Skip to content

Case Detail

[Subscribe to updates]
Case TitleJUDICIAL WATCH, INC. v. U.S. DEPARTMENT OF ENERGY
DistrictDistrict of Columbia
CityWashington, DC
Case Number1:2018cv02208
Date Filed2018-09-24
Date ClosedOpen
JudgeJudge Rudolph Contreras
PlaintiffJUDICIAL WATCH, INC.
Case DescriptionJudicial Watch submitted a FOIA request to the Department of Energy for communications between the agency and Michael Cohen pertaining to a loan application for the Bellefonte Nuclear Power Plant. The agency acknowledged receipt of the request, but after hearing nothing further from the agency, Judicial Watch filed suit.
Complaint issues: Failure to respond within statutory time limit, Adequacy - Search, Litigation - Vaughn index, Litigation - Attorney's fees

DefendantU.S. DEPARTMENT OF ENERGY
Documents
Docket
Complaint
Complaint attachment 1
Complaint attachment 2
Complaint attachment 3
Complaint attachment 4
User-contributed Documents
 
Docket Events (Hide)
Date FiledDoc #Docket Text

2018-09-241COMPLAINT against U.S. DEPARTMENT OF ENERGY ( Filing fee $ 400 receipt number 0090-5703199) filed by JUDICIAL WATCH, INC.. (Attachments: # 1 Civil Cover Sheet, # 2 Summons U.S. Attorney for the District of Columbia, # 3 Summons U.S. Attorney General, # 4 Summons U.S. Department of Energy)(Peterson, James) (Entered: 09/24/2018)
2018-09-242LCvR 7.1 CERTIFICATE OF DISCLOSURE of Corporate Affiliations and Financial Interests by JUDICIAL WATCH, INC. (Peterson, James) (Entered: 09/24/2018)
2018-09-26Case Assigned to Judge Rudolph Contreras. (zsb) (Entered: 09/26/2018)
2018-09-263SUMMONS (3) Issued Electronically as to U.S. DEPARTMENT OF ENERGY, U.S. Attorney and U.S. Attorney General (Attachment: # 1 Notice and Consent)(zsb) (Entered: 09/26/2018)
2018-10-044RETURN OF SERVICE/AFFIDAVIT of Summons and Complaint Executed as to the United States Attorney. Date of Service Upon United States Attorney on 10/1/2018. ( Answer due for ALL FEDERAL DEFENDANTS by 10/31/2018.), RETURN OF SERVICE/AFFIDAVIT of Summons and Complaint Executed on United States Attorney General. Date of Service Upon United States Attorney General 10/1/2018., RETURN OF SERVICE/AFFIDAVIT of Summons and Complaint Executed. U.S. DEPARTMENT OF ENERGY served on 10/1/2018 (Attachments: # 1 Affidavit of Cristina Rotaru)(Peterson, James) (Entered: 10/04/2018)
2018-10-315NOTICE of Appearance by Scott Leeson Sroka on behalf of All Defendants (Sroka, Scott) (Entered: 10/31/2018)
2018-10-316ANSWER to Complaint by U.S. DEPARTMENT OF ENERGY.(Sroka, Scott) (Entered: 10/31/2018)
2018-10-31MINUTE ORDER: It is hereby ORDERED that the parties shall meet, confer, and jointly submit a proposed briefing schedule by November 14, 2018. SO ORDERED. Signed by Judge Rudolph Contreras on 10/31/2018. (lcrc2) (Entered: 10/31/2018)
2018-11-147Joint STATUS REPORT by U.S. DEPARTMENT OF ENERGY. (Sroka, Scott) (Entered: 11/14/2018)
2018-11-14MINUTE ORDER: Upon consideration of 7 the parties' joint status report, it is hereby ORDERED that the parties shall submit another joint status report by December 14, 2018. SO ORDERED. Signed by Judge Rudolph Contreras on 11/14/2018. (lcrc2) (Entered: 11/14/2018)
2018-11-15Set/Reset Deadlines: Status Report due by 12/14/2018. (tj) (Entered: 11/15/2018)
2018-12-148Joint STATUS REPORT by JUDICIAL WATCH, INC.. (Peterson, James) (Entered: 12/14/2018)
2018-12-14MINUTE ORDER: Upon consideration of 8 the parties' Joint Status Report, it is hereby ORDERED that the parties will file another joint status report by January 31, 2019. SO ORDERED. Signed by Judge Rudolph Contreras on December 14, 2018. (lcrc2) (Entered: 12/14/2018)
2019-01-319Joint STATUS REPORT by U.S. DEPARTMENT OF ENERGY. (Sroka, Scott) (Entered: 01/31/2019)
2019-01-31MINUTE ORDER: Upon consideration of 9 the parties' Joint Status Report, it is hereby ORDERED that the parties shall submit another joint status report by February 21, 2019. SO ORDERED. Signed by Judge Rudolph Contreras on January 31, 2019. (lcrc2) (Entered: 01/31/2019)
2019-02-06Set/Reset Deadlines: Status Report due by 2/21/2019 (tj) (Entered: 02/06/2019)
2019-02-2110Joint STATUS REPORT by JUDICIAL WATCH, INC.. (Peterson, James) (Entered: 02/21/2019)
2019-02-21MINUTE ORDER: Upon consideration of 10 the parties' Joint Status Report, it is hereby ORDERED that that parties will file another joint status report by April 12, 2019. SO ORDERED. Signed by Judge Rudolph Contreras on February 21, 2019. (lcrc2) (Entered: 02/21/2019)
2019-02-27Set/Reset Deadlines: Status Report due by 4/12/2019 (tj) (Entered: 02/27/2019)
Hide Docket Events
by FOIA Project Staff
Skip to toolbar