Skip to content

Case Detail

[Subscribe to updates]
Case TitleMarin v. Kenna
DistrictSouthern District of New York
CityFoley Square
Case Number1:2018cv08762
Date Filed2018-09-25
Date ClosedOpen
JudgeJudge Andrew L. Carter, Jr
PlaintiffFlorica Marin
Case DescriptionFlorica Marin filed suit against the Francis Kenna, Clerk of the Court for the New York Supreme Court in Queens to force the court to provide her access to files from a wrongful death suit brought against New York City pertaining to her husband. This is not a FOIA claim.
Complaint issues: FOIA not mentioned

DefendantFrancis K. Kenna County Clerk
Documents
Docket
Complaint
User-contributed Documents
 
Docket Events (Hide)
Date FiledDoc #Docket Text

2018-09-251COMPLAINT against Francis K. Kenna. (Filing Fee $ 400.00, Receipt Number 465401218972)Document filed by Florica Marin.(jgo) (Entered: 09/25/2018)
2018-09-252CIVIL COVER SHEET filed. (jgo) (Entered: 09/25/2018)
2018-09-25SUMMONS ISSUED as to Francis K. Kenna. (jgo) (Entered: 09/25/2018)
2018-09-25Magistrate Judge Stewart D. Aaron is so designated. Pursuant to 28 U.S.C. Section 636(c) and Fed. R. Civ. P. 73(b)(1) parties are notified that they may consent to proceed before a United States Magistrate Judge. Parties who wish to consent may access the necessary form at the following link: http://nysd.uscourts.gov/forms.php . (jgo) (Entered: 09/25/2018)
2018-09-25Case Designated ECF. (jgo) (Entered: 09/25/2018)
2018-09-283TRANSFER ORDER: Accordingly, venue lies in the Eastern District of New York, 28 U.S.C. § 1391(b)(2), and this action is transferred to the United States District Court for the Eastern District of New York, 28 U.S.C. § 1406(a). The Clerk of Court is directed to assign this matter to my docket, mail a copy of this order to Plaintiff, and note service on the docket. The Clerk of Court is further directed to transfer this action to the United States District Court for the Eastern District of New York. This order closes this case. The Court certifies, pursuant to 28 U.S.C § 1915(a)(3), that any appeal from this order would not be taken in good faith, and therefore in forma pauperis status is denied for the purpose of an appeal. See Coppedge v. United States, 369 U.S. 438, 444-45 (1962). SO ORDERED. (Signed by Judge Andrew L. Carter, Jr on 9/28/2018) Copies Mailed By Chambers. (rj) Transmission to Docket Assistant Clerk for processing. (Entered: 09/28/2018)
2018-09-28Mailed a copy of 3 Order, to Florica Marin 22-26 Greene Ave Apt 1 Flushing, NY 11385. (aea) (Entered: 09/28/2018)
Hide Docket Events
by FOIA Project Staff
Skip to toolbar