Skip to content

Case Detail

[Subscribe to updates]
Case TitlePAUL v. U.S. DEPARTMENT OF JUSTICE
DistrictDistrict of Columbia
CityWashington, DC
Case Number1:2018cv01890
Date Filed2018-08-13
Date ClosedOpen
JudgeJudge Trevor N. McFadden
PlaintiffPETER F. PAUL
Case DescriptionPeter Paul submitted a FOIA request to the Department of Justice for records about himself. After hearing nothing further from the agency, Paul filed suit.
Complaint issues: Failure to respond within statutory time limit, Adequacy - Search, Litigation - Vaughn index, Litigation - Attorney's fees

DefendantU.S. DEPARTMENT OF JUSTICE
Documents
Docket
Complaint
Complaint attachment 1
Complaint attachment 2
Complaint attachment 3
User-contributed Documents
 
Docket Events (Hide)
Date FiledDoc #Docket Text

2018-08-131COMPLAINT against All Defendants ( Filing fee $ 400 receipt number 0090-5635816) filed by PETER F. PAUL. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit, # 2 Summons, # 3 Civil Cover Sheet)(Klayman, Larry) (Entered: 08/13/2018)
2018-08-14Case Assigned to Judge Trevor N. McFadden. (zsb) (Entered: 08/14/2018)
2018-08-152STANDING ORDER establishing Procedures for Cases Before Judge Trevor N. McFadden. The parties are hereby ORDERED to read and comply with the directives in the attached standing order. Signed by Judge Trevor N. McFadden on 8/15/2018. (lctnm3) (Entered: 08/15/2018)
2018-08-153REQUEST FOR SUMMONS TO ISSUE filed by PETER F. PAUL. (Attachments: # 1 Summons)(Klayman, Larry) (Entered: 08/15/2018)
2018-08-174SUMMONS (2) Issued Electronically as to U.S. DEPARTMENT OF JUSTICE, U.S. Attorney. (Attachments: # 1 Notice and Consent)(znmw) (Entered: 08/17/2018)
2018-08-245CIVIL COVER SHEET Corrected by PETER F. PAUL filed by PETER F. PAUL.(Klayman, Larry) (Main Document 5 replaced on 8/27/2018) (ztd). (Entered: 08/24/2018)
2018-09-176STANDING ORDER establishing procedures for cases before Judge Trevor N. McFadden. The parties are hereby ORDERED to read and comply with the directives in the attached standing order. Signed by Judge Trevor N. McFadden on 9/17/2018. (lctnm3) (Entered: 09/17/2018)
2018-09-207NOTICE of Appearance by Joshua L. Rogers on behalf of U.S. DEPARTMENT OF JUSTICE (Rogers, Joshua) (Entered: 09/20/2018)
2018-09-208ANSWER to Complaint by U.S. DEPARTMENT OF JUSTICE.(Rogers, Joshua) (Entered: 09/20/2018)
2018-10-12MINUTE ORDER. Before the Court are a complaint and an answer in this FOIA case. It is hereby ORDERED that the parties shall meet and confer and file a Joint Status Report proposing a schedule for proceeding in this matter. The schedule should address, among other things, the status of Plaintiff's FOIA request, the anticipated number of documents responsive to Plaintiff's FOIA request, the anticipated date(s) for release of the documents requested by Plaintiff, whether a motion for an Open America stay is likely in this case, whether a Vaughn index will be required in this case, and a briefing schedule for dispositive motions, if required. The parties shall file the schedule on or before November 5, 2018. Signed by Judge Trevor N. McFadden on 10/12/2018. (lctnm3) (Entered: 10/12/2018)
2018-10-15Set/Reset Deadlines: Joint Status Report due by 11/5/2018. (hmc) (Entered: 10/15/2018)
2018-11-059Consent MOTION for Extension of Time to File Joint Status Report by U.S. DEPARTMENT OF JUSTICE (Attachments: # 1 Text of Proposed Order)(Rogers, Joshua) (Entered: 11/05/2018)
2018-11-05MINUTE ORDER: Upon consideration of the Defendant's 9 Consent Motion for an Extension of Time, it is hereby ORDERED that the parties shall file their Joint Status Report on or before November 8, 2018. Signed by Judge Trevor N. McFadden on 11/5/2018. (lctnm3) (Entered: 11/05/2018)
