Skip to content

Case Detail

[Subscribe to updates]
Case TitleSilbaugh v. Department of Transportation et al
DistrictWestern District of Washington
CitySeattle
Case Number2:2018cv01261
Date Filed2018-08-24
Date ClosedOpen
JudgeJudge Ricardo S. Martinez
PlaintiffAlisha R Silbaugh
Case DescriptionAlisha Silbaugh submitted three FOIA requests to the Federal Aviation Administration for records concerning metadata for phone logs. The agency acknowledged receipt of the requests but provided responses that Silbaugh found unsatisfactory. Silbaugh then filed suit.
Complaint issues: Failure to respond within statutory time limit

DefendantDepartment of Transportation DOT
DefendantElaine Chao Secretary of DOT
Documents
Docket
Complaint
User-contributed Documents
 
Docket Events (Hide)
Date FiledDoc #Docket Text

2018-08-241MOTION for Leave to Proceed In Forma Pauperis before Judge Brian A Tsuchida, filed by Alisha R Silbaugh. (Attachments: # 1 Complaint, # 2 Civil Cover Sheet, # 3 Email requesting new case)(CDA) Modified on 8/27/2018 correct typo (CDA). (Entered: 08/27/2018)
2018-08-273ORDER granting Plaintiff's 1 Motion for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis signed by Hon. Brian A Tsuchida. (TH) (cc: Plaintiff via USPS) (Entered: 08/27/2018)
2018-08-274COMPLAINT against All Defendants with JURY DEMAND, filed by Alisha R Silbaugh. (TH) (Entered: 08/27/2018)
2018-08-285NOTICE: Plaintiff Alisha R Silbaugh has registered to electronically file and receive electronic service in this case. (PS) (Entered: 08/28/2018)
2018-08-286LETTER from the Court's Clerks Office re Summons forms. (Attachments: # 1 Summons for the Department of Transportation, # 2 Summons for Elaine Chao) (TH) (Entered: 08/28/2018)
2018-09-077ORDER REGARDING INITIAL DISCLOSURES AND JOINT STATUS REPORT Joint Status Report due by 10/19/2018, FRCP 26f Conference Deadline is 10/5/2018, Initial Disclosure Deadline is 10/12/2018, by Judge Ricardo S. Martinez. (LW) (Entered: 09/07/2018)
2018-09-108Summons Issued as to defendant Department of Transportation. (Clerk sent letter and original summons to Plaintiff via first class mail) (PM) (Entered: 09/10/2018)
2018-09-189SERVICE OF SUMMONS and Complaint returned executed upon defendant Department of Transportation on 9/13/2018. (Silbaugh, Alisha) Modified on 9/19/2018 to indicate defendant and date served (PM). (Entered: 09/18/2018)
2018-09-19NOTICE of Docket Text Modification re 9 Summons Returned Executed: edited text to include name of defendant and date served. (PM) (Entered: 09/19/2018)
Hide Docket Events
by FOIA Project Staff
Skip to toolbar