Skip to content

Case Detail

[Subscribe to updates]
Case TitleCAUSE OF ACTION INSTITUTE v. UNITED STATES DEPARTMENT OF JUSTICE
DistrictDistrict of Columbia
CityWashington, DC
Case Number1:2018cv02126
Date Filed2018-09-13
Date ClosedOpen
JudgeJudge Tanya S. Chutkan
PlaintiffCAUSE OF ACTION INSTITUTE
Case DescriptionCause of Action Institute submitted three FOIA requests to the Department of Justice's Office of Inspector General for records concerning communications between OIG and Congress pertaining to alleged improper disclosure of tax return information. The agency acknowledged receipt of the requests but after hearing nothing further from the agency, COA filed suit.
Complaint issues: Failure to respond within statutory time limit, Litigation - Attorney's fees

DefendantU.S. DEPARTMENT OF JUSTICE
Documents
Docket
Complaint
Complaint attachment 1
Complaint attachment 2
Complaint attachment 3
Complaint attachment 4
Complaint attachment 5
Complaint attachment 6
Complaint attachment 7
Complaint attachment 8
Complaint attachment 9
Complaint attachment 10
Complaint attachment 11
User-contributed Documents
 
Docket Events (Hide)
Date FiledDoc #Docket Text

2018-09-131COMPLAINT against U.S. DEPARTMENT OF JUSTICE ( Filing fee $ 400 receipt number 0090-5687483) filed by CAUSE OF ACTION INSTITUTE. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit 1, # 2 Exhibit 2, # 3 Exhibit 3, # 4 Exhibit 4, # 5 Exhibit 5, # 6 Exhibit 6, # 7 Exhibit 7, # 8 Civil Cover Sheet, # 9 Summons DOJ, # 10 Summons USAG, # 11 Summons Civil Process Clerk)(Mulvey, Ryan) (Entered: 09/13/2018)
2018-09-132Corporate Disclosure Statement by CAUSE OF ACTION INSTITUTE. (Mulvey, Ryan) (Entered: 09/13/2018)
2018-09-133NOTICE of Appearance by Lee A. Steven on behalf of CAUSE OF ACTION INSTITUTE (Steven, Lee) (Entered: 09/13/2018)
2018-09-17Case Assigned to Judge Tanya S. Chutkan. (zmd) (Entered: 09/17/2018)
2018-09-184SUMMONS (3) Issued Electronically as to U.S. DEPARTMENT OF JUSTICE, U.S. Attorney and U.S. Attorney General (Attachments: # 1 Notice and Consent) (zmd) (Entered: 09/18/2018)
2018-09-255ENTERED IN ERROR.....RETURN OF SERVICE/AFFIDAVIT of Summons and Complaint Executed as to the United States Attorney. Date of Service Upon United States Attorney on 9/20/2018. Answer due for ALL FEDERAL DEFENDANTS by 10/20/2018. (Mulvey, Ryan) Modified on 9/25/2018 (jf). (Entered: 09/25/2018)
2018-09-256RETURN OF SERVICE/AFFIDAVIT of Summons and Complaint Executed as to the United States Attorney. Date of Service Upon United States Attorney on 9/24/2018. Answer due for ALL FEDERAL DEFENDANTS by 10/24/2018. (Mulvey, Ryan) (Entered: 09/25/2018)
2018-09-257RETURN OF SERVICE/AFFIDAVIT of Summons and Complaint Executed on United States Attorney General. Date of Service Upon United States Attorney General 09/20/2018. (Mulvey, Ryan) (Entered: 09/25/2018)
2018-09-258RETURN OF SERVICE/AFFIDAVIT of Summons and Complaint Executed as to U.S. DEPARTMENT OF JUSTICE on 9/24/18 (Mulvey, Ryan) Modified on 9/26/2018 (ztd). (Entered: 09/25/2018)
2018-09-25NOTICE OF CORRECTED DOCKET ENTRY: Document No. re 5 Summons Returned Executed in FOIA as to U.S. Attorney, was entered in error at the request of counsel and refiled with corrected document. (jf) (Entered: 09/25/2018)
2018-10-249NOTICE of Appearance by Daniel Patrick Schaefer on behalf of U.S. DEPARTMENT OF JUSTICE (Schaefer, Daniel) (Entered: 10/24/2018)
