Skip to content

Case Detail

[Subscribe to updates]
Case TitleCENTER FOR REPRODUCTIVE RIGHTS v. U.S. DEPARTMENT OF STATE
DistrictDistrict of Columbia
CityWashington, DC
Case Number1:2018cv02217
Date Filed2018-09-25
Date ClosedOpen
JudgeJudge Dabney L. Friedrich
PlaintiffCENTER FOR REPRODUCTIVE RIGHTS
Case DescriptionThe Center for Reproductive Rights submitted a FOIA request to the Department of State for records concerning the apparent decision not to include the Reproductive Rights section in the 2017 "Country Reports on Human Rights Practices." The agency acknowledged receipt of the request, but after hearing nothing further from the agency, the Center for Reproductive Rights filed suit.
Complaint issues: Failure to respond within statutory time limit, Adequacy - Search, Litigation - Vaughn index, Litigation - Attorney's fees

DefendantU.S. DEPARTMENT OF STATE
Documents
Docket
Complaint
Complaint attachment 1
Complaint attachment 2
Complaint attachment 3
Complaint attachment 4
Complaint attachment 5
User-contributed Documents
 
Docket Events (Hide)
Date FiledDoc #Docket Text

2018-09-251COMPLAINT against U.S. DEPARTMENT OF STATE ( Filing fee $ 400 receipt number 0090-5704351) filed by CENTER FOR REPRODUCTIVE RIGHTS. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit A, # 2 Exhibit B, # 3 Exhibit C, # 4 Civil Cover Sheet, # 5 Summons)(Miller, Wendy) (Entered: 09/25/2018)
2018-09-26Case Assigned to Judge Dabney L. Friedrich. (zmd) (Entered: 09/26/2018)
2018-09-262SUMMONS (1) Issued Electronically as to U.S. DEPARTMENT OF STATE. (Attachments: # 1 Notice and Consent) (zmd) (Entered: 09/26/2018)
2018-10-153REQUEST FOR SUMMONS TO ISSUE filed by CENTER FOR REPRODUCTIVE RIGHTS.(Miller, Wendy) (Entered: 10/15/2018)
2018-10-154REQUEST FOR SUMMONS TO ISSUE filed by CENTER FOR REPRODUCTIVE RIGHTS.(Miller, Wendy) (Entered: 10/15/2018)
2018-10-155LCvR 26.1 CERTIFICATE OF DISCLOSURE of Corporate Affiliations and Financial Interests by CENTER FOR REPRODUCTIVE RIGHTS (Miller, Wendy) (Entered: 10/15/2018)
2018-10-186SUMMONS (2) Issued Electronically as to U.S. Attorney and U.S. Attorney General (Attachment: # 1 Notice and Consent) (tth) (Entered: 10/18/2018)
2018-10-227RETURN OF SERVICE/AFFIDAVIT of Summons and Complaint Executed. U.S. DEPARTMENT OF STATE served on 10/10/2018 (Miller, Wendy) (Entered: 10/22/2018)
2018-10-238NOTICE of Appearance by Damon William Taaffe on behalf of U.S. DEPARTMENT OF STATE (Taaffe, Damon) (Entered: 10/23/2018)
2018-11-049RETURN OF SERVICE/AFFIDAVIT of Summons and Complaint Executed on United States Attorney General. Date of Service Upon United States Attorney General 10/22/2018. (Miller, Wendy) (Entered: 11/04/2018)
2018-11-0410RETURN OF SERVICE/AFFIDAVIT of Summons and Complaint Executed as to the United States Attorney. Date of Service Upon United States Attorney on 10/22/2018. Answer due for ALL FEDERAL DEFENDANTS by 11/21/2018. (Miller, Wendy) (Entered: 11/04/2018)
2018-11-2011ANSWER to Complaint by U.S. DEPARTMENT OF STATE.(Taaffe, Damon) (Entered: 11/20/2018)
2018-11-21MINUTE ORDER requiring the parties to MEET AND CONFER and file a joint status report proposing a schedule for further proceedings. The parties shall file the joint status report on or before December 11, 2018. Signed by Judge Dabney L. Friedrich on November 21, 2018. (lcdlf1) (Entered: 11/21/2018)
2018-12-1112Joint STATUS REPORT by U.S. DEPARTMENT OF STATE. (Taaffe, Damon) (Entered: 12/11/2018)
2018-12-13MINUTE ORDER adopting the proposal in the parties' 12 Joint Status Report. Accordingly, it is ORDERED that the parties shall file a joint status report on or before March 11, 2019. Signed by Judge Dabney L. Friedrich on December 13, 2019. (lcdlf1) (Entered: 12/13/2018)
2019-02-1413NOTICE OF SUBSTITUTION OF COUNSEL by Christopher Charles Hair on behalf of U.S. DEPARTMENT OF STATE Substituting for attorney Damon Taaffe (Hair, Christopher) (Entered: 02/14/2019)
2019-03-1114STATUS REPORT by U.S. DEPARTMENT OF STATE. (Hair, Christopher) (Entered: 03/11/2019)
2019-03-1115STATUS REPORT by CENTER FOR REPRODUCTIVE RIGHTS. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit A, # 2 Exhibit B, # 3 Exhibit C, # 4 Exhibit D, # 5 Text of Proposed Order)(Miller, Wendy) (Entered: 03/11/2019)
2019-03-11MINUTE ORDER. The Court is in receipt of the defendant's 14 Status Report and the plaintiff's 15 Status Report, which contains a request for relief from the Court. It is ORDERED that the defendant shall file any opposition to the plaintiff's request for relief on or before March 25, 2019. Signed by Judge Dabney L. Friedrich on March 11, 2019. (lcdlf1) (Entered: 03/11/2019)
Hide Docket Events
by FOIA Project Staff
Skip to toolbar