Skip to content

Case Detail

[Subscribe to updates]
Case TitleAMERICAN OVERSIGHT v. UNITED STATES DEPARTMENT OF JUSTICE et al
DistrictDistrict of Columbia
CityWashington, DC
Case Number1:2018cv02025
Date Filed2018-08-29
Date ClosedOpen
JudgeJudge Amit P. Mehta
PlaintiffAMERICAN OVERSIGHT
Case DescriptionAmerican Oversight submitted FOIA requests to five departments, the Federal Communications Commission, and the Centers for Medicare and Medicaid Services for records concerning contacts, including social media, with either Michael Cohen or Cory Lewandowski. The agencies acknowledged receipt of the requests. Several agencies told American Oversight that its request involved unusual circumstances and would take more time to process. After none of the agencies provided a response, American Oversight filed suit.
Complaint issues: Failure to respond within statutory time limit, Adequacy - Search, Litigation - Attorney's fees

DefendantUNITED STATES DEPARTMENT OF JUSTICE
DefendantUNITED STATES DEPARTMENT OF THE TREASURY
DefendantUNITED STATES DEPARTMENT OF STATE
DefendantUNITED STATES DEPARTMENT OF DEFENSE
DefendantUNITED STATES DEPARTMENT OF HEALTH AND HUMAN SERVICES
DefendantFEDERAL COMMUNICATIONS COMMISSION
DefendantCENTERS FOR MEDICARE AND MEDICAID SERVICES
Documents
Docket
Complaint
Complaint attachment 1
Complaint attachment 2
Complaint attachment 3
Complaint attachment 4
Complaint attachment 5
Complaint attachment 6
Complaint attachment 7
Complaint attachment 8
Complaint attachment 9
Complaint attachment 10
User-contributed Documents
 
