Skip to content

Case Detail

[Subscribe to updates]
Case TitlePROJECT ON GOVERNMENT OVERSIGHT, INC. v. U.S. DEPARTMENT OF HOMELAND SECURITY, OFFICE FOR CIVIL RIGHTS AND CIVIL LIBERTIES
DistrictDistrict of Columbia
CityWashington, DC
Case Number1:2018cv02051
Date Filed2018-08-31
Date ClosedOpen
JudgeJudge Royce C. Lamberth
PlaintiffPROJECT ON GOVERNMENT OVERSIGHT, INC.
Case DescriptionThe Project on Government Accountability submitted two FOIA requests to the Office for Civil Rights and Civil Liberties at the Department of Homeland Security for records concerning complaints and investigations conducted by the Office. POGO also requested a fee waiver. The agency acknowledged receipt of the requests and granted POGO's request for a fee waiver. After hearing nothing further from the agency as to either request, POGO filed suit.
Complaint issues: Failure to respond within statutory time limit, Litigation - Attorney's fees

DefendantU.S. DEPARTMENT OF HOMELAND SECURITY, OFFICE FOR CIVIL RIGHTS AND CIVIL LIBERTIES
Documents
Docket
Complaint
Complaint attachment 1
Complaint attachment 2
Complaint attachment 3
Complaint attachment 4
Complaint attachment 5
Complaint attachment 6
Complaint attachment 7
Complaint attachment 8
Complaint attachment 9
Complaint attachment 10
Complaint attachment 11
Complaint attachment 12
User-contributed Documents
 
Docket Events (Hide)
Date FiledDoc #Docket Text

2018-08-311COMPLAINT against DEPARTMENT OF HOMELAND SECURITY OFFICE FOR CIVIL RIGHTS AND CIVIL LIBERTIES ( Filing fee $ 400 receipt number 0090-5668242) filed by PROJECT ON GOVERNMENT OVERSIGHT (POGO). (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit A, # 2 Exhibit B, # 3 Exhibit C, # 4 Exhibit D, # 5 Exhibit E, # 6 Exhibit F, # 7 Exhibit G, # 8 Exhibit H, # 9 Civil Cover Sheet, # 10 Summons CRCL, # 11 Summons USAG, # 12 Summons USAO)(Nabatoff, Ross) (Attachment 9 replaced on 9/10/2018) (znmw). (Entered: 08/31/2018)
2018-08-31Case Assigned to Judge Royce C. Lamberth. (sth) (Entered: 09/04/2018)
2018-09-042SUMMONS (2) Issued Electronically as to U.S. DEPARTMENT OF HOMELAND SECURITY, OFFICE FOR CIVIL RIGHTS AND CIVIL LIBERTIES and U.S. Attorney General (Attachments: # 1 Notice and Consent)(sth) (Entered: 09/04/2018)
2018-09-05SUMMONS Not Issued as to U.S. Attorney's Office(zsth) (Entered: 09/05/2018)
2018-09-053NOTICE of Summons by PROJECT ON GOVERNMENT OVERSIGHT, INC. re Summons Not Issued, 1 Complaint, (Nabatoff, Ross) (Entered: 09/05/2018)
2018-09-054SUMMONS (1) Issued Electronically as to, U.S. Attorney for D.C. (jf) (Entered: 09/05/2018)
2018-09-275RETURN OF SERVICE/AFFIDAVIT of Summons and Complaint Executed as to the United States Attorney. Date of Service Upon United States Attorney on 9/10/2018. Answer due for ALL FEDERAL DEFENDANTS by 10/10/2018. (Nabatoff, Ross) (Entered: 09/27/2018)
2018-09-276RETURN OF SERVICE/AFFIDAVIT of Summons and Complaint Executed on United States Attorney General. Date of Service Upon United States Attorney General 9/10/18. (Nabatoff, Ross) (Entered: 09/27/2018)
2018-09-277RETURN OF SERVICE/AFFIDAVIT of Summons and Complaint Executed. U.S. DEPARTMENT OF HOMELAND SECURITY, OFFICE FOR CIVIL RIGHTS AND CIVIL LIBERTIES served on 9/7/2017 (Nabatoff, Ross) (Entered: 09/27/2018)
2018-10-108NOTICE of Appearance by Daniel Patrick Schaefer on behalf of U.S. DEPARTMENT OF HOMELAND SECURITY, OFFICE FOR CIVIL RIGHTS AND CIVIL LIBERTIES (Schaefer, Daniel) (Entered: 10/10/2018)
2018-10-159Consent MOTION for Extension of Time to File Answer re 1 Complaint,, by U.S. DEPARTMENT OF HOMELAND SECURITY, OFFICE FOR CIVIL RIGHTS AND CIVIL LIBERTIES (Attachments: # 1 Defendant's Answer, # 2 Text of Proposed Order)(Schaefer, Daniel) (Entered: 10/15/2018)
2018-10-1610ORDER granting 9 Motion for Extension of Time to Answer; further ORDERED that defendant's answer [9-1] shall be deemed filed. Signed by Judge Royce C. Lamberth on 10/16/2018. (lcrcl2) (Entered: 10/16/2018)
Hide Docket Events
by FOIA Project Staff
Skip to toolbar