Skip to content

Case Detail

[Subscribe to updates]
Case TitleCOLUMBUS REGIONAL HOSPITAL v. FEDERAL EMERGENCY MANAGEMENT AGENCY
DistrictDistrict of Columbia
CityWashington, DC
Case Number1:2018cv02028
Date Filed2018-08-29
Date ClosedOpen
JudgeJudge Amy Berman Jackson
PlaintiffCOLUMBUS REGIONAL HOSPITAL
Case DescriptionThe Columbus Regional Hospital in Columbus, Indiana, submitted two FOIA requests to the Federal Emergency Management Agency for records the agency relied upon in denying the hospital's two appeals of the agency's decision to recover $9.6 million in disaster assistance funds from the hospital. The agency acknowledged receipt of the requests and provided an estimated fee of $600, which the hospital agreed to pay. FEMA then told the hospital that because of the size of the hospital's requests, the agency would need more time to process the requests. After hearing nothing further from the agency, Columbus Regional Hospital filed suit.
Complaint issues: Failure to respond within statutory time limit, Litigation - Vaughn index, Litigation - Attorney's fees

DefendantFEDERAL EMERGENCY MANAGEMENT AGENCY
Documents
Docket
Complaint
Complaint attachment 1
Complaint attachment 2
Complaint attachment 3
Complaint attachment 4
User-contributed Documents
 
Docket Events (Hide)
Date FiledDoc #Docket Text

2018-08-291COMPLAINT against FEDERAL EMERGENCY MANAGEMENT AGENCY ( Filing fee $ 400 receipt number 0090-5664415) filed by COLUMBUS REGIONAL HOSPITAL. (Attachments: # 1 Summons to FEMA, # 2 Summons to DC USAO, # 3 Summons to US DOJ, # 4 Civil Cover Sheet)(Molter, Derek) (Entered: 08/29/2018)
2018-08-292NOTICE of Appearance by Derek R. Molter on behalf of COLUMBUS REGIONAL HOSPITAL (Molter, Derek) (Entered: 08/29/2018)
2018-08-293Corporate Disclosure Statement by COLUMBUS REGIONAL HOSPITAL. (Molter, Derek) (Entered: 08/29/2018)
2018-08-294MOTION for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice :Attorney Name- Joshua D. Schnell, :Firm- Ice Miller LLP, :Address- 20 F St. NW, Suite 850, Washington, DC 20001. Phone No. - 202-572-1603. Fax No. - 202-572-1604 Filing fee $ 100, receipt number 0090-5664478. Fee Status: Fee Paid. by COLUMBUS REGIONAL HOSPITAL (Attachments: # 1 Declaration of Schnell, # 2 Text of Proposed Order)(Molter, Derek) (Entered: 08/29/2018)
2018-08-31Case Assigned to Judge Amy Berman Jackson. (zsb) (Entered: 08/31/2018)
2018-09-045ERRATA by COLUMBUS REGIONAL HOSPITAL 1 Complaint, filed by COLUMBUS REGIONAL HOSPITAL. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit A - Complaint Page 1)(Molter, Derek) (Entered: 09/04/2018)
2018-09-056SUMMONS (3) Issued Electronically as to FEDERAL EMERGENCY MANAGEMENT AGENCY, U.S. Attorney and U.S. Attorney General (Attachment: # 1 Notice and Consent)(zsb) (Entered: 09/05/2018)
2018-09-05MINUTE ORDER granting 4 Motion for Leave of Joshua D. Schnell to Appear Pro Hac Vice only upon condition that the lawyer admitted, or at least one member of the lawyer's firm, undergo CM/ECF training, obtain a CM/ECF username and password, and agree to file papers electronically. No court papers will be mailed to any lawyer. Signed by Judge Amy Berman Jackson on 9/5/18. (DMK) (Entered: 09/05/2018)
2018-09-247RETURN OF SERVICE/AFFIDAVIT of Summons and Complaint Executed as to the United States Attorney. Date of Service Upon United States Attorney on 9/10/2018. Answer due for ALL FEDERAL DEFENDANTS by 10/10/2018. (Schnell, Joshua) (Entered: 09/24/2018)
2018-09-248RETURN OF SERVICE/AFFIDAVIT of Summons and Complaint Executed. FEDERAL EMERGENCY MANAGEMENT AGENCY served on 9/10/2018, RETURN OF SERVICE/AFFIDAVIT of Summons and Complaint Executed on United States Attorney General. Date of Service Upon United States Attorney General 9/10/2018. (See Docket Entry 7 to view document) (jf) (Entered: 09/24/2018)
2018-10-109ANSWER to Complaint by FEDERAL EMERGENCY MANAGEMENT AGENCY.(Peterson, Benton) (Entered: 10/10/2018)
2018-10-1110ORDER that defendant file on or before November 8, 2018 a dispositive motion or, in the alternative, a report setting forth the schedule for document production to plaintiff. See ORDER for details. Signed by Judge Amy Berman Jackson on 10/11/18. (DMK) (Entered: 10/11/2018)
Hide Docket Events
by FOIA Project Staff
Skip to toolbar