Skip to content

Case Detail

[Subscribe to updates]
Case TitleFIX THE COURT v. U.S. DEPARTMENT OF JUSTICE
DistrictDistrict of Columbia
CityWashington, DC
Case Number1:2018cv02091
Date Filed2018-09-06
Date ClosedOpen
JudgeJudge Timothy J. Kelly
PlaintiffFIX THE COURT
Case DescriptionFix the Court submitted a FOIA request to the Department of Justice for records concerning correspondence between the Office of Legal Counsel and Brett Kavanaugh from January 2001 to May 2006. Fix the Court also requested expedited processing. The agency acknowledged receipt of the request and subsequently told Fix the Court that its request for expedited processing had been granted. However, after hearing nothing further from the agency, Fix the Court filed suit.
Complaint issues: Failure to respond within statutory time limit, Adequacy - Search, Litigation - Attorney's fees

DefendantU.S. DEPARTMENT OF JUSTICE
Documents
Docket
Complaint
Complaint attachment 1
Complaint attachment 2
Complaint attachment 3
Complaint attachment 4
User-contributed Documents
 
Docket Events (Hide)
Date FiledDoc #Docket Text

2018-09-061COMPLAINT against U.S. DEPARTMENT OF JUSTICE ( Filing fee $ 400 receipt number 0090-5675591) filed by FIX THE COURT. (Attachments: # 1 Civil Cover Sheet, # 2 Summons, # 3 Summons, # 4 Summons)(Evers, Austin) (Entered: 09/06/2018)
2018-09-062LCvR 7.1 CERTIFICATE OF DISCLOSURE of Corporate Affiliations and Financial Interests by FIX THE COURT (Evers, Austin) (Entered: 09/06/2018)
2018-09-063NOTICE of Appearance by Elizabeth France on behalf of FIX THE COURT (France, Elizabeth) (Entered: 09/06/2018)
2018-09-064WITHDRAWN PURSUANT TO NOTICE FILED ON 9/24/2018..... MOTION for Preliminary Injunction by FIX THE COURT (Attachments: # 1 Memorandum in Support Memorandum in Support, # 2 Declaration Declaration of Gabe Roth, # 3 Exhibit Declaration Exhibit A, # 4 Exhibit Declaration Exhibit B)(Evers, Austin); Modified on 9/26/2018 (tth). (Entered: 09/06/2018)
2018-09-06Case Assigned to Judge Timothy J. Kelly. (zsth) (Entered: 09/07/2018)
2018-09-075SUMMONS (3) Issued Electronically as to U.S. DEPARTMENT OF JUSTICE, U.S. Attorney and U.S. Attorney General (Attachments: # 1 Notice and Consent)(zsth) (Entered: 09/07/2018)
2018-09-10MINUTE ORDER: It is hereby ORDERED that Plaintiff shall promptly demonstrate that it has effected service on the federal agency defendant as required under Federal Rule of Civil Procedure 4(i)(2). If Plaintiff has properly served Defendant, it is further ORDERED that the parties shall meet, confer, and file a joint briefing schedule for Plaintiff's 4 Motion for Preliminary Injunction by September 12, 2018. Signed by Judge Timothy J. Kelly on 9/10/2018. (lctjk3) (Entered: 09/10/2018)
2018-09-10Set/Reset Deadlines: Joint Briefing Schedule due by 9/12/2018. (kh) (Entered: 09/10/2018)
2018-09-106RETURN OF SERVICE/AFFIDAVIT of Summons and Complaint Executed as to the United States Attorney. Date of Service Upon United States Attorney on 9/10/2018. ( Answer due for ALL FEDERAL DEFENDANTS by 10/10/2018.), RETURN OF SERVICE/AFFIDAVIT of Summons and Complaint Executed on United States Attorney General. Date of Service Upon United States Attorney General 9/10/2018., RETURN OF SERVICE/AFFIDAVIT of Summons and Complaint Executed. U.S. DEPARTMENT OF JUSTICE served on 9/10/2018 (France, Elizabeth) (Entered: 09/10/2018)
2018-09-127NOTICE of Appearance by Elizabeth J. Shapiro on behalf of U.S. DEPARTMENT OF JUSTICE (Shapiro, Elizabeth) (Entered: 09/12/2018)
