Skip to content

Case Detail

[Subscribe to updates]
Case TitleCOLEMAN v. U.S. DEPARTMENT OF THE INTERIOR
DistrictDistrict of Columbia
CityWashington, DC
Case Number1:2018cv02089
Date Filed2018-09-06
Date ClosedOpen
JudgeJudge Rudolph Contreras
PlaintiffJESSE COLEMAN
Case DescriptionJesse Coleman, a researcher for Documented in Madison, Wisconsin, submitted five FOIA requests to the Department of the Interior for records concerning communications and calendars for a number of agency officials. The agency acknowledged receipt of the requests. The agency told Coleman that it had classified him as a commercial requester and that several of his requests qualified for unusual circumstances. After hearing nothing further from the agency pertaining to any of his requests, Coleman filed suit.
Complaint issues: Failure to respond within statutory time limit, Litigation - Attorney's fees

DefendantU.S. DEPARTMENT OF THE INTERIOR
Documents
Docket
Complaint
Complaint attachment 1
Complaint attachment 2
Complaint attachment 3
Complaint attachment 4
User-contributed Documents
 
Docket Events (Hide)
Date FiledDoc #Docket Text

2018-09-061COMPLAINT against U.S. DEPARTMENT OF THE INTERIOR ( Filing fee $ 400 receipt number 0090-5675156) filed by JESSE COLEMAN. (Attachments: # 1 Civil Cover Sheet, # 2 Summons to Attorney General, # 3 Summons to Agency, # 4 Summons to USAO)(Llewellyn, Patrick) (Entered: 09/06/2018)
2018-09-07Case Assigned to Judge Rudolph Contreras. (zsb) (Entered: 09/07/2018)
2018-09-072SUMMONS (3) Issued Electronically as to U.S. DEPARTMENT OF THE INTERIOR, U.S. Attorney and U.S. Attorney General (Attachment: # 1 Notice and Consent)(zsb) (Entered: 09/07/2018)
2018-09-113RETURN OF SERVICE/AFFIDAVIT of Summons and Complaint Executed as to the United States Attorney. Date of Service Upon United States Attorney on 9/11/2018. Answer due for ALL FEDERAL DEFENDANTS by 10/11/2018. (Llewellyn, Patrick) (Entered: 09/11/2018)
2018-10-114ANSWER to Complaint by U.S. DEPARTMENT OF THE INTERIOR.(McBride, Patricia) (Entered: 10/11/2018)
2018-10-11MINUTE ORDER: It is hereby ORDERED that the parties shall meet, confer, and jointly submit a proposed briefing schedule on or before October 25, 2018. SO ORDERED. Signed by Judge Rudolph Contreras on 10/11/2018. (lcrc2) (Entered: 10/11/2018)
2018-10-255Joint STATUS REPORT by U.S. DEPARTMENT OF THE INTERIOR. (Attachments: # 1 Text of Proposed Order)(McBride, Patricia) (Entered: 10/25/2018)
2018-10-25MINUTE ORDER: Upon consideration of 5 the parties' Joint Status Report, it is hereby ORDERED that the parties will submit another joint status report by November 30, 2018. SO ORDERED. Signed by Judge Rudolph Contreras on 10/25/2018. (lcrc2) (Entered: 10/25/2018)
2018-10-26Set/Reset Deadlines: Status Report due by 11/30/2018 (tj) (Entered: 10/26/2018)
2018-11-296MOTION for Extension of Time to file Joint Status Report by U.S. DEPARTMENT OF THE INTERIOR (Attachments: # 1 Text of Proposed Order)(McBride, Patricia) (Entered: 11/29/2018)
2018-11-29MINUTE ORDER granting 6 Motion for Extension of Time: It is hereby ORDERED that the motion is GRANTED. Defendant shall file its joint status report by December 7, 2018. SO ORDERED. Signed by Judge Rudolph Contreras on November 29, 2018. (lcrc2) (Entered: 11/29/2018)
