. Parties to submit a stipulation with new dates. (Court Recorder Walter Tenorio. )(Start Time: 11:17, End Time: 11:23.) (vtk) (Entered: 05/24/2019) |
2019-05-24 | 26 | Stipulation to Amend re 15 Scheduling and Planning Order by United States Department of Air Force. (Wessling, Jessica) (Entered: 05/24/2019) |
2019-06-10 | 27 | Order granting 26 Stipulation to Amend Scheduling and Planning Order. Dispositive Motions due by 8/14/2019. Trial Brief and Pretrial Disclosures due by 9/13/2019. Third Preliminary P/T Conference set for 9/20/2019 at 9:00 AM all in 3rd Floor Courtroom before Magistrate Judge Joaquin V.E. Manibusan, Jr. Designations and Exhibit List due by 10/1/2019. Witness List due by 10/1/2019. Final Pretrial Conference set for 10/8/2019 at 09:30 AM in 4th Floor Courtroom before Chief Judge Frances M. Tydingco-Gatewood. Bench Trial set for 10/15/2019 at 09:30 AM in 4th Floor Courtroom before Chief Judge Frances M. Tydingco-Gatewood. A separate order scheduling settlement conference will be issued. Signed by Magistrate Judge Joaquin V.E. Manibusan, Jr. on 6/10/2019. (vtk) **Modified on 6/10/2019 to add Third PTC date** (vtk) (Entered: 06/10/2019) |
2019-08-07 | 28 | Stipulation to Amend the Amended Scheduling and Planning Order re 27 Order on Motion for Extension of Time to File,,, by United States Department of Air Force. (Wessling, Jessica) (Entered: 08/07/2019) |
2019-08-21 | 29 | Second Amended Scheduling and Planning Order. Dispositive Motions due by 9/30/2019. Third Preliminary P/T Conference set for 11/21/2019 at 11:00 AM in 3rd Floor Courtroom before Magistrate Judge Joaquin V.E. Manibusan Jr.. Trial Briefs due by 11/15/2019. P/T Documents, Proposed P/T Order, Discovery Material Designations, Exhibit Lists, Exhibit Binders and Witness List due by 12/3/2019. Objections due two business days prior to Final Pretrial Conference. Final Pretrial Conference set for 12/10/2019 09:30 AM in 4th Floor Courtroom before Chief Judge Frances M. Tydingco-Gatewood. Bench Trial set for 12/17/2019 09:30 AM in 4th Floor Courtroom before Chief Judge Frances M. Tydingco-Gatewood. Signed by Magistrate Judge Joaquin V.E. Manibusan, Jr on 8/21/2019. (fad, ) (Entered: 08/21/2019) |
2019-09-27 | 30 | Stipulation re 29 Scheduling and Planning Order,,, to Amend the Second Amended Scheduling and Planning Order filed by All Defendants. (Wessling, Jessica) (Entered: 09/27/2019) |
2019-10-03 | 31 | Third Amended Scheduling and Planning Order and Order Granting in Part 30 Stipulation to Amend the Second Amended Scheduling and Planning Order . Trial Briefs due by 3/9/2020. P/T Disclosures due by 3/9/2020. Third Preliminary P/T Conference set for 3/18/2020 at 10:15 AM in 3rd Floor Courtroom before Magistrate Judge Joaquin V.E. Manibusan, Jr. Designations and Exhibit List due by 3/25/2020. Witness List due by 3/25/2020. Final Pretrial Conference set for 4/1/2020 at 09:30 AM in 4th Floor Courtroom before Chief Judge Frances M. Tydingco-Gatewood. Bench Trial set for 4/8/2020 at 09:30 AM in 4th Floor Courtroom before Chief Judge Frances M. Tydingco-Gatewood. Signed by Magistrate Judge Joaquin V.E. Manibusan, Jr. on 10/3/2019. (vtk) (Entered: 10/03/2019) |
2020-01-31 | 32 | Stipulation for Fourth Amended Scheduling and Planning Order re 31 Order,,,, Scheduling and Planning Order,,, by United States Department of Air Force. (Wessling, Jessica) (Entered: 01/31/2020) |
2020-02-19 | 33 | Order granting 32 Stipulated Motion for Fourth Amended Scheduling and Planning Order. Dispositive Motions due by 6/1/2020. Third Preliminary P/T Conference set for 8/13/2020 at 10:45 AM in 3rd Floor Courtroom before US Magistrate Judge Michael J. Bordallo. Trial Briefs due by 8/7/2020. Pretrial Disclosures due by 8/7/2020. P/T Documents and Joint Proposed P/T Order due by 8/25/2020. Designations and Exhibit List due by 8/25/2020. Witness List due by 8/25/2020. Final Pretrial Conference set for 9/1/2020 at 09:30 AM in 4th Floor Courtroom before Chief Judge Frances M. Tydingco-Gatewood. Bench Trial set for 9/8/2020 at 09:30 AM in 4th Floor Courtroom before Chief Judge Frances M. Tydingco-Gatewood. Signed by US Magistrate Judge Michael J. Bordallo on 2/19/2020. (vtk) (Entered: 02/20/2020) |
2020-06-02 | 34 | Stipulation for Fifth Amended Scheduling and Planning Order re 33 Scheduling and Planning Order,,,,,,, by United States Department of Air Force. (Wessling, Jessica) (Entered: 06/02/2020) |
2020-07-20 | 35 | Order granting 34 Stipulation for Fifth Amended Scheduling and Planning Order. Signed by US Magistrate Judge Michael J. Bordallo on 7/20/2020. (fad, ) (Entered: 07/20/2020) |
2020-07-20 | | Set Deadlines/Hearings: Dispositive Motions due by 7/31/2020. Third Preliminary P/T Conference set for 10/5/2020 at 09:00 AM in 3rd Floor Courtroom before US Magistrate Judge Michael J. Bordallo. Trial Briefs due by 9/28/2020. Exhibit List due by 10/14/2020. Pretrial disclosures due 9/28/2020. Proposed P/T Order due by 10/14/2020. Witness List due by 10/14/2020. Final Pretrial Conference set for 10/21/2020 09:30 AM in 4th Floor Courtroom before Chief Judge Frances M. Tydingco-Gatewood. Bench Trial set for 10/28/2020 09:30 AM in 4th Floor Courtroom before Chief Judge Frances M. Tydingco-Gatewood. (fad, ) (Entered: 07/20/2020) |
2020-08-05 | 36 | Notice of Settlement Joint filed by United States Department of Air Force (Wessling, Jessica) (Entered: 08/05/2020) |
2020-10-02 | 37 | Order. The court vacates the trial, hearings and deadlines set forth in the Fifth Amended Scheduling and Planning Order. Status Conference set for 12/10/2020 10:00 AM in 3rd floor courtroom VTC before US Magistrate Judge Michael J. Bordallo unless the case is dismissed prior to said date. Signed by US Magistrate Judge Michael J. Bordallo on 10/2/2020. (fad, ) (Entered: 10/02/2020) |
2020-10-05 | 38 | Stipulation of Dismissal with Prejudice filed by Axe Murderer Tours Guam, Inc.. (Cook, Jeffrey) (Entered: 10/05/2020) |
Hide Docket Events |