Skip to content

Case Detail

[Subscribe to updates]
Case TitlePEOPLE FOR THE ETHICAL TREATMENT OF ANIMALS, INC. et al v. UNITED STATES DEPARTMENT OF AGRICULTURE et al
DistrictDistrict of Columbia
CityWashington, DC
Case Number1:2018cv01886
Date Filed2018-08-09
Date ClosedOpen
JudgeJudge Christopher R. Cooper
PlaintiffDELCIANNA J. WINDERS
PlaintiffPEOPLE FOR THE ETHICAL TREATMENT OF ANIMALS, INC.
Case DescriptionPeople for the Ethical Treatment of Animals submitted FOIA requests to the Department of Agriculture's Animal and Plant Health Inspection Service for records concerning the removal of information from Animal Welfare Act investigations on the agency's website, as well as the identifying information. PETA also requested fee waivers. The agency acknowledged receipt of the requests, but after hearing nothing further from the agency, PETA filed suit.
Complaint issues: Failure to respond within statutory time limit, Public Interest Fee Waiver, Litigation - Attorney's fees

DefendantUNITED STATES DEPARTMENT OF AGRICULTURE
DefendantANIMAL AND PLANT HEALTH INSPECTION SERVICE
Documents
Docket
Complaint
Complaint attachment 1
User-contributed Documents
 
Docket Events (Hide)
Date FiledDoc #Docket Text

2018-06-071COMPLAINT against Animal and Plant Health Inspection Service, The United States Department of Agriculture ( Filing fee $ 400, receipt number 0422-6120598.), filed by People for the Ethical Treatment of Animals, Inc., Delcianna J. Winders. (Attachments: # 1 Civil Cover Sheet)(epri) [Transferred from Virginia Eastern on 8/17/2018.] (Entered: 06/07/2018)
2018-06-072Financial Interest Disclosure Statement (Local Rule 7.1) by People for the Ethical Treatment of Animals, Inc. (epri) [Transferred from Virginia Eastern on 8/17/2018.] (Entered: 06/07/2018)
2018-06-073Two (2) Summonses Issued as to Animal and Plant Health Inspection Service, The United States Department of Agriculture. NOTICE TO ATTORNEY: Print out two electronically issued summons and one copy of the attachments for each defendant to be served with the complaint. (Attachments: # 1 Civil Motions Procedures)(epri) [Transferred from Virginia Eastern on 8/17/2018.] (Entered: 06/07/2018)
2018-07-134MOTION to Dismiss or Transfer and Sever by Animal and Plant Health Inspection Service, The United States Department of Agriculture. (Wilson, Joel) [Transferred from Virginia Eastern on 8/17/2018.] (Entered: 07/13/2018)
2018-07-135Memorandum in Support re 4 MOTION to Dismiss or Transfer and Sever filed by Animal and Plant Health Inspection Service, The United States Department of Agriculture. (Wilson, Joel) [Transferred from Virginia Eastern on 8/17/2018.] (Entered: 07/13/2018)
2018-07-236SUMMONS Returned Executed. The United States Department of Agriculture served on 6/13/2018. (jrin) [Transferred from Virginia Eastern on 8/17/2018.] (Entered: 07/23/2018)
2018-07-237SUMMONS Returned Executed. Animal and Plant Health Inspection Service served on 6/15/2018.(jrin) [Transferred from Virginia Eastern on 8/17/2018.] (Entered: 07/23/2018)
2018-07-23Refer for 16(b) (jrin) [Transferred from Virginia Eastern on 8/17/2018.] (Entered: 07/23/2018)
2018-08-098ORDER. It is therefore ORDERED that this action be transferred to the United States District Court for the District of Columbia. Signed by District Judge Henry C. Morgan, Jr on 8/8/2018. (jrin) [Transferred from Virginia Eastern on 8/17/2018.] (Entered: 08/09/2018)
2018-08-09Case transferred electronically to United States District Court for the District of Columbia. (jrin) [Transferred from Virginia Eastern on 8/17/2018.] (Entered: 08/09/2018)
2018-08-179Case transferred in from District of Virginia Eastern; Case Number 2:18-cv-00306. Original file certified copy of transfer order and docket sheet received. (Entered: 08/17/2018)
2018-08-2010NOTICE of Appearance by Delcianna J. Winders on behalf of PEOPLE FOR THE ETHICAL TREATMENT OF ANIMALS, INC., DELCIANNA J. WINDERS (Winders, Delcianna) (Entered: 08/20/2018)
2018-08-2011NOTICE OF RELATED CASE by PEOPLE FOR THE ETHICAL TREATMENT OF ANIMALS, INC., DELCIANNA J. WINDERS. Case related to Case No. 00887. (Winders, Delcianna) (Entered: 08/20/2018)
2018-08-20Case directly reassigned to Judge Christopher R. Cooper as related to 18cv887 (CRC). Judge Timothy J. Kelly is no longer assigned to the case. (ztnr) (Entered: 08/20/2018)
2018-08-2312NOTICE OF SUBSTITUTION OF COUNSEL by Brian J. Field on behalf of All Defendants Substituting for attorney Joel Wilson (Field, Brian) (Entered: 08/23/2018)
Hide Docket Events
by FOIA Project Staff
Skip to toolbar