2018-11-06Set/Reset Deadlines: Joint Status Report due by 11/8/2018. (hmc) (Entered: 11/06/2018)
2018-11-0810Joint STATUS REPORT by U.S. DEPARTMENT OF JUSTICE. (Rogers, Joshua) (Entered: 11/08/2018)
2018-11-13MINUTE ORDER: Upon consideration of the parties' 10 Joint Status Report, it is hereby ORDERED that a further update shall be filed on or before December 21, 2018. This report shall provide an update on the status of the production and the number of responsive records identified. Signed by Judge Trevor N. McFadden on 11/13/2018. (lctnm3) (Entered: 11/13/2018)
2018-11-1311ENTERED IN ERROR.....STANDING ORDER Establishing Procedures for Cases Before Judge Trevor N. McFadden. The parties are hereby ORDERED to read and comply with the directives in the attached standing order. Signed by Judge Trevor N. McFadden on 11/13/18. (lctnm2) Modified on 11/13/2018 (hmc). (Entered: 11/13/2018)
2018-11-13NOTICE OF CORRECTED DOCKET ENTRY: 11 Standing Order was entered in the wrong case. (hmc) (Entered: 11/13/2018)
2018-11-13Set/Reset Deadlines: Joint Status Report due by 12/21/2018. (hmc) (Entered: 11/13/2018)
2018-12-1412MOTION for Extension of Time to File Joint Status Report by U.S. DEPARTMENT OF JUSTICE (Attachments: # 1 Text of Proposed Order)(Rogers, Joshua) (Entered: 12/14/2018)
2018-12-17MINUTE ORDER: Upon consideration of the Defendant's 12 Motion for Extension of Time, it is hereby ORDERED that the parties shall file the next Joint Status Report on or before January 4, 2019. Further requests for extensions of time shall be disfavored. A Status Conference is hereby set for January 11, 2019 at 10:00 am in Courtroom 2 before Judge Trevor N. McFadden. Signed by Judge Trevor N. McFadden on 12/17/2018. (lctnm3) (Entered: 12/17/2018)
2018-12-17Set/Reset Deadlines/Hearings: Joint Status Report due by 1/4/2019. Status Conference set for 1/11/2019 at 10:00 AM in Courtroom 2 before Judge Trevor N. McFadden. (hmc) (Entered: 12/17/2018)
2018-12-2613MOTION to Stay All Proceedings in Light of Lapse of Appropriations by U.S. DEPARTMENT OF JUSTICE (Attachments: # 1 Text of Proposed Order)(Rogers, Joshua) (Entered: 12/26/2018)
2019-01-02MINUTE ORDER granting 13 Motion to Stay. Upon considering the Defendant's 13 Motion to Stay, it is hereby ordered that this matter shall be stayed until Congress has restored appropriations to the Department of Justice. It is further ordered that the Defendant will notify the Court immediately upon resumption of appropriations. Signed by Judge Trevor N. McFadden on 1/2/2019.(lctnm2) (Entered: 01/02/2019)
2019-01-2914NOTICE of Restored Government Funding by U.S. DEPARTMENT OF JUSTICE (Rogers, Joshua) (Entered: 01/29/2019)
2019-01-29MINUTE ORDER: Upon consideration of the Defendant's 14 Notice, the Court hereby lifts the stay in this case. The parties are ORDERED to file a status report on or before February 12, 2019. A Status Conference is hereby set for February 19, 2019 at 10:00 am in Courtroom 2 before Judge Trevor N. McFadden. SO ORDERED. Signed by Judge Trevor N. McFadden on 1/29/19. (lctnm3) (Entered: 01/29/2019)
2019-01-29Set/Reset Deadlines/Hearings: Joint Status Report due by 2/12/2019. Status Conference set for 2/19/2019 at 10:00 AM in Courtroom 2 before Judge Trevor N. McFadden. (hmc) (Entered: 01/29/2019)
2019-02-1215Joint STATUS REPORT by U.S. DEPARTMENT OF JUSTICE. (Attachments: # 1 Text of Proposed Order)(Graham-Oliver, Heather) (Entered: 02/12/2019)
Hide Docket Events
by FOIA Project Staff
Skip to toolbar