Skip to content

Case Detail

[Subscribe to updates]
Case TitleMUSLIM ADVOCATES v. UNITED STATES DEPARTMENT OF JUSTICE et al
DistrictDistrict of Columbia
CityWashington, DC
Case Number1:2018cv01967
Date Filed2018-08-23
Date ClosedOpen
JudgeJudge Rudolph Contreras
PlaintiffMUSLIM ADVOCATES
Case DescriptionMuslim Advocates submitted FOIA requests to the Department of Justice and the Department of Homeland Security for records concerning denaturalization cases. The agencies acknowledged receipt of the requests. The Civil Division at DOJ denied all records under Exemption 7(A) (interference with ongoing investigation or proceeding) and Exemption 7(E) (investigative methods and techniques). Muslim advocates filed an administrative appeal of the denial to the Office of Information Policy. U.S. Immigration and Customs Enforcement told Muslim Advocates that its request was too broad. Muslim Advocates filed an administrative appeal of that decision. After hearing nothing further from either agency, Muslim Advocates filed suit.
Complaint issues: Failure to respond within statutory time limit, Litigation - Vaughn index, Litigation - Attorney's fees

DefendantUNITED STATES DEPARTMENT OF JUSTICE
DefendantUNITED STATES IMMIGRATION AND CUSTOMS ENFORCEMENT
Documents
Docket
Complaint
Complaint attachment 1
Complaint attachment 2
Complaint attachment 3
Complaint attachment 4
Complaint attachment 5
Complaint attachment 6
Complaint attachment 7
Complaint attachment 8
User-contributed Documents
 