2018-11-30Set/Reset Deadlines: Status Report due by 12/7/2018 (tj) (Entered: 11/30/2018)
2018-12-067Joint STATUS REPORT by JESSE COLEMAN. (Attachments: # 1 Text of Proposed Order)(Llewellyn, Patrick) (Entered: 12/06/2018)
2018-12-06MINUTE ORDER: Upon consideration of 7 the parties' Joint Status Report, it is hereby ORDERED that the parties shall file another joint status report by December 21, 2018. SO ORDERED. Signed by Judge Rudolph Contreras on December 6, 2018. (lcrc2) (Entered: 12/06/2018)
2018-12-10Set/Reset Deadlines: Status Report due by 12/21/2018 (tj) (Entered: 12/10/2018)
2018-12-218Joint STATUS REPORT by JESSE COLEMAN. (Llewellyn, Patrick) (Entered: 12/21/2018)
2018-12-27MINUTE ORDER: Upon consideration of 8 the parties' Joint Status Report, it is hereby ORDERED that the parties will file another joint status report by January 17, 2019. SO ORDERED. Signed by Judge Rudolph Contreras on December 27, 2018. (lcrc2) (Entered: 12/27/2018)
2018-12-27Set/Reset Deadlines: Joint Status Report due by 1/17/2019. (gdf) (Entered: 12/27/2018)
2019-01-159Unopposed MOTION to Stay , MOTION for Extension of Time to in Light of Lapse of Appropriations by U.S. DEPARTMENT OF THE INTERIOR (Attachments: # 1 Text of Proposed Order)(Hudak, Brian) (Entered: 01/15/2019)
2019-01-1710STATUS REPORT by JESSE COLEMAN. (Llewellyn, Patrick) (Entered: 01/17/2019)
2019-01-24MINUTE ORDER granting 9 Motion to Stay: It is hereby ORDERED that this case is stayed until appropriations are restored to the Department of Justice and the Department of Interior. The parties shall file a joint status report within 14 days of appropriations being restored. SO ORDERED. Signed by Judge Rudolph Contreras on January 24, 2019. (lcrc2) (Entered: 01/24/2019)
2019-02-0411NOTICE by U.S. DEPARTMENT OF THE INTERIOR (McBride, Patricia) (Entered: 02/04/2019)
2019-02-05MINUTE ORDER: Upon consideration of 11 Defendant's Notice, it is hereby ORDERED that the parties will submit a joint status report by February 28, 2019. SO ORDERED. Signed by Judge Rudolph Contreras on February 5, 2019. (lcrc2) (Entered: 02/05/2019)
2019-02-05Set/Reset Deadlines: Status Report due by 2/28/2019 (tj) (Entered: 02/05/2019)
2019-02-2812Joint STATUS REPORT by U.S. DEPARTMENT OF THE INTERIOR. (McBride, Patricia) (Entered: 02/28/2019)
2019-03-01MINUTE ORDER: Upon consideration of 12 the parties' Joint Status Report, it is hereby ORDERED that the parties will file another joint status report by March 15, 2019. SO ORDERED. Signed by Judge Rudolph Contreras on March 1, 2019. (lcrc2) (Entered: 03/01/2019)
2019-03-01Set/Reset Deadlines: Status Report due by 3/15/2019 (tj) (Entered: 03/01/2019)
2019-03-1513Joint STATUS REPORT by U.S. DEPARTMENT OF THE INTERIOR. (McBride, Patricia) (Entered: 03/15/2019)
2019-03-15MINUTE ORDER: Upon consideration of 13 the parties' joint status report, it is hereby ORDERED that the parties will file another joint status report by April 18, 2019. SO ORDERED. Signed by Judge Rudolph Contreras on March 15, 2019. (lcrc2) (Entered: 03/15/2019)
Hide Docket Events
by FOIA Project Staff
Skip to toolbar