Skip to content

Case Detail

[Subscribe to updates]
Case TitleWHITE COAT WASTE PROJECT v. UNITED STATES DEPARTMENT OF AGRICULTURE
DistrictDistrict of Columbia
CityWashington, DC
Case Number1:2018cv02070
Date Filed2018-09-04
Date ClosedOpen
JudgeJudge Dabney L. Friedrich
PlaintiffWHITE COAT WASTE PROJECT
Case DescriptionThe White Coat Waste Project submitted a FOIA request to the Department of Agriculture for the Institutional Animal Care and Use Committee-approved protocols for laboratory tests on cats at the Agricultural Research Service. After hearing nothing further from the agency, White Coat Waste Project filed suit.
Complaint issues: Failure to respond within statutory time limit, Litigation - Attorney's fees

DefendantUNITED STATES DEPARTMENT OF AGRICULTURE
Documents
Docket
Complaint
Complaint attachment 1
Complaint attachment 2
Complaint attachment 3
Complaint attachment 4
User-contributed Documents
 
Docket Events (Hide)
Date FiledDoc #Docket Text

2018-09-041COMPLAINT against UNITED STATES DEPARTMENT OF AGRICULTURE ( Filing fee $ 400 receipt number 0090-5669354) filed by WHITE COAT WASTE PROJECT. (Attachments: # 1 Civil Cover Sheet, # 2 Summons, # 3 Summons, # 4 Summons)(Strugar, Matthew) (Entered: 09/04/2018)
2018-09-042LCvR 7.1 CERTIFICATE OF DISCLOSURE of Corporate Affiliations and Financial Interests by WHITE COAT WASTE PROJECT (Strugar, Matthew) (Entered: 09/04/2018)
2018-09-06Case Assigned to Judge Dabney L. Friedrich. (zsb) (Entered: 09/06/2018)
2018-09-063SUMMONS (3) Issued Electronically as to UNITED STATES DEPARTMENT OF AGRICULTURE, U.S. Attorney and U.S. Attorney General (Attachment: # 1 Notice and Consent)(zsb) (Entered: 09/06/2018)
2019-01-244RETURN OF SERVICE/AFFIDAVIT of Summons and Complaint Executed as to the United States Attorney. Date of Service Upon United States Attorney on 1/23/2019. Answer due for ALL FEDERAL DEFENDANTS by 2/22/2019. (Strugar, Matthew) (Entered: 01/24/2019)
2019-02-215NOTICE of Appearance by Matthew Evan Kahn on behalf of UNITED STATES DEPARTMENT OF AGRICULTURE (Kahn, Matthew) (Entered: 02/21/2019)
2019-02-216Consent MOTION for Extension of Time to File Answer re 1 Complaint, by UNITED STATES DEPARTMENT OF AGRICULTURE (Kahn, Matthew) (Entered: 02/21/2019)
2019-02-22MINUTE ORDER granting the defendant's 6 Unopposed Motion for Extension of Time. Accordingly, it is ORDERED that the defendant shall file an answer or other response to the plaintiff's complaint on or before March 22, 2019. Signed by Judge Dabney L. Friedrich on February 22, 2019. (lcdlf1) (Entered: 02/22/2019)
2019-03-207NOTICE of Appearance by Matthew Evan Kahn on behalf of UNITED STATES DEPARTMENT OF AGRICULTURE (Kahn, Matthew) (Entered: 03/20/2019)
2019-03-208ANSWER to Complaint by UNITED STATES DEPARTMENT OF AGRICULTURE.(Kahn, Matthew) (Entered: 03/20/2019)
2019-03-20MINUTE ORDER requiring the parties to MEET AND CONFER and file a joint status report proposing a schedule for further proceedings. The parties shall file the joint status report on or before April 10, 2019. Signed by Judge Dabney L. Friedrich on March 20, 2019. (lcdlf1) (Entered: 03/20/2019)
Hide Docket Events
by FOIA Project Staff
Skip to toolbar