Docket Events (Hide)
Date FiledDoc #Docket Text

2018-08-231COMPLAINT against UNITED STATES DEPARTMENT OF JUSTICE, UNITED STATES IMMIGRATION AND CUSTOMS ENFORCEMENT ( Filing fee $ 400 receipt number 0090-5654213) filed by MUSLIM ADVOCATES. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit A, # 2 Exhibit B, # 3 Exhibit C, # 4 Civil Cover Sheet, # 5 Summons DOJ, # 6 Summons ICE, # 7 Summons U.S. Attorney General, # 8 Summons USAO-DC)(Smith, Johnathan) (Entered: 08/23/2018)
2018-08-232MOTION for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice :Attorney Name- Nimra H. Azmi, :Firm- Muslim Advocates, :Address- P.O. Box 34440, Washington, D.C. 20043. Phone No. - 202-897-2564. Fax No. - 202-508-1007 Filing fee $ 100, receipt number 0090-5654300. Fee Status: Fee Paid. by MUSLIM ADVOCATES (Smith, Johnathan) (Entered: 08/23/2018)
2018-08-23Case Assigned to Judge Rudolph Contreras. (zmd) (Entered: 08/24/2018)
2018-08-27MINUTE ORDER granting 2 Motion for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice : Local Rule 83.2(c)(2) provides that "[a]n attorney who engages in the practice of law from an office located in the District of Columbia must be a member of the District of Columbia Bar and the Bar of this Court to file papers in this Court." On motion submitted by a member of the Bar of this Court, attorney Nimra H. Azmi seeks pro hac vice admission to represent Plaintiff in this case. Ms. Azmi declares that she works from an office located in the District of Columbia and that she has a pending application for membership to the District of Columbia Bar. Notwithstanding Local Rule 83.2(c)(2), it is hereby ORDERED that Nimra H. Azmi is admitted to represent Plaintiff pro hac vice in this case. As soon as practicable after Ms. Azmi's admission to the District of Columbia Bar, she must seek admission to the Bar of this Court. SO ORDERED. Signed by Judge Rudolph Contreras on August 27, 2018. (lcrc2) (Entered: 08/27/2018)
2018-08-273SUMMONS (4) Issued Electronically as to UNITED STATES DEPARTMENT OF JUSTICE, UNITED STATES IMMIGRATION AND CUSTOMS ENFORCEMENT, U.S. Attorney and U.S. Attorney General (Attachments: # 1 Notice and Consent) (zmd) (Entered: 08/27/2018)
2018-08-284NOTICE of Appearance by Sirine Shebaya on behalf of MUSLIM ADVOCATES (Shebaya, Sirine) (Entered: 08/28/2018)
2018-09-065NOTICE of Appearance by Johnny Hillary Walker, III on behalf of All Defendants (Walker, Johnny) (Entered: 09/06/2018)
2018-09-106RETURN OF SERVICE/AFFIDAVIT of Summons and Complaint Executed. UNITED STATES DEPARTMENT OF JUSTICE served on 8/29/2018, RETURN OF SERVICE/AFFIDAVIT of Summons and Complaint Executed on United States Attorney General. Date of Service Upon United States Attorney General 8/29/2018., RETURN OF SERVICE/AFFIDAVIT of Summons and Complaint Executed as to the United States Attorney. Date of Service Upon United States Attorney on 8/29/2018. ( Answer due for ALL FEDERAL DEFENDANTS by 9/28/2018.) (Shebaya, Sirine) (Entered: 09/10/2018)
2018-09-107RETURN OF SERVICE/AFFIDAVIT of Summons and Complaint Executed. UNITED STATES IMMIGRATION AND CUSTOMS ENFORCEMENT served on 9/10/2018 (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit A)(Shebaya, Sirine) (Entered: 09/10/2018)
2018-09-278Consent MOTION for Extension of Time to File Answer by UNITED STATES DEPARTMENT OF JUSTICE, UNITED STATES IMMIGRATION AND CUSTOMS ENFORCEMENT (Attachments: # 1 Text of Proposed Order)(Walker, Johnny) (Entered: 09/27/2018)
2018-09-27MINUTE ORDER granting 8 Defendants' Consent Motion for Extension of Time: It is hereby ORDERED that Defendants shall have up to and including October 12, 2018 to answer or otherwise respond to Plaintiff's complaint. SO ORDERED. Signed by Judge Rudolph Contreras on 9/27/18. (lcrc1) (Entered: 09/27/2018)
2018-10-129ANSWER to Complaint by UNITED STATES DEPARTMENT OF JUSTICE, UNITED STATES IMMIGRATION AND CUSTOMS ENFORCEMENT.(Walker, Johnny) (Entered: 10/12/2018)
2018-10-12MINUTE ORDER: It is hereby ORDERED that the parties shall meet, confer, and jointly submit a proposed briefing schedule on or before October 26, 2018. SO ORDERED. Signed by Judge Rudolph Contreras on 10/12/2018. (lcrc2) (Entered: 10/12/2018)
2018-10-12Set/Reset Deadlines: Proposed Briefing Schedule due by 10/26/2018 (tj) (Entered: 10/12/2018)
2018-10-2610Joint STATUS REPORT by UNITED STATES DEPARTMENT OF JUSTICE, UNITED STATES IMMIGRATION AND CUSTOMS ENFORCEMENT. (Walker, Johnny) (Entered: 10/26/2018)
2018-10-26MINUTE ORDER: Upon consideration of 10 the parties' Joint Status Report, it is hereby ORDERED that the parties shall submit another joint status report by December 10, 2018. SO ORDERED. Signed by Judge Rudolph Contreras on 10/26/2018. (lcrc2) (Entered: 10/26/2018)
2018-12-1011Joint STATUS REPORT by UNITED STATES DEPARTMENT OF JUSTICE, UNITED STATES IMMIGRATION AND CUSTOMS ENFORCEMENT. (Walker, Johnny) (Entered: 12/10/2018)
2018-12-10MINUTE ORDER: Upon consideration of 11 the parties' Joint Status Report, it is hereby ORDERED that the parties shall file another joint status report by January 24, 2019. SO ORDERED. Signed by Judge Rudolph Contreras on December 10, 2018. (lcrc2) (Entered: 12/10/2018)
2018-12-13Set/Reset Deadlines: Status Report due by 1/24/2019 (tj) (Entered: 12/13/2018)
2019-01-2312Unopposed MOTION to Stay and for extension of time by UNITED STATES DEPARTMENT OF JUSTICE, UNITED STATES IMMIGRATION AND CUSTOMS ENFORCEMENT (Attachments: # 1 Text of Proposed Order)(Coles-Huff, Doris). Added MOTION for Extension of Time to on 1/28/2019 (znmw). (Entered: 01/23/2019)
2019-01-24MINUTE ORDER granting 12 Motion to Stay: It is hereby ORDERED that this case is stayed until appropriations are restored to the Department of Justice. The deadline for submitting the joint status report, previously due on January 24, 2019, is extended until 14 days after appropriations are restored. SO ORDERED. Signed by Judge Rudolph Contreras on January 24, 2019. (lcrc2) (Entered: 01/24/2019)
2019-02-0113NOTICE OF WITHDRAWAL OF APPEARANCE as to MUSLIM ADVOCATES. Attorney Johnathan James Smith terminated. (Smith, Johnathan) (Entered: 02/01/2019)
2019-02-0814Joint STATUS REPORT by UNITED STATES DEPARTMENT OF JUSTICE, UNITED STATES IMMIGRATION AND CUSTOMS ENFORCEMENT. (Walker, Johnny) (Entered: 02/08/2019)
2019-02-08MINUTE ORDER: Upon consideration of 14 the parties' joint status report, it is hereby ORDERED that the parties will file another joint status report by March 8, 2019. SO ORDERED. Signed by Judge Rudolph Contreras on February 8, 2019. (lcrc2) (Entered: 02/08/2019)
Hide Docket Events
by FOIA Project Staff
Skip to toolbar