Skip to content

Case Detail

[Subscribe to updates]
Case TitleColumbia Riverkeeper v. United States Department Of Energy
DistrictDistrict of Oregon
CityPortland
Case Number3:2018cv01544
Date Filed2018-08-22
Date ClosedOpen
JudgeMagistrate Judge John V. Acosta
PlaintiffColumbia Riverkeeper an Oregon nonprofit corporation
DefendantUnited States Department Of Energy an agency of the United States of America
Documents
Docket
User-contributed Documents
 
Docket Events (Hide)
Date FiledDoc #Docket Text

2018-08-221Complaint. Filing fee in the amount of $400 collected. Agency Tracking ID: 0979-5526501 Filer is subject to the requirements of Fed. R. Civ. P. 7.1. Jury Trial Requested: No. Filed by Columbia Riverkeeper against United States Department Of Energy (Attachments: # 1 Proposed Summons, # 2 Civil Cover Sheet). (Bahr, David) (Entered: 08/22/2018)
2018-08-222Corporate Disclosure Statement . Filed by Columbia Riverkeeper. (Bahr, David) (Entered: 08/22/2018)
2018-08-223Notice of Case Assignment to Magistrate Judge John V. Acosta and Discovery and Pretrial Scheduling Order. NOTICE: Counsel shall print and serve the summonses and all documents issued by the Clerk at the time of filing upon all named parties in accordance with Local Rule 3-5 . Discovery is to be completed by 12/20/2018. Joint Alternate Dispute Resolution Report is due by 1/22/2019. Pretrial Order is due by 1/22/2019. Ordered by Magistrate Judge John V. Acosta. (joha) (Entered: 08/22/2018)
2018-08-224Summons Issued Electronically as to United States Department Of Energy. NOTICE: Counsel shall print and serve the summonses and all documents issued by the Clerk at the time of filing upon all named parties in accordance with Local Rule 3-5. (joha) (Entered: 08/22/2018)
2018-09-045Affidavit of Service of Summons Issued, 4 upon United States Department Of Energy served on 8/23/2018 Filed by Columbia Riverkeeper. (Johnson, Miles) (Entered: 09/04/2018)
2018-09-266Answer to 1 Complaint, . Filed by United States Department Of Energy. (Danielson, Kevin) (Entered: 09/26/2018)
2018-09-277SCHEDULING ORDER by Judge Acosta - SETTING a Telephone Rule 16 Conference for Thursday, 12/13/2018 at 9:30AM. The court's conference line call-in information will be sent be separate sealed entry. (peg) (Entered: 09/27/2018)
2018-10-168Amended Complaint . Filed by Columbia Riverkeeper against United States Department Of Energy. (Bahr, David) (Entered: 10/16/2018)
2018-12-119SCHEDULING ORDER by Judge Acosta - At request of the parties, the Court STRIKES the Rule 16 Conference scheduled for 12/13, and will require that the parties file no later than 12/17/18, a joint status report which shall include proposed case management schedule and deadlines for the court's consideration. (peg) (Entered: 12/11/2018)
2018-12-1110Consent Motion for Stay of Proceedings and Order . Filed by Columbia Riverkeeper. (Bahr, David) (Entered: 12/11/2018)
2018-12-1311ORDER (Granting Stipulated Motion for Stay 10 ). This matter is STAYED up to and including 1/25/19, at which time the parties are required to file a Joint Status Report, which shall also include a proposed case management schedule. The court also stays nunc pro tunc defendant filing an answer to plaintiff's amended complaint, subject to the deadline as mentioned above and include a new answer deadline as part of the JSR, due 1/25/19. IT IS SO ORDERED this 13th day of December, 2018, by United States Magistrate Judge John V. Acosta. (peg) (Entered: 12/13/2018)
2019-01-1612Unopposed Motion for Stay of Case Deadlines in Light of Lapse of Appropriations . Filed by United States Department Of Energy. (Danielson, Kevin) (Entered: 01/16/2019)
2019-01-2213ORDER: by Judge Acosta -- Defendant's motion ECF No. 12 for stay of case is DENIED, pursuant to District of Oregon Standing Order 2019-3. This denial is without prejudice. Defendant may refile its motion to present facts to support good cause for staying proceedings in this case. (kms) (Entered: 01/22/2019)
2019-01-2514Joint Status Report . Filed by Columbia Riverkeeper. (Bahr, David) (Entered: 01/25/2019)
2019-01-2815ORDER by Judge Acosta -- The court has reviewed the parties' Joint Status Report (ECF No. 14). The parties are to submit another status report no later than May 20, 2019, to include a proposed case management schedule. The previous stay (ECF No. 11) entered by the court remains in effect until that date. (kms) (Entered: 01/28/2019)
Hide Docket Events
by FOIA Project Staff
Skip to toolbar