Skip to content

Case Detail

[Subscribe to updates]
Case TitlePROPERTY OF THE PEOPLE, INC. et al v. DEPARTMENT OF STATE
DistrictDistrict of Columbia
CityWashington, DC
Case Number1:2018cv01939
Date Filed2018-08-17
Date ClosedOpen
JudgeJudge Randolph D. Moss
PlaintiffPROPERTY OF THE PEOPLE, INC.
PlaintiffRYAN NOAH SHAPIRO
Case DescriptionProperty of the People and researcher Ryan Shapiro submitted FOIA requests to the Department of State for records on Cambridge Analytica and Russian interference with 20106 election. Property of the People and Shapiro directed their request specifically to the Russia Malign Influence Group. The agency acknowledged receipt of the request and told Property of the People that its request was too broad to search. Property of the People filed an administrative appeal of that decision and a separate administrative appeal of the agency's failure to search and respond to the request. After hearing nothing further from the agency, Property of the People and Shapiro filed suit.
Complaint issues: Failure to respond within statutory time limit, Litigation - Attorney's fees

DefendantDEPARTMENT OF STATE
Documents
Docket
Complaint
Complaint attachment 1
Complaint attachment 2
User-contributed Documents
 
Docket Events (Hide)
Date FiledDoc #Docket Text

2018-08-171COMPLAINT against DEPARTMENT OF STATE ( Filing fee $ 400 receipt number 0090-5646611) filed by PROPERTY OF THE PEOPLE, INC., RYAN NOAH SHAPIRO. (Attachments: # 1 Civil Cover Sheet, # 2 Summons)(Light, Jeffrey) (Entered: 08/17/2018)
2018-08-172LCvR 7.1 CERTIFICATE OF DISCLOSURE of Corporate Affiliations and Financial Interests by PROPERTY OF THE PEOPLE, INC. (Light, Jeffrey) (Entered: 08/17/2018)
2018-08-20Case Assigned to Judge Randolph D. Moss. (zsb) (Entered: 08/20/2018)
2018-08-203SUMMONS (3) Issued Electronically as to DEPARTMENT OF STATE, U.S. Attorney and U.S. Attorney General (Attachment: # 1 Notice and Consent)(zsb) (Entered: 08/20/2018)
2018-08-204STANDING ORDER: The parties are hereby ORDERED to comply with the directives set out in the attached Standing Order. Signed by Judge Randolph D. Moss on 8/20/2018. (lcrdm3, ) (Entered: 08/20/2018)
2018-08-315RETURN OF SERVICE/AFFIDAVIT of Summons and Complaint Executed. DEPARTMENT OF STATE served on 8/27/2018, RETURN OF SERVICE/AFFIDAVIT of Summons and Complaint Executed as to the United States Attorney. Date of Service Upon United States Attorney on 8/23/2018. ( Answer due for ALL FEDERAL DEFENDANTS by 9/22/2018.), RETURN OF SERVICE/AFFIDAVIT of Summons and Complaint Executed on United States Attorney General. Date of Service Upon United States Attorney General 08/23/2018. (Light, Jeffrey) (Entered: 08/31/2018)
2018-09-246NOTICE of Appearance by Robert Mark Norway on behalf of DEPARTMENT OF STATE (Norway, Robert) (Entered: 09/24/2018)
2018-09-247ANSWER to Complaint by DEPARTMENT OF STATE. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibits 1 - 11)(Norway, Robert) (Entered: 09/24/2018)
2018-10-01MINUTE ORDER: The parties are hereby ORDERED to appear for an Initial Scheduling Conference on October 25, 2018, at 10:45 a.m. in Courtroom 21. It is further ORDERED that the parties shall confer in advance of the Initial Scheduling Conference on (1) whether any records can be released, and (2) the proper next steps in this litigation. Signed by Judge Randolph D. Moss on 10/1/2018. (lcrdm3, ) (Entered: 10/01/2018)
2018-10-01Set/Reset Hearings: Initial Scheduling Conference set for 10/25/2018, at 10:45 AM, in Courtroom 21, before Judge Randolph D. Moss. (kt) (Entered: 10/01/2018)
2018-10-25Minute Entry for proceedings held before Judge Randolph D. Moss: Initial Scheduling Conference held on 10/25/2018. Joint Status Report due on or before 11/30/2018. (Court Reporter: Jeff Hook.) (kt) (Entered: 10/25/2018)
2018-11-308Joint STATUS REPORT by DEPARTMENT OF STATE. (Norway, Robert) (Entered: 11/30/2018)
2018-11-309Amended STATUS REPORT by DEPARTMENT OF STATE. (Norway, Robert) (Entered: 11/30/2018)
2018-12-02MINUTE ORDER: Upon consideration of the parties' joint status report 8 , it is hereby ORDERED that the parties shall file a further joint status report on or before January 23, 2019. Signed by Judge Randolph D. Moss on 12/2/2018. (lcrdm3, ) (Entered: 12/02/2018)
2018-12-03Set/Reset Deadlines: Joint Status Report due by 1/23/2019. (kt) (Entered: 12/03/2018)
2019-01-1110Unopposed MOTION to Stay Proceedings Due to Lapse in Appropriations by DEPARTMENT OF STATE (Attachments: # 1 Text of Proposed Order)(Norway, Robert) (Entered: 01/11/2019)
2019-01-13MINUTE ORDER: Upon consideration of the government's unopposed motion to stay 10 , it is hereby ORDERED that the motion is GRANTED. This case shall be STAYED until Congress appropriates funding for the Department of Justice to resume work. It is further ORDERED that the parties shall file their joint status within thirty (30) days of Congress appropriating such funding. Signed by Judge Randolph D. Moss on 1/13/2019. (lcrdm3, ) (Entered: 01/13/2019)
2019-01-2811NOTICE to the Court of Restoration of Appropriations by DEPARTMENT OF STATE (Norway, Robert) (Entered: 01/28/2019)
2019-01-31MINUTE ORDER: In light of the government's notice 11 , it is hereby ORDERED that the case is UNSTAYED. It is further ORDERED that the parties shall file a joint status report on or before February 24, 2019. Signed by Judge Randolph D. Moss on 1/31/2019. (lcrdm3, ) (Entered: 01/31/2019)
2019-01-31Set/Reset Deadlines: Joint Status Report due by 2/24/2019. (kt) (Entered: 01/31/2019)
Hide Docket Events
by FOIA Project Staff
Skip to toolbar