Skip to content

Case Detail

[Subscribe to updates]
Case TitleMARTIN v. U.S. DEPARTMENT OF JUSTICE
DistrictDistrict of Columbia
CityWashington, DC
Case Number1:2018cv01885
Date Filed2018-08-12
Date ClosedOpen
JudgeJudge Christopher R. Cooper
PlaintiffLERONE A. MARTIN
Case DescriptionLerone Martin, a professor of religion and politics at Washington University, submitted a FOIA request to the FBI for records concerning Billy Graham. The agency acknowledged receipt of the request, but after hearing nothing further from the agency, Martin filed suit.
Complaint issues: Litigation - Attorney's fees, Failure to respond within statutory time limit

DefendantU.S. DEPARTMENT OF JUSTICE
Documents
Docket
Complaint
Complaint attachment 1
Complaint attachment 2
Complaint attachment 3
Complaint attachment 4
User-contributed Documents
 
Docket Events (Hide)
Date FiledDoc #Docket Text

2018-08-121COMPLAINT against U.S. DEPARTMENT OF JUSTICE ( Filing fee $ 400 receipt number 0090-5634116) filed by LERONE A. MARTIN. (Attachments: # 1 Civil Cover Sheet, # 2 Summons, # 3 Summons, # 4 Summons)(Samahon, Tuan) (Attachment 1 replaced on 8/14/2018) (zmd). (Entered: 08/12/2018)
2018-08-14Case Assigned to Judge Christopher R. Cooper. (zmd) (Entered: 08/14/2018)
2018-08-212SUMMONS (3) Issued Electronically as to U.S. DEPARTMENT OF JUSTICE, U.S. Attorney and U.S. Attorney General (Attachments: # 1 Notice and Consent) (zmd) (Entered: 08/21/2018)
2018-08-233NOTICE OF ERRATA by LERONE A. MARTIN re 1 Complaint, (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit CORRECTED COMPLAINT)(Samahon, Tuan) (Entered: 08/23/2018)
2018-09-174RETURN OF SERVICE/AFFIDAVIT of Summons and Complaint Executed as to the United States Attorney. Date of Service Upon United States Attorney on 9/6/2018. Answer due for ALL FEDERAL DEFENDANTS by 10/6/2018. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit)(Samahon, Tuan) (Entered: 09/17/2018)
2018-09-185RETURN OF SERVICE/AFFIDAVIT of Summons and Complaint Executed. U.S. DEPARTMENT OF JUSTICE served on 9/6/2018 (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit)(Samahon, Tuan) (Entered: 09/18/2018)
2018-09-186RETURN OF SERVICE/AFFIDAVIT of Summons and Complaint Executed on United States Attorney General. Date of Service Upon United States Attorney General 09/06/2018. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit)(Samahon, Tuan) (Entered: 09/18/2018)
2018-10-097NOTICE of Appearance by Brian J. Field on behalf of All Defendants (Field, Brian) (Entered: 10/09/2018)
2018-10-098ANSWER to Complaint by U.S. DEPARTMENT OF JUSTICE.(Field, Brian) (Entered: 10/09/2018)
2018-10-09MINUTE ORDER: Before the Court in this FOIA case are a complaint and an answer. It is hereby ORDERED that the parties promptly confer and file a joint proposed schedule for briefing or disclosure by October 23, 2018. Signed by Judge Christopher R. Cooper on 10/09/2018. (lccrc3) (Entered: 10/09/2018)
2018-10-09Set/Reset Deadlines: Joint Proposed Briefing Schedule due by 10/23/2018 (lsj) (Entered: 10/09/2018)
2018-10-239NOTICE of Change of Address by Tuan N. Samahon (Samahon, Tuan) (Entered: 10/23/2018)
2018-10-2310Joint STATUS REPORT by U.S. DEPARTMENT OF JUSTICE. (Field, Brian) (Entered: 10/23/2018)
2018-10-24MINUTE ORDER: Upon consideration of the parties' 10 Joint Status Report, it is hereby ORDERED that the parties shall file a further status report on or before December 21, 2018. Signed by Judge Christopher R. Cooper on 10/24/2018. (lccrc3) (Entered: 10/24/2018)
2018-10-24Set/Reset Deadlines: Joint Status Report due by 12/21/2018. (znbn) (Entered: 10/24/2018)
2018-12-2111Joint STATUS REPORT by U.S. DEPARTMENT OF JUSTICE. (Field, Brian) (Entered: 12/21/2018)
2018-12-24MINUTE ORDER: Upon consideration of the parties' 11 Joint Status Report, it is hereby ORDERED that the parties shall submit a further status report on or before March 29, 2019. Signed by Judge Christopher R. Cooper on 12/24/2018. (lccrc3) (Entered: 12/24/2018)
2018-12-26Set/Reset Deadlines: Status Report due by 3/29/2019 (lsj) (Entered: 12/26/2018)
Hide Docket Events
by FOIA Project Staff
Skip to toolbar