Skip to content

Case Detail

[Subscribe to updates]
Case TitleJUDICIAL WATCH, INC. v. U.S. DEPARTMENT OF JUSTICE
DistrictDistrict of Columbia
CityWashington, DC
Case Number1:2018cv02107
Date Filed2018-09-10
Date ClosedOpen
JudgeJudge Tanya S. Chutkan
PlaintiffJUDICIAL WATCH, INC.
Case DescriptionJudicial Watch submitted a FOIA request to the FBI for records concerning a series of interviews conducted with Department of Justice attorney Bruce Ohr. The agency acknowledged receipt of the request but after hearing nothing further from the agency, Judicial Watch filed suit.
Complaint issues: Failure to respond within statutory time limit, Adequacy - Search, Litigation - Vaughn index, Litigation - Attorney's fees

DefendantU.S. DEPARTMENT OF JUSTICE
Documents
Docket
Complaint
Complaint attachment 1
Complaint attachment 2
Complaint attachment 3
Complaint attachment 4
User-contributed Documents
 
Docket Events (Hide)
Date FiledDoc #Docket Text

2018-09-101COMPLAINT against U.S. DEPARTMENT OF JUSTICE ( Filing fee $ 400 receipt number 0090-5680988) filed by JUDICIAL WATCH, INC.. (Attachments: # 1 Civil Cover Sheet, # 2 Summons U.S. Attorney for the District of Columbia, # 3 Summons U.S. Attorney General, # 4 Summons U.S. Department of Justice)(Burke, Lauren) (Entered: 09/10/2018)
2018-09-102LCvR 7.1 CERTIFICATE OF DISCLOSURE of Corporate Affiliations and Financial Interests by JUDICIAL WATCH, INC. (Burke, Lauren) (Entered: 09/10/2018)
2018-09-10Case Assigned to Judge Tanya S. Chutkan. (zmd) (Entered: 09/12/2018)
2018-09-133SUMMONS (3) Issued Electronically as to U.S. DEPARTMENT OF JUSTICE, U.S. Attorney and U.S. Attorney General (Attachments: # 1 Notice and Consent) (zmd) (Entered: 09/13/2018)
2018-09-204RETURN OF SERVICE/AFFIDAVIT of Summons and Complaint Executed as to the United States Attorney. Date of Service Upon United States Attorney on 9/18/2018. ( Answer due for ALL FEDERAL DEFENDANTS by 10/18/2018.), RETURN OF SERVICE/AFFIDAVIT of Summons and Complaint Executed on United States Attorney General. Date of Service Upon United States Attorney General 9/18/2018., RETURN OF SERVICE/AFFIDAVIT of Summons and Complaint Executed. U.S. DEPARTMENT OF JUSTICE served on 9/18/2018 (Attachments: # 1 Declaration of Cristina Rotaru)(Peterson, James) (Entered: 09/20/2018)
2018-09-245ENTERED IN ERROR. . . . .RETURN OF SERVICE/AFFIDAVIT of Summons and Complaint Executed as to the United States Attorney. Date of Service Upon United States Attorney on 9/18/2018. ( Answer due for ALL FEDERAL DEFENDANTS by 10/18/2018.), RETURN OF SERVICE/AFFIDAVIT of Summons and Complaint Executed on United States Attorney General. Date of Service Upon United States Attorney General 9/18/2018., RETURN OF SERVICE/AFFIDAVIT of Summons and Complaint Executed. (Attachments: # 1 Declaration of Cristina Rotaru)(Burke, Lauren) Modified on 9/24/2018 (ztd). (Entered: 09/24/2018)
2018-09-24NOTICE OF CORRECTED DOCKET ENTRY: re 5 Summons Returned Executed in FOIA as to U.S. Attorney,,, Summons Returned Executed as to U.S. Attorney General,,, Summons Returned Executed as to Federal Defendant,, was entered in error as it is a duplicate of docket entry 4 .(ztd) (Entered: 09/24/2018)
2018-10-156Unopposed MOTION for Extension of Time to File Answer by U.S. DEPARTMENT OF JUSTICE (Attachments: # 1 Text of Proposed Order)(McBride, Patricia) (Entered: 10/15/2018)
2018-10-17MINUTE ORDER: Granting 6 Unopposed Motion for Extension of Time to Answer. Defendant shall answer or otherwise respond to the complaint by November 7, 2018. Signed by Judge Tanya S. Chutkan on 10/17/18. (DJS) (Entered: 10/17/2018)
2018-10-19Set/Reset Deadlines: Answer due by 11/7/2018. (tb) (Entered: 10/19/2018)
Hide Docket Events
by FOIA Project Staff
Skip to toolbar