Skip to content

Case Detail

[Subscribe to updates]
Case TitleDEMOCRACY FORWARD FOUNDATION v. UNITED STATES DEPARTMENT OF THE INTERIOR
DistrictDistrict of Columbia
CityWashington, DC
Case Number1:2018cv01876
Date Filed2018-08-09
Date ClosedOpen
JudgeJudge Emmet G. Sullivan
PlaintiffDEMOCRACY FORWARD FOUNDATION
Case DescriptionDemocracy Forward Foundation submitted a FOIA request to the Department of the Interior for records concerning changes in the way grants are awarded. DFF also requested a fee waiver. The agency acknowledged receipt of the request and told DFF that it would need to take more time to process the request. After hearing nothing further from the agency, DFF filed suit.
Complaint issues: Failure to respond within statutory time limit, Adequacy - Search, Litigation - Vaughn index, Litigation - Attorney's fees

DefendantUNITED STATES DEPARTMENT OF THE INTERIOR
Documents
Docket
Complaint
Complaint attachment 1
Complaint attachment 2
Complaint attachment 3
Complaint attachment 4
Complaint attachment 5
User-contributed Documents
 
Docket Events (Hide)
Date FiledDoc #Docket Text

2018-08-091COMPLAINT against UNITED STATES DEPARTMENT OF THE INTERIOR ( Filing fee $ 400 receipt number 0090-5630664) filed by DEMOCRACY FORWARD FOUNDATION. (Attachments: # 1 Civil Cover Sheet, # 2 Summons, # 3 Summons, # 4 Summons, # 5 Exhibit)(Guzman, Javier) (Attachment 1 replaced on 8/9/2018) (zmd). (Entered: 08/09/2018)
2018-08-09Case Assigned to Judge Emmet G. Sullivan. (zmd) (Entered: 08/09/2018)
2018-08-102STANDING ORDER: The parties are directed to read the attached Standing Order Governing Civil Cases Before Judge Emmet G. Sullivan in its entirety upon receipt. The parties are hereby ORDERED to comply with the directives in the attached Standing Order. Signed by Judge Emmet G. Sullivan on 08/10/18. (Attachment: # 1 Exhibit 1) (mac) (Entered: 08/10/2018)
2018-08-133SUMMONS (3) Issued Electronically as to UNITED STATES DEPARTMENT OF THE INTERIOR, U.S. Attorney and U.S. Attorney General (Attachments: # 1 Notice and Consent) (zmd) (Entered: 08/13/2018)
2018-08-214RETURN OF SERVICE/AFFIDAVIT of Summons and Complaint Executed as to the United States Attorney. Date of Service Upon United States Attorney on 8/20/2018. ( Answer due for ALL FEDERAL DEFENDANTS by 9/19/2018.), RETURN OF SERVICE/AFFIDAVIT of Summons and Complaint Executed. UNITED STATES DEPARTMENT OF THE INTERIOR served on 8/20/2018, RETURN OF SERVICE/AFFIDAVIT of Summons and Complaint Executed on United States Attorney General. Date of Service Upon United States Attorney General 8/20/18. (Attachments: # 1 Declaration)(Guzman, Javier) (Entered: 08/21/2018)
2018-08-305MOTION for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice :Attorney Name- Travis Annatoyn, :Firm- Democracy Forward Foundation, :Address- P.O. Box 34553, Washington, D.C. 20043. Phone No. - 202-448-9090. Fee Status: No Fee Paid. by DEMOCRACY FORWARD FOUNDATION (Attachments: # 1 Declaration, # 2 Text of Proposed Order)(Guzman, Javier) (Entered: 08/30/2018)
2018-09-04MINUTE ORDER granting 5 motion for leave to appear pro hac vice. Attorney Travis Annatoyn is hereby admitted pro hac vice in this matter. Signed by Judge Emmet G. Sullivan on 9/4/2018. (lcegs3) (Entered: 09/04/2018)
2018-09-206NOTICE of Appearance by Joshua L. Rogers on behalf of UNITED STATES DEPARTMENT OF THE INTERIOR (Rogers, Joshua) (Entered: 09/20/2018)
2018-09-207Unopposed MOTION for Extension of Time to File Answer , Nunc Pro Tunc by UNITED STATES DEPARTMENT OF THE INTERIOR (Attachments: # 1 Answer)(Rogers, Joshua) (Entered: 09/20/2018)
2018-09-24MINUTE ORDER granting 7 unopposed motion for extension of time to file answer nunc pro tunc. [7-1] defendant's answer is therefore accepted as timely filed. Signed by Judge Emmet G. Sullivan on 9/24/2018. (lcegs3) (Entered: 09/24/2018)
