Skip to content

Case Detail

[Subscribe to updates]
Case TitleFRIENDS OF THE EARTH v. DEPARTMENT OF INTERIOR
DistrictDistrict of Columbia
CityWashington, DC
Case Number1:2018cv01924
Date Filed2018-08-16
Date ClosedOpen
JudgeJudge Amit P. Mehta
PlaintiffFRIENDS OF THE EARTH
Case DescriptionFriends of the Earth submitted FOIA requests to the Department of the Interior for records concerning ethics agreements with several political appointees. The agency acknowledged receipt of the requests, but after hearing nothing further from the agency, Friends of the Earth filed suit.
Complaint issues: Failure to respond within statutory time limit, Litigation - Attorney's fees

DefendantU.S. DEPARTMENT OF THE INTERIOR
DefendantDEPARTMENT OF INTERIOR
1849 C Street NW
Washington, DC 20240
Documents
Docket
Complaint
Complaint attachment 1
Complaint attachment 2
Complaint attachment 3
Complaint attachment 4
User-contributed Documents
 
Docket Events (Hide)
Date FiledDoc #Docket Text

2018-08-161COMPLAINT against U.S. DEPARTMENT OF INTERIOR ( Filing fee $ 400 receipt number 0090-5642594) filed by FRIENDS OF THE EARTH. (Attachments: # 1 Civil Cover Sheet, # 2 Summons, # 3 Summons, # 4 Summons)(Lawton, William) (Entered: 08/16/2018)
2018-08-16Case Assigned to Judge Amit P. Mehta. (zmd) (Entered: 08/20/2018)
2018-08-232SUMMONS (3) Issued Electronically as to U.S. DEPARTMENT OF THE INTERIOR, U.S. Attorney and U.S. Attorney General (Attachments: # 1 Notice and Consent) (zmd) (Entered: 08/23/2018)
2018-09-263ANSWER to Complaint by U.S. DEPARTMENT OF THE INTERIOR.(McBride, Patricia) (Entered: 09/26/2018)
2018-09-274ORDER. Both a Complaint and an Answer are now before the court in this FOIA case. It is hereby ordered that the parties shall meet and confer and file a Joint Status Report on or before October 11, 2018. Signed by Judge Amit P. Mehta on 09/27/2018. (lcapm3) (Entered: 09/27/2018)
2018-09-27Set/Reset Deadlines: Joint Status Report due by 10/11/2018. (zjd) (Entered: 09/27/2018)
2018-10-115Joint STATUS REPORT by U.S. DEPARTMENT OF THE INTERIOR. (Attachments: # 1 Text of Proposed Order)(McBride, Patricia) (Entered: 10/11/2018)
2018-10-12MINUTE ORDER. The parties shall file a Joint Status Report no later than November 20, 2018, updating the court on Defendant's efforts to produce responsive materials. Signed by Judge Amit P. Mehta on 10/12/2018. (lcapm3) (Entered: 10/12/2018)
2018-10-12Set/Reset Deadlines: Joint Status Report due by 11/20/2018. (zjd) (Entered: 10/15/2018)
2018-11-196Joint STATUS REPORT by U.S. DEPARTMENT OF THE INTERIOR. (Attachments: # 1 Text of Proposed Order Proposed Order)(McBride, Patricia) (Entered: 11/19/2018)
2018-11-20MINUTE ORDER. In light of the parties' 6 Joint Status Report, the parties shall submit another Report no later than January 20, 2019, which updates the court on Defendant's search and production efforts. Signed by Judge Amit P. Mehta on 11/20/2018. (lcapm3) (Entered: 11/20/2018)
2018-11-20Set/Reset Deadlines: Joint Status Report due by 1/20/2019. (zjd) (Entered: 11/21/2018)
2019-01-187MOTION to Stay , MOTION for Extension of Time to in Light of Lapse of Appropriations by U.S. DEPARTMENT OF THE INTERIOR (Attachments: # 1 Text of Proposed Order)(Hudak, Brian) (Entered: 01/18/2019)
2019-01-22Minute Order granting Defendant's 7 Motion for Stay and Extension of Time. This matter is hereby stayed. Within seven business days of Department of Justice operations resuming, the parties shall submit a Joint Status Report that proposes a schedule for further proceedings in this matter. Signed by Judge Amit P. Mehta on 01/22/2019. (lcapm3) (Entered: 01/22/2019)
2019-02-048NOTICE by U.S. DEPARTMENT OF THE INTERIOR (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit Joint Status Report)(McBride, Patricia) (Entered: 02/04/2019)
2019-02-04MINUTE ORDER. The parties shall file an additional Joint Status Report no later than March 5, 2019, that updates the court on Defendant's search and production efforts. If needed, the parties shall propose a summary judgment briefing schedule. Signed by Judge Amit P. Mehta on 02/04/2019. (lcapm3) (Entered: 02/04/2019)
2019-02-049Joint STATUS REPORT by U.S. DEPARTMENT OF THE INTERIOR. (jf) (Entered: 02/05/2019)
2019-02-05MINUTE ORDER. The parties shall file their next Joint Status Report regarding Defendant's production of responsive information no later than March 5, 2019. Signed by Judge Amit P. Mehta on 02/05/2019. (lcapm3) (Entered: 02/05/2019)
2019-02-05Set/Reset Deadlines: Joint Status Report due by 3/5/2019. (zjd) (Entered: 02/06/2019)
Hide Docket Events
by FOIA Project Staff
Skip to toolbar