2018-09-128NOTICE of Appearance by Laura Ann Hunt on behalf of U.S. DEPARTMENT OF JUSTICE (Hunt, Laura) (Entered: 09/12/2018)
2018-09-129PROPOSED BRIEFING SCHEDULE re Order,, Set Deadlines, by U.S. DEPARTMENT OF JUSTICE. (Hunt, Laura) (Entered: 09/12/2018)
2018-09-13MINUTE ORDER: It is hereby ORDERED that Defendant shall file its opposition to Plaintiff's 4 Motion for Preliminary Injunction by September 17, 2018, and Plaintiff shall file its reply in support of its Motion by September 19, 2018. Signed by Judge Timothy J. Kelly on 9/13/2018. (lctjk3) (Entered: 09/13/2018)
2018-09-1410Joint MOTION to Amend/Correct Order,, Set Deadlines, by U.S. DEPARTMENT OF JUSTICE (Attachments: # 1 Text of Proposed Order)(Hunt, Laura) (Entered: 09/14/2018)
2018-09-15MINUTE ORDER granting 10 Joint Motion to Amend Briefing Schedule. It is hereby ORDERED that Defendant shall file its opposition to Plaintiff's 4 Motion for Preliminary Injunction by September 24, 2018, and Plaintiff shall file its reply in support of its Motion by September 26, 2018. Signed by Judge Timothy J. Kelly on 9/15/2018. (lctjk3) (Entered: 09/15/2018)
2018-09-17MINUTE ORDER: The parties shall meet, confer, and submit a joint filing by September 20, 2018, proposing a date and time for a hearing on Plaintiff's 4 Motion for Preliminary Injunction. Signed by Judge Timothy J. Kelly on 9/17/2018. (lctjk3) (Entered: 09/17/2018)
2018-09-2011Joint STATUS REPORT and Proposed Schedule for Hearing Pursuant to September 17, 2018 Minute Order by U.S. DEPARTMENT OF JUSTICE. (Hunt, Laura) (Entered: 09/20/2018)
2018-09-21MINUTE ORDER: It is hereby ORDERED that the parties shall appear for a hearing on Plaintiff's 4 Motion for Preliminary Injunction on September 28, 2018, at 11:00 a.m. in Courtroom 11. The Court finds that holding the hearing on this date will not prejudice the parties given their joint proposal. See LCvR 65.1(d). Signed by Judge Timothy J. Kelly on 9/21/2018. (lctjk3) (Entered: 09/21/2018)
2018-09-2412Joint STATUS REPORT by FIX THE COURT. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit A)(France, Elizabeth) (Entered: 09/24/2018)
2018-09-24MINUTE ORDER: Upon review of the parties' 12 Joint Status Report, it is hereby ORDERED that, as agreed to by the parties: (1) Defendant shall process 100 documents per week, excluding non-substantive image files (such as logos or signatures); (2) Defendant shall process the records that the Department of Justice's Office of Legal Policy has identified as potentially responsive in the priority order described in an email sent by Plaintiff's counsel to Defendant's counsel on September 21, 2018, at 4:31 p.m.; and (3) Defendant shall promptly begin producing non-exempt, responsive materials and will make further productions as appropriate, consistent with the agreed upon processing schedule, until production is complete. IT IS FURTHER ORDERED that Plaintiff shall promptly file a Notice of Withdrawal of its 4 Motion for Preliminary Injunction, and the parties shall file a joint status report by November 5, 2018. Signed by Judge Timothy J. Kelly on 9/24/2018. (lctjk3) (Entered: 09/24/2018)
2018-09-2413WITHDRAWAL of Motion by FIX THE COURT re 4 MOTION for Preliminary Injunction filed by FIX THE COURT . (France, Elizabeth) (Entered: 09/24/2018)
2018-09-25MINUTE ORDER: In light of Plaintiff's 13 Notice of Withdrawal of Motion for a Preliminary Injunction, the hearing currently scheduled for September 28, 2018, is hereby VACATED. Signed by Judge Timothy J. Kelly on 9/25/2018. (lctjk3) (Entered: 09/25/2018)
Hide Docket Events
by FOIA Project Staff
Skip to toolbar