2018-09-248ANSWER to Complaint (nun pro tunc) by UNITED STATES DEPARTMENT OF THE INTERIOR.(jf) (Entered: 09/24/2018)
2018-10-10MINUTE ORDER. Plaintiff brings this action pursuant to the Freedom of Information Act ("FOIA"), 5 U.S.C. § 552. The parties are directed to meet and confer and propose a joint scheduling order for further proceedings in this case by no later than November 1, 2018. The parties' joint proposed scheduling order shall address the following: (1) The status of plaintiff's FOIA request; (2) The anticipated number of documents responsive to plaintiff's FOIA request; (3) The anticipated date(s) for release of documents responsive to plaintiff's FOIA request; (4) Whether a motion for an Open America stay is likely in this case; (5) Whether a Vaughn index will be required in this case; (6) Whether this case would benefit from referral to a magistrate judge or the District Court Mediation Program for purposes of settlement; and (7) A proposed briefing schedule for dispositive motions, if applicable. If the parties are unable to agree on a joint recommendation, the joint proposed scheduling order shall include each party's individual recommendations. Signed by Judge Emmet G. Sullivan on 10/10/2018. (lcegs3) (Entered: 10/10/2018)
2018-10-10Set/Reset Deadlines: Joint Proposed Scheduling Order due by 11/1/2018. (mac) (Entered: 10/10/2018)
2018-11-019Joint STATUS REPORT by DEMOCRACY FORWARD FOUNDATION. (Annatoyn, Travis) (Entered: 11/01/2018)
2018-11-02MINUTE ORDER. In view of 9 joint status report, the parties are directed to file another status report by no later than December 19, 2018 to update the Court on the status of production and/or whether the case can be resolved without further litigation. Signed by Judge Emmet G. Sullivan on 11/2/2018. (lcegs3) (Entered: 11/02/2018)
2018-11-05Set/Reset Deadlines: Joint Status Report due by 12/19/2018. (mac) (Entered: 11/05/2018)
2018-12-1910NOTICE of Appearance by Brian J. Field on behalf of All Defendants (Field, Brian) (Entered: 12/19/2018)
2018-12-1911Joint STATUS REPORT by UNITED STATES DEPARTMENT OF THE INTERIOR. (Field, Brian) (Entered: 12/19/2018)
2018-12-20MINUTE ORDER in view of 11 joint status report, the parties are directed to file another joint status report by no later than January 21, 2019 to update the Court on the status of the production and whether the case can be resolved without litigation. Signed by Judge Emmet G. Sullivan on 12/20/2018. (lcegs3) (Entered: 12/20/2018)
2018-12-20Set/Reset Deadlines/Hearings: Joint Status Report due by 1/21/2019. (zcdw) (Entered: 12/26/2018)
2019-01-2212MOTION to Stay by UNITED STATES DEPARTMENT OF THE INTERIOR (Attachments: # 1 Text of Proposed Order)(Coles-Huff, Doris) (Entered: 01/22/2019)
2019-01-22MINUTE ORDER denying 12 defendant's motion for stay. The parties are directed to comply with the Court's December 20, 2018 Minute Order by no later than February 1, 2019. Signed by Judge Emmet G. Sullivan on 1/22/2019. (lcegs3) (Entered: 01/22/2019)
2019-01-23Set/Reset Deadlines: Status Report due by 2/1/2019 (mac) (Entered: 01/23/2019)
2019-02-0113Joint STATUS REPORT by UNITED STATES DEPARTMENT OF THE INTERIOR. (Rogers, Joshua) (Entered: 02/01/2019)
2019-02-0114ENTERED IN ERROR.....Joint STATUS REPORT by UNITED STATES DEPARTMENT OF THE INTERIOR. (Rogers, Joshua) Modified on 2/4/2019 (jf). (Entered: 02/01/2019)
2019-02-04NOTICE OF CORRECTED DOCKET ENTRY: Document No. re 14 Status Report was entered in error as a duplicate entry to 13 .(jf) (Entered: 02/04/2019)
2019-02-0815Joint STATUS REPORT by UNITED STATES DEPARTMENT OF THE INTERIOR. (Graham-Oliver, Heather) (Entered: 02/08/2019)
Hide Docket Events
by FOIA Project Staff
Skip to toolbar