Skip to content

Case Detail

[Subscribe to updates]
Case TitleLAMBDA LEGAL DEFENSE & EDUCATION FUND, INC. v. OFFICE OF MANAGEMENT AND BUDGET
DistrictDistrict of Columbia
CityWashington, DC
Case Number1:2018cv02073
Date Filed2018-09-04
Date ClosedOpen
JudgeJudge Amy Berman Jackson
PlaintiffLAMBDA LEGAL DEFENSE & EDUCATION FUND, INC.
Case DescriptionThe Lambda Legal Defense Fund submitted three FOIA requests to OMB for records concerning Brett Kavanaugh's involvement with LGBT issues when he served in the Bush administration. The Lambda Legal Defense Fund also requested expedited processing. The agency acknowledged receipt of the requests but after hearing nothing further from the agency, the Lambda Legal Defense Fund filed suit.
Complaint issues: Failure to respond within statutory time limit, Expedited processing, Litigation - Attorney's fees

DefendantOFFICE OF MANAGEMENT AND BUDGET
Documents
Docket
Complaint
Complaint attachment 1
Complaint attachment 2
Complaint attachment 3
Complaint attachment 4
Complaint attachment 5
Complaint attachment 6
Complaint attachment 7
User-contributed Documents
 
Docket Events (Hide)
Date FiledDoc #Docket Text

2018-09-041COMPLAINT against OFFICE OF MANAGEMENT AND BUDGET ( Filing fee $ 400 receipt number 0090-5670629) filed by LAMBDA LEGAL DEFENSE & EDUCATION FUND, INC.. (Attachments: # 1 Civil Cover Sheet, # 2 Exhibit A, # 3 Exhibit B, # 4 Exhibit C, # 5 Summons U.S. Attorney's Office, # 6 Summons U.S. Attorney General, # 7 Summons OMB)(France, Elizabeth) (Entered: 09/04/2018)
2018-09-042LCvR 7.1 CERTIFICATE OF DISCLOSURE of Corporate Affiliations and Financial Interests by LAMBDA LEGAL DEFENSE & EDUCATION FUND, INC. (France, Elizabeth) (Entered: 09/04/2018)
2018-09-04Case Assigned to Judge Dabney L. Friedrich. (zsth) (Entered: 09/05/2018)
2018-09-053SUMMONS (3) Issued Electronically as to OFFICE OF MANAGEMENT AND BUDGET, U.S. Attorney and U.S. Attorney General (Attachments: # 1 Notice and Consent)(zsth) (Entered: 09/05/2018)
2018-09-054Case reassigned to Judge Amy Berman Jackson. Judge Dabney L. Friedrich is no longer assigned to the case. (rj) (Entered: 09/05/2018)
2018-09-285RETURN OF SERVICE/AFFIDAVIT of Summons and Complaint Executed as to the United States Attorney. Date of Service Upon United States Attorney on 9/10/2018. ( Answer due for ALL FEDERAL DEFENDANTS by 10/10/2018.), RETURN OF SERVICE/AFFIDAVIT of Summons and Complaint Executed on United States Attorney General. Date of Service Upon United States Attorney General 9/17/2018., RETURN OF SERVICE/AFFIDAVIT of Summons and Complaint Executed. OFFICE OF MANAGEMENT AND BUDGET served on 9/17/2018 (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit A)(France, Elizabeth) (Entered: 09/28/2018)
2018-10-056NOTICE of Appearance by Michael Fraser Knapp on behalf of All Defendants (Knapp, Michael) (Entered: 10/05/2018)
2018-10-097AMENDED COMPLAINT against OFFICE OF MANAGEMENT AND BUDGET filed by LAMBDA LEGAL DEFENSE & EDUCATION FUND, INC.. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit A, # 2 Exhibit B, # 3 Exhibit C)(France, Elizabeth) (Entered: 10/09/2018)
Hide Docket Events
by FOIA Project Staff
Skip to toolbar