Skip to content

Case Detail

[Subscribe to updates]
Case TitlePUBLIC EMPLOYEES FOR ENVIRONMENTAL RESPONSIBILITY v. U.S. ENVIRONMENTAL PROTECTION AGENCY
DistrictDistrict of Columbia
CityWashington, DC
Case Number1:2018cv02219
Date Filed2018-09-25
Date ClosedOpen
JudgeChief Judge Beryl A. Howell
PlaintiffPUBLIC EMPLOYEES FOR ENVIRONMENTAL RESPONSIBILITY
Case DescriptionPublic Employees for Environmental Responsibility submitted a FOIA request to the EPA for a draft health assessment regarding the possible carcinogenic or other health harms from day-to-day exposure to formaldehyde vapor. The EPA acknowledged receipt of the request and asked PEER to clarify the records it was seeking. PEER did so, but after hearing nothing further from the agency, PEER filed suit.
Complaint issues: Litigation - Attorney's fees, Failure to respond within statutory time limit

DefendantU.S. ENVIRONMENTAL PROTECTION AGENCY
Documents
Docket
Complaint
Complaint attachment 1
Complaint attachment 2
Complaint attachment 3
Complaint attachment 4
Complaint attachment 5
Complaint attachment 6
User-contributed Documents
 
Docket Events (Hide)
Date FiledDoc #Docket Text

2018-09-251COMPLAINT against PUBLIC EMPLOYEES FOR ENVIRONMENTAL RESPONSIBILITY, ENVIRONMENTAL PROTECTION AGENCY ( Filing fee $ 400 receipt number 0090-5704787), CIVIL COVER SHEET by PUBLIC EMPLOYEES FOR ENVIRONMENTAL RESPONSIBILITY filed by PUBLIC EMPLOYEES FOR ENVIRONMENTAL RESPONSIBILITY. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit Ex A - FOIA Request, # 2 Exhibit Ex B - Request for Clarification, # 3 Civil Cover Sheet, # 4 Summons, # 5 Summons, # 6 Summons)(Dinerstein, Paula) (Entered: 09/25/2018)
2018-09-27Case Assigned to Chief Judge Beryl A. Howell. (zsb) (Entered: 09/27/2018)
2018-09-272SUMMONS (3) Issued Electronically as to U.S. ENVIRONMENTAL PROTECTION AGENCY, U.S. Attorney and U.S. Attorney General (Attachment: # 1 Notice and Consent)(zsb) (Entered: 09/27/2018)
2018-09-273STANDING ORDER. Signed by Chief Judge Beryl A. Howell on September 27, 2018. (lcbah1) (Entered: 09/27/2018)
Hide Docket Events
by FOIA Project Staff
Skip to toolbar