Skip to content

Case Detail

[Subscribe to updates]
Case TitleHazel v. United States Department of Justice
DistrictNorthern District of Georgia
CityAtlanta
Case Number1:2018cv04094
Date Filed2018-08-28
Date ClosedOpen
JudgeJudge Mark H. Cohen
PlaintiffBobby E. Hazel
Case DescriptionBobby Hazel, a federal prisoner, submitted a FOIA request to the FBI and the Executive Office for U.S. Attorneys for records concerning a videotape related to his trial and conviction. The agencies failed to find the videotape and Hazel filed an administrative appeal to the Office of Information Policy. After hearing nothing further from OIP, Hazel filed suit.
Complaint issues: Failure to respond within statutory time limit, Litigation - Recovery of Costs

DefendantUnited States Department of Justice
Documents
Docket
Complaint
Complaint attachment 1
User-contributed Documents
 
Docket Events (Hide)
Date FiledDoc #Docket Text

2018-08-281COMPLAINT filed by Bobby E. Hazel. (Attachments: # 1 Civil Cover Sheet)(eop) Please visit our website at http://www.gand.uscourts.gov/commonly-used-forms to obtain Pretrial Instructions and Pretrial Associated Forms which includes the Consent To Proceed Before U.S. Magistrate form. (Entered: 08/31/2018)
2018-08-282APPLICATION for Leave to Proceed in Forma Pauperis by Bobby E. Hazel. (eop) (Entered: 08/31/2018)
2018-08-284MOTION to Appoint Counsel by Bobby E. Hazel. (eop) (Entered: 08/31/2018)
2018-08-31Submission of 2 APPLICATION for Leave to Proceed in Forma Pauperis and Frivolity determination, to Magistrate Judge Justin S. Anand. (eop) (Entered: 08/31/2018)
2018-09-195ORDER and FINAL REPORT AND RECOMMENDATION re 1 Complaint. It is RECOMMENDED that leave for Plaintiff to proceed in forma pauperis [Doc. 2] be DENIED and that the instant action be DISMISSED WITHOUT PREJUDICE. Signed by Magistrate Judge Justin S. Anand on 9/19/2018. (btql) (Entered: 09/19/2018)
2018-09-19FINAL REPORT AND RECOMMENDATION recommending that the 2 APPLICATION for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis be DENIED. Ruled on by Magistrate Judge Justin S. Anand on 9/19/2018 in the 5 Final R&R. (btql) (Entered: 09/19/2018)
2018-09-19ORDER DENYING AS MOOT 4 Motion to Appoint Counsel. Ruled on by Magistrate Judge Justin S. Anand on 9/19/2018 in the 5 Final R&R. (btql) (Entered: 09/19/2018)
2018-09-196ORDER for Service of 5 Final Report and Recommendation by Magistrate Judge Justin S. Anand. Each party may file written objections to the Report & Recommendation within 14 days of service. If no objections are filed, the Report & Recommendation may be adopted as the opinion and order of the District Court. Signed by Magistrate Judge Justin S. Anand on 9/19/2018. (btql) (Entered: 09/19/2018)
2018-09-19Clerk's Certificate of Mailing as to Bobby E. Hazel re 6 Order for Service of Report and Recommendation, 5 FINAL REPORT AND RECOMMENDATION. (btql) (Entered: 09/19/2018)
2018-09-277OBJECTIONS to 5 Report and Recommendation filed by Bobby E. Hazel. (bnw) (Entered: 09/28/2018)
2018-10-22Submission of FINAL REPORT AND RECOMMENDATION re 2 APPLICATION for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis filed by Bobby E. Hazel, to District Judge Mark H. Cohen. (bnw) (Entered: 10/22/2018)
Hide Docket Events
by FOIA Project Staff
Skip to toolbar