2018-10-2410Consent MOTION for Extension of Time to File Answer re 1 Complaint, by U.S. DEPARTMENT OF JUSTICE (Attachments: # 1 Text of Proposed Order)(Schaefer, Daniel) (Entered: 10/24/2018)
2018-10-24MINUTE ORDER: Granting 10 Consent Motion for Extension of Time to Answer. Defendant shall answer or otherwise respond to the complaint by November 21, 2018. Signed by Judge Tanya S. Chutkan on 10/24/18. (DJS) (Entered: 10/24/2018)
2018-10-25Set/Reset Deadlines: Answer due by 11/21/2018. (tb) (Entered: 10/25/2018)
2018-11-2111ANSWER to Complaint by U.S. DEPARTMENT OF JUSTICE. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit 1, # 2 Exhibit 2)(Schaefer, Daniel) (Entered: 11/21/2018)
2018-11-21MINUTE ORDER: MINUTE ORDER: Before the Court in this FOIA case are a complaint and an answer. The requirements of LCvR 16.3 and Rule 26(f) of the Federal Rules of Civil procedure appear to be inapplicable. IT IS HEREBY ORDERED that the parties shall meet and confer and propose a schedule for proceeding in this matter. The schedule shall address the status of Plaintiff's FOIA request, the anticipated number of documents responsive to Plaintiff's FOIA request, the anticipated date(s) for release of the documents requested by Plaintiff, whether a motion for an Open America stay is likely in this case, whether a Vaughn index will be required in this case, whether and when either party anticipates filing a dispositive motion, and any other pertinent issues. The parties shall file a joint status report that addresses these issues and that contains a proposed schedule and proposed order no later than 1/15/19. Signed by Judge Tanya S. Chutkan on 11/21/8. (DJS) (Entered: 11/21/2018)
2018-11-26Set/Reset Deadlines: Joint Status Report due by 1/15/2019. (tb) (Entered: 11/26/2018)
2019-01-1512STATUS REPORT by CAUSE OF ACTION INSTITUTE. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit Nov. 21, 2018 OIG Response)(Mulvey, Ryan) (Entered: 01/15/2019)
2019-01-1513Unopposed MOTION to Stay , Unopposed MOTION for Extension of Time to All Deadlines by U.S. DEPARTMENT OF JUSTICE (Attachments: # 1 Text of Proposed Order)(Pfaffenroth, Peter) (Entered: 01/15/2019)
2019-01-17ORDER granting Unopposed 13 Motion to Stay; granting 13 Unopposed Motion for Extension of Deadlines. This action is hereby STAYED. All pending deadlines are hereby extended for a period of time equal to the calendar day duration of the lapse in appropriations. The parties shall file a joint status report within fourteen (14) calendar days after Congress has appropriated funds for the Department of Justice notifying the parties and the Court that the appropriations lapse has ceased and proposing new deadlines for pending matters consistent with this order. The joint status report shall contain a proposed order. Signed by Judge Tanya S. Chutkan on 1/17/19. (DJS) (Entered: 01/17/2019)
2019-02-0714Joint STATUS REPORT by U.S. DEPARTMENT OF JUSTICE. (Attachments: # 1 Text of Proposed Order)(Schaefer, Daniel) (Entered: 02/07/2019)
2019-02-25MINUTE ORDER: Having considered the parties' joint status report 14 , it is hereby ordered that the parties shall file another joint report, along with a proposed order, by April 9, 2019. Signed by Judge Tanya S. Chutkan on 2/25/19. (DJS) (Entered: 02/25/2019)
2019-02-27Set/Reset Deadlines: Joint Status Report due by 4/9/2019. (tb) (Entered: 02/27/2019)
Hide Docket Events
by FOIA Project Staff
Skip to toolbar