Skip to content

Case Detail

[Subscribe to updates]
Case TitleStevens v. Broadcasting Board of Governors et al
DistrictNorthern District of Illinois
CityChicago
Case Number1:2018cv05391
Date Filed2018-08-08
Date ClosedOpen
JudgeHonorable Andrea R. Wood
PlaintiffJacqueline Stevens
Case DescriptionJacqueline Stevens, a professor of political science at Northwestern University, submitted FOIA requests to the Broadcast Board of Governors and a number of other agencies pertaining to policies for detainees. The Broadcast Board of Governors disclosed 109 pages to Stevens. Stevens filed an administrative appeal. The agency ordered a second search, yielding 1,427 pages that were released to Stevens. The agency also withheld 1,062 pages under Exemption 4 (confidential business information) and 133 pages under Exemption 5 (privileges). Other agencies disclosed some records as well or failed to respond by the time Stevens filed suit.
Complaint issues: Failure to respond within statutory time limit, Litigation - Attorney's fees

DefendantBroadcasting Board of Governors
DefendantUnited States Department of Commerce, Bureau of Industry and Security
DefendantDepartment of the Interior, Geological Survey
DefendantDepartment of Health and Human Services, Administration of Children and Families
DefendantDepartment of Justice, Federal Bureau of Investigations
DefendantDepartment of Homeland Security, Immigration and Customs and Enforcement
DefendantDepartment of State
DefendantUnited States Administration for International Development
DefendantDHS, Customs and Border Protection
DefendantOffice of Justice Programs
DefendantCitizenship and Immigration Services
Documents
Docket
Complaint
User-contributed Documents
 
Docket Events (Hide)
Date FiledDoc #Docket Text

2018-08-081COMPLAINT filed by Jacqueline Stevens; no. (eaa, ) (Entered: 08/09/2018)
2018-08-082CIVIL Cover Sheet. (eaa, ) (Entered: 08/09/2018)
2018-08-083PRO SE Appearance by Plaintiff Jacqueline Stevens. (eaa, ) (Entered: 08/09/2018)
2018-08-085SUMMONS Issued as to Broadcasting Board of Governors, Citizenship and Immigration Services, DHS, Customs and Border Protection, Department of Health and Human Services, Administration of Children and Families, Department of Homeland Security, Immigration and Customs and Enforcement, Department of Justice, Federal Bureau of Investigations, Department of State, Department of the Interior, Geological Survey, Office of Justice Programs, United States Administration for International Development, United States Department of Commerce, Bureau of Industry and Security, U.S. Attorney, and U.S. Attorney General. (eaa, ) (Entered: 08/09/2018)
2018-08-096NOTICE TO THE PARTIES - The Court is participating in the Mandatory Initial Discovery Pilot (MIDP). The key features and deadlines are set forth in this Notice which includes a link to the (MIDP) Standing Order and a Checklist for use by the parties. In cases subject to the pilot, all parties must respond to the mandatory initial discovery requests set forth in the Standing Order before initiating any further discovery in this case. Please note: The discovery obligations in the Standing Order supersede the disclosures required by Rule 26(a)(1). Any party seeking affirmative relief must serve a copy of the following documents (Notice of Mandatory Initial Discovery and the Standing Order) on each new party when the Complaint, Counterclaim, Crossclaim, or Third-Party Complaint is served. (eaa, ) (Entered: 08/09/2018)
2018-08-177MINUTE entry before the Honorable Andrea R. Wood: Initial status hearing set for 10/10/2018 at 9:00 AM. The parties are directed to meet and conduct a planning conference pursuant to Federal Rule of Civil Procedure 26(f). At least seven days before the initial status hearing, the parties shall file a joint written status report, not to exceed five pages in length. The initial status report shall provide the information described on the Court's website at www.ilnd.uscourts.gov under District Judges, Judge Andrea R. Wood, Initial Status Conference. Mailed notice (ef, ) (Entered: 08/17/2018)
2018-09-068MOTION by Defendants Broadcasting Board of Governors, Citizenship and Immigration Services, DHS, Customs and Border Protection, Department of Health and Human Services, Administration of Children and Families, Department of Homeland Security, Immigration and Customs and Enforcement, Department of Justice, Federal Bureau of Investigations, Department of State, Department of the Interior, Geological Survey, Office of Justice Programs, United States Administration for International Development, United States Department of Commerce, Bureau of Industry and Security for extension of time to respond to complaint (Unopposed) (Kolluri, Prashant) (Entered: 09/06/2018)
2018-09-069NOTICE of Motion by Prashant Kolluri for presentment of extension of time,, 8 before Honorable Andrea R. Wood on 9/13/2018 at 09:00 AM. (Kolluri, Prashant) (Entered: 09/06/2018)
2018-09-0610DESIGNATION of Prashant Kolluri as U.S. Attorney for Defendants Broadcasting Board of Governors, Citizenship and Immigration Services, DHS, Customs and Border Protection, Department of Health and Human Services, Administration of Children and Families, Department of Homeland Security, Immigration and Customs and Enforcement, Department of Justice, Federal Bureau of Investigations, Department of State, Department of the Interior, Geological Survey, Office of Justice Programs, United States Administration for International Development, United States Department of Commerce, Bureau of Industry and Security (Kolluri, Prashant) (Entered: 09/06/2018)
2018-09-0711MINUTE entry before the Honorable Andrea R. Wood: Defendants' Motion for extension of time to answer 8 is granted. Defendants shall answer or otherwise plead by 10/5/2018. The motion presentment date of 9/13/2018 is stricken; parties need not appear. Mailed notice (ef, ) (Entered: 09/07/2018)
Hide Docket Events
by FOIA Project Staff
Skip to toolbar