Skip to content

Case Detail

[Subscribe to updates]
Case TitleDEMOCRACY FORWARD FOUNDATION v. CONSUMER FINANCIAL PROTECTION BUREAU
DistrictDistrict of Columbia
CityWashington, DC
Case Number1:2018cv01974
Date Filed2018-08-23
Date ClosedOpen
JudgeJudge Dabney L. Friedrich
PlaintiffDEMOCRACY FORWARD FOUNDATION
Case DescriptionDemocracy Forward Foundation submitted a FOIA request to the Consumer Financial Protection Bureau for records concerning communications between the agency and the Consumer Financial Services Federation of America, the Consumer Service Alliance of Texas, and their representatives. DFF also requested a fee waiver. The agency acknowledged receipt of the request and told DFF that it would hold its fee waiver request in abeyance. After hearing nothing further from the agency, DFF filed suit.
Complaint issues: Failure to respond within statutory time limit, Adequacy - Search, Litigation - Vaughn index, Public Interest Fee Waiver, Litigation - Attorney's fees

DefendantCONSUMER FINANCIAL PROTECTION BUREAU
1700 G Street NW
Washington, DC 20552
DefendantCONSUMER FINANCIAL PROTECTION BUREAU
Documents
Docket
Complaint
Complaint attachment 1
Complaint attachment 2
Complaint attachment 3
Complaint attachment 4
Complaint attachment 5
Complaint attachment 6
User-contributed Documents
 
Docket Events (Hide)
Date FiledDoc #Docket Text

2018-08-231COMPLAINT against CONSUMER FINANCIAL PROTECTION BUREAU ( Filing fee $ 400 receipt number 0090-5655513) filed by DEMOCRACY FORWARD FOUNDATION. (Attachments: # 1 Civil Cover Sheet, # 2 Exhibit, # 3 Exhibit, # 4 Summons, # 5 Summons, # 6 Summons)(Shah, Nitin) (Entered: 08/23/2018)
2018-08-232LCvR 7.1 CERTIFICATE OF DISCLOSURE of Corporate Affiliations and Financial Interests by DEMOCRACY FORWARD FOUNDATION (Shah, Nitin) (Entered: 08/23/2018)
2018-08-23Case Assigned to Judge Dabney L. Friedrich. (zmd) (Entered: 08/24/2018)
2018-08-273SUMMONS (3) Issued Electronically as to CONSUMER FINANCIAL PROTECTION BUREAU, U.S. Attorney and U.S. Attorney General (Attachments: # 1 Notice and Consent) (zmd) (Entered: 08/27/2018)
2018-09-054RETURN OF SERVICE/AFFIDAVIT of Summons and Complaint Executed as to the United States Attorney. Date of Service Upon United States Attorney on 8/30/2018. ( Answer due for ALL FEDERAL DEFENDANTS by 9/29/2018.), RETURN OF SERVICE/AFFIDAVIT of Summons and Complaint Executed. CONSUMER FINANCIAL PROTECTION BUREAU served on 8/29/2018, RETURN OF SERVICE/AFFIDAVIT of Summons and Complaint Executed on United States Attorney General. Date of Service Upon United States Attorney General 9/4/2018. (Attachments: # 1 Declaration)(Shah, Nitin) (Entered: 09/05/2018)
Hide Docket Events
by FOIA Project Staff
Skip to toolbar