Skip to content

Case Detail

[Subscribe to updates]
Case TitleKWON v. U.S. DEPARTMENT OF STATE
DistrictDistrict of Columbia
CityWashington, DC
Case Number1:2018cv01875
Date Filed2018-08-09
Date ClosedOpen
JudgeJudge Rudolph Contreras
PlaintiffJU LEE KWON
Case DescriptionJu Lee Kwon submitted a FOIA request to the Department of State for records concerning herself. The agency acknowledged receipt of the request, but after hearing nothing further from the agency, Kwon filed suit.
Complaint issues: Failure to respond within statutory time limit, Litigation - Discovery, Litigation - Vaughn index, Litigation - Attorney's fees

DefendantU.S. DEPARTMENT OF STATE
Documents
Docket
Complaint
Complaint attachment 1
Complaint attachment 2
Complaint attachment 3
Complaint attachment 4
User-contributed Documents
 
Docket Events (Hide)
Date FiledDoc #Docket Text

2018-08-091COMPLAINT against U.S. DEPARTMENT OF STATE ( Filing fee $ 400 receipt number 0090-5630548) filed by JU LEE KWON. (Attachments: # 1 Civil Cover Sheet, # 2 Summons U.S. Attorney for D.C., # 3 Summons U.S. Attorney General, # 4 Summons U.S. Department of State)(Wright, Jason) (Entered: 08/09/2018)
2018-08-092NOTICE OF RELATED CASE by JU LEE KWON. Case related to Case No. 18-1873. (Wright, Jason) (Entered: 08/09/2018)
2018-08-093MOTION for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice :Attorney Name- Asa Hutchinson, III, :Firm- The Asa Hutchinson Law Group, PLC, :Address- 912 W. Central Avenue. Phone No. - 479-878-1600. Fax No. - 479-878-1600 Filing fee $ 100, receipt number 0090-5630637. Fee Status: Fee Paid. by JU LEE KWON (Wright, Jason) (Entered: 08/09/2018)
2018-08-09Case Assigned to Judge Rudolph Contreras. (zsb) (Entered: 08/09/2018)
2018-08-104SUMMONS (3) Issued Electronically as to U.S. DEPARTMENT OF STATE, U.S. Attorney and U.S. Attorney General (Attachment: # 1 Notice and Consent)(zsb) (Entered: 08/10/2018)
2018-09-185Consent MOTION for Extension of Time to File Defendant's Answer or Other Response to Plaintiff's Complaint by U.S. DEPARTMENT OF STATE (Adebonojo, Kenneth) (Entered: 09/18/2018)
2018-09-19MINUTE ORDER granting 5 Defendant's Consent Motion for Extension of Time: It is hereby ORDERED that Defendant shall respond to the complaint on or before October 19, 2018. SO ORDERED. Signed by Judge Rudolph Contreras on September 19, 2018. (lcrc3) (Entered: 09/19/2018)
2018-09-19MINUTE ORDER denying 3 Motion for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice: Pursuant to Local Civil Rule 83.2(d), an attorney seeking to appear pro hac vice before this Court must file a motion signed by a sponsoring member of the Bar of this Court, accompanied by a declaration by the non-member attorney setting forth the information required by the Rule. The pro hac motion at issue here does not comply with Local Rule 83.2(d) because, while the motion appears to contain the information required by that Rule, the information is not set forth in a declaration by the non-member attorney. SO ORDERED. Signed by Judge Rudolph Contreras on September 19, 2018. (lcrc3) (Entered: 09/19/2018)
2018-09-19Set/Reset Deadlines: Answer due by 10/19/2018, (tj) (Entered: 09/19/2018)
2018-10-196ANSWER to Complaint by U.S. DEPARTMENT OF STATE.(Adebonojo, Kenneth) (Entered: 10/19/2018)
2018-10-22MINUTE ORDER: It is hereby ORDERED that the parties shall meet, confer, and submit a proposed briefing schedule on or before November 5, 2018. SO ORDERED. Signed by Judge Rudolph Contreras on 10/22/18. (lcrc1) (Entered: 10/22/2018)
2018-11-057Consent MOTION for Extension of Time to File the Parties' Status Report by U.S. DEPARTMENT OF STATE (Adebonojo, Kenneth) (Entered: 11/05/2018)
2018-11-05MINUTE ORDER granting 7 Defendant's Consent Motion for Extension of Time. It is hereby ORDERED that the parties shall file a joint status report on or before December 5, 2018. SO ORDERED. Signed by Judge Rudolph Contreras on November 5, 2018. (lcrc3). Modified on 11/5/2018 (lcrc3) (Entered: 11/05/2018)
2018-11-06Set/Reset Deadlines: Status Report due by 12/5/2018 (tj) (Entered: 11/06/2018)
2018-12-068STATUS REPORT by U.S. DEPARTMENT OF STATE. (Adebonojo, Kenneth) (Entered: 12/06/2018)
2018-12-07MINUTE ORDER: Upon consideration of 8 the parties' joint status report, it is hereby ORDERED that the following schedule shall govern further proceedings: Defendant shall complete production by January 21, 2019; Defendant's Motion for Summary Judgment is due on or before March 22, 2019; Plaintiff's Opposition or Cross-Motion for Summary Judgment is due on or before April 22, 2019; and Defendant's Reply is due on or before May 16, 2019. SO ORDERED. Signed by Judge Rudolph Contreras on December 7, 2018. (lcrc3) (Entered: 12/07/2018)
2018-12-10Set/Reset Deadlines: Summary Judgment motions due by 3/22/2019. Cross Motions due or Response to Motion for Summary Judgment due by 4/22/2019. Reply to Motion for Summary Judgment due by 5/16/2019. (tj) (Entered: 12/10/2018)
Hide Docket Events
by FOIA Project Staff
Skip to toolbar