Date Filed | Doc # | Docket Text |
|
2018-08-15 | 1 | COMPLAINT. Filing fee received: $ 400.00, receipt number 0970-15844043 filed by Center for Biological Diversity. (Melton, Allison) (Attachments: # 1 Civil Cover Sheet)(MFR) (Entered: 08/15/2018) |
2018-08-15 | 2 | Corporate Disclosure Statement by Center for Biological Diversity. (Melton, Allison) (MFR) (Entered: 08/15/2018) |
2018-08-15 | 3 | SUMMONS Submitted by Center for Biological Diversity. (Melton, Allison) (MFR) (Entered: 08/15/2018) |
2018-08-15 | 4 | Filing fee paid, receipt number 0970-15844043. This case has been assigned to the Honorable Jennifer G Zipps. All future pleadings or documents should bear the correct case number: CV-18-00402-TUC-JGZ. Notice of Availability of Magistrate Judge to Exercise Jurisdiction form attached. (MFR) (Entered: 08/15/2018) |
2018-08-15 | 5 | Summons Issued as to United States Forest Service. (MFR). *** IMPORTANT: When printing the summons, select "Document and stamps" or "Document and comments" for the seal to appear on the document. (Entered: 08/15/2018) |
2018-08-15 | | Remark: Pro hac vice motion granted for Allison N Melton on behalf of plaintiff. This is a TEXT ENTRY ONLY. There is no PDF document associated with this entry. (BAS) (Entered: 08/15/2018) |
2018-08-20 | 6 | Ordered that this case shall be referred by the Clerk of the Court to a Magistrate Judge by automated random selection for all pretrial proceedings and report and recommendation in accordance with the provisions of 28 U.S.C. § 636(b)(1) and LRCiv. 72.1 and 72.2, Rules of Practice of the U. S. District Court for the District of Arizona. Signed by Judge Jennifer G Zipps on 8/17/2018. (BAR) (Entered: 08/20/2018) |
2018-08-21 | 7 | MINUTE ORDER: Pursuant to the order of 8/17/2018 by Judge Zipps, Magistrate Judge Leslie A Bowman was randomly referred to the above listed case. All future filings shall reflect the following case number: CV 18-402-TUC-JGZ(LAB). This is a TEXT ENTRY ONLY. There is no PDF document associated with this entry. (BAR) (Entered: 08/21/2018) |
2018-09-07 | 8 | SCHEDULING ORDER(FOIA): IT IS ORDERED that Defendant shall serve an answer or otherwise plead within 30 days after service, unless the Court otherwise directs for good cause shown. The deadline for filing dispositive motions is 6 months from the date the case is filed. Failure to file such a motion shall result in dismissal for lack of prosecution. Plaintiff shall serve Defendant with a copy of this Order. Signed by Magistrate Judge Leslie A Bowman on 9/6/18.(BAC) (Entered: 09/07/2018) |
2018-09-07 | 9 | SERVICE EXECUTED filed by Center for Biological Diversity: Proof of Service re: Complaint; Civil Cover Sheet; Text Entry Only Granting Pro Hac Vice Status; Corporate Disclosure Statement; Non-Executed Summons; Executed Summons; and Notice of Availability of Magistrate upon United States Forest Service, U.S. Attorney for District of Arizona; Attorney General of the United States, Jeff Sessions on U.S. Forest Service on Aug. 23, 2018; Attorney General of the U.S., Jeff Sessions on Aug. 23, 2018; and U.S. Attorney Office for District of Arizona on Aug. 20, 2018. (Melton, Allison) (Entered: 09/07/2018) |
2018-09-10 | 10 | SERVICE EXECUTED filed by Center for Biological Diversity: Proof of Service re: Scheduling Order (FOIA) upon United States Forest Service, U.S. Attorney for District of Arizona; Attorney General of the United States, Jeff Sessions on September 10, 2018. (Melton, Allison) (Entered: 09/10/2018) |
2018-09-22 | 11 | STIPULATION FOR EXTENSION OF TIME TO ANSWER COMPLAINT by United States Forest Service. (Attachments: # 1 Text of Proposed Order Proposed Order)(Ambri, Michael) (Entered: 09/22/2018) |
2018-10-05 | 12 | ORDER pursuant to 11 Stipulation For Extension of Time To Answer Complaint; It is Ordered that Defendant shall respond to the Complaint on or before 10/10/2018. Signed by Magistrate Judge Leslie A Bowman on 10/4/2018. (MFR) (Entered: 10/05/2018) |
2018-10-15 | 13 | STIPULATION FOR EXTENSION OF TIME TO ANSWER COMPLAINT (Second Request) by United States Forest Service. (Attachments: # 1 Text of Proposed Order)(Ambri, Michael) (Entered: 10/15/2018) |
2018-10-17 | 14 | ORDER pursuant to 13 Stipulation For Extension of Time To Answer Complaint. Defendant shall have up to and including 10/31/2018, in which to file its response to the Complaint. Signed by Magistrate Judge Leslie A Bowman on 10/16/18.(BAC) (Entered: 10/17/2018) |
2018-12-06 | 15 | STATUS REPORT by United States Forest Service. (Ambri, Michael) (Entered: 12/06/2018) |
2019-01-04 | 16 | STATUS REPORT by Center for Biological Diversity. (Melton, Allison) (Entered: 01/04/2019) |
2019-02-15 | 17 | NOTICE of Settlement by United States Forest Service. (Ambri, Michael) (Entered: 02/15/2019) |
2019-03-19 | 18 | STIPULATION of Dismissal by United States Forest Service. (Attachments: # 1 Text of Proposed Order)(Ambri, Michael) (Entered: 03/19/2019) |
2019-03-20 | 19 | ORDER pursuant to the parties' 18 Stipulation of Dismissal: IT IS ORDERED that Stipulation for Dismissal with Prejudice is GRANTED. All claims in this action are dismissed with prejudice, including but not limited to all claims for attorneys' fees, costs and expenses. The Clerk of Court is directed to close the file in this action. Signed by Judge Jennifer G Zipps on 3/20/19.(BAC) (Entered: 03/20/2019) |
Hide Docket Events |