Docket Events (Hide)
Date FiledDoc #Docket Text

2018-08-291COMPLAINT against CENTERS FOR MEDICARE AND MEDICAID SERVICES, FEDERAL COMMUNICATIONS COMMISSION, UNITED STATES DEPARTMENT OF DEFENSE, UNITED STATES DEPARTMENT OF HEALTH AND HUMAN SERVICES, UNITED STATES DEPARTMENT OF JUSTICE, UNITED STATES DEPARTMENT OF STATE, UNITED STATES DEPARTMENT OF THE TREASURY ( Filing fee $ 400 receipt number 0090-5663827) filed by AMERICAN OVERSIGHT. (Attachments: # 1 Civil Cover Sheet, # 2 Summons U.S. Attorney, # 3 Summons Attorney General, # 4 Summons U.S. Department of Justice, # 5 Summons U.S. Department of Treasury, # 6 Summons U.S. Department of State, # 7 Summons U.S. Department of Defense, # 8 Summons U.S. Department of Health and Human Services, # 9 Summons Federal Communications Commission, # 10 Summons Centers for Medicare and Medicaid Services)(France, Elizabeth) (Entered: 08/29/2018)
2018-08-292LCvR 7.1 CERTIFICATE OF DISCLOSURE of Corporate Affiliations and Financial Interests by AMERICAN OVERSIGHT (France, Elizabeth) (Entered: 08/29/2018)
2018-08-29Case Assigned to Judge Amit P. Mehta. (zmd) (Entered: 08/30/2018)
2018-08-313SUMMONS (9) Issued Electronically as to CENTERS FOR MEDICARE AND MEDICAID SERVICES, FEDERAL COMMUNICATIONS COMMISSION, UNITED STATES DEPARTMENT OF DEFENSE, UNITED STATES DEPARTMENT OF HEALTH AND HUMAN SERVICES, UNITED STATES DEPARTMENT OF JUSTICE, UNITED STATES DEPARTMENT OF STATE, UNITED STATES DEPARTMENT OF THE TREASURY, U.S. Attorney and U.S. Attorney General (Attachments: # 1 Notice and Consent) (zmd) (Entered: 08/31/2018)
2018-09-194RETURN OF SERVICE/AFFIDAVIT of Summons and Complaint Executed as to the United States Attorney. Date of Service Upon United States Attorney on 9/4/2018. ( Answer due for ALL FEDERAL DEFENDANTS by 10/4/2018.), RETURN OF SERVICE/AFFIDAVIT of Summons and Complaint Executed on United States Attorney General. Date of Service Upon United States Attorney General 9/10/2018., RETURN OF SERVICE/AFFIDAVIT of Summons and Complaint Executed. CENTERS FOR MEDICARE AND MEDICAID SERVICES served on 9/6/2018; FEDERAL COMMUNICATIONS COMMISSION served on 9/10/2018; UNITED STATES DEPARTMENT OF DEFENSE served on 9/7/2018; UNITED STATES DEPARTMENT OF HEALTH AND HUMAN SERVICES served on 9/7/2018; UNITED STATES DEPARTMENT OF JUSTICE served on 9/10/2018; UNITED STATES DEPARTMENT OF STATE served on 9/10/2018; UNITED STATES DEPARTMENT OF THE TREASURY served on 9/10/2018 (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit A)(France, Elizabeth) (Entered: 09/19/2018)
2018-09-275NOTICE of Appearance by Denise M. Clark on behalf of CENTERS FOR MEDICARE AND MEDICAID SERVICES, FEDERAL COMMUNICATIONS COMMISSION, UNITED STATES DEPARTMENT OF DEFENSE, UNITED STATES DEPARTMENT OF HEALTH AND HUMAN SERVICES, UNITED STATES DEPARTMENT OF JUSTICE, UNITED STATES DEPARTMENT OF STATE, UNITED STATES DEPARTMENT OF THE TREASURY (Clark, Denise) (Entered: 09/27/2018)
2018-09-276Unopposed MOTION for Extension of Time to Respond by CENTERS FOR MEDICARE AND MEDICAID SERVICES, FEDERAL COMMUNICATIONS COMMISSION, UNITED STATES DEPARTMENT OF DEFENSE, UNITED STATES DEPARTMENT OF HEALTH AND HUMAN SERVICES, UNITED STATES DEPARTMENT OF JUSTICE, UNITED STATES DEPARTMENT OF STATE, UNITED STATES DEPARTMENT OF THE TREASURY (Clark, Denise) (Entered: 09/27/2018)
2018-09-28MINUTE ORDER granting Defendants' 6 Unopposed Motion for Extension of Time to File Response. The Defendants' Response shall be due on or before October 18, 2018. Signed by Judge Amit P. Mehta on 09/28/2018. (lcapm3) (Entered: 09/28/2018)
2018-09-28Set/Reset Deadlines: Defendants' Response due by 10/18/2018. (zjd) (Entered: 10/01/2018)
2018-10-187ANSWER to Complaint by CENTERS FOR MEDICARE AND MEDICAID SERVICES, FEDERAL COMMUNICATIONS COMMISSION, UNITED STATES DEPARTMENT OF DEFENSE, UNITED STATES DEPARTMENT OF HEALTH AND HUMAN SERVICES, UNITED STATES DEPARTMENT OF JUSTICE, UNITED STATES DEPARTMENT OF STATE, UNITED STATES DEPARTMENT OF THE TREASURY.(Clark, Denise) (Entered: 10/18/2018)
2018-10-198ORDER. Both a Complaint and an Answer are now before the court in this FOIA case. It is hereby ordered that the parties shall meet and confer and file a Joint Status Report on or before November 2, 2018. See attached Order for additional details. Signed by Judge Amit P. Mehta on 10/19/2018. (lcapm3) (Entered: 10/19/2018)
2018-10-19Set/Reset Deadlines: Joint Status Report due by 11/2/2018. (zjd) (Entered: 10/19/2018)
Hide Docket Events
by FOIA Project Staff
Skip to toolbar