Skip to content

Case Detail

[Subscribe to updates]
Case TitleArab American Action Network v. Department of Homeland Security et al
DistrictNorthern District of Illinois
CityChicago
Case Number1:2018cv06528
Date Filed2018-09-26
Date ClosedOpen
JudgeHonorable John Z. Lee
PlaintiffArab American Action Network
Case DescriptionThe Arab American Action Network submitted FOIA requests to the Department of Homeland Security and the Department of Justice concerning its Countering Violent Extremists program and its operations in Chicago and Illinois. AAAN also requested a fee waiver. DHS acknowledged receipt of the requests and asked for clarification, which AAAN provided. The FBI also acknowledged receipt of the request but told AAAN that a search of its central records system found no responsive records. AAAN filed an administrative appeal of the FBI's no records response. The agency granted the appeal and remanded the request back to the FBI for further searches. After hearing nothing further from either agency, AAAN filed suit.
Complaint issues: Failure to respond within statutory time limit, Adequacy - Search, Public Interest Fee Waiver, Litigation - Attorney's fees

DefendantDepartment of Homeland Security
DefendantDepartment of Justice
DefendantFederal Bureau of Investigation
Documents
Docket
Complaint
Complaint attachment 1
User-contributed Documents
 
Docket Events (Hide)
Date FiledDoc #Docket Text

2018-09-261COMPLAINT filed by Arab American Action Network. Filing fee $ 400, receipt number 0752-14990778. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit A through I)(Wenzloff, Aaron) (Docket Text Modified by Clerks Office) (ew, ). (Entered: 09/26/2018)
2018-09-262CIVIL Cover Sheet (Wenzloff, Aaron) (Entered: 09/26/2018)
2018-09-263ATTORNEY Appearance for Plaintiff Arab American Action Network by Aaron Paul Wenzloff (Wenzloff, Aaron) (Entered: 09/26/2018)
2018-09-26CASE ASSIGNED to the Honorable John Z. Lee. Designated as Magistrate Judge the Honorable Sidney I. Schenkier. (daj, ) (Docket Text Modified by Clerks Office) (ew, ). (Entered: 09/26/2018)
2018-09-264ATTORNEY Appearance for Plaintiff Arab American Action Network by Hanan Erikat Van Dril (Van Dril, Hanan) (Entered: 09/26/2018)
2018-09-26SUMMONS Issued as to Department of Homeland Security, Department of Justice, Federal Bureau of Investigation, U.S. Attorney, and U.S. Attorney General (daj, ) (Entered: 09/26/2018)
2018-09-275NOTICE TO THE PARTIES - The Court is participating in the Mandatory Initial Discovery Pilot (MIDP). The key features and deadlines are set forth in this Notice which includes a link to the (MIDP) Standing Order and a Checklist for use by the parties. In cases subject to the pilot, all parties must respond to the mandatory initial discovery requests set forth in the Standing Order before initiating any further discovery in this case. Please note: The discovery obligations in the Standing Order supersede the disclosures required by Rule 26(a)(1). Any party seeking affirmative relief must serve a copy of the following documents (Notice of Mandatory Initial Discovery and the Standing Order) on each new party when the Complaint, Counterclaim, Crossclaim, or Third-Party Complaint is served. (nsf, ) (Entered: 09/27/2018)
2018-09-286MINUTE entry before the Honorable John Z. Lee: Initial status hearing set for 11/13/18 at 9:00 a.m. Judge Lee participates in the Mandatory Initial Discovery Pilot Project ("Project"). The Project applies to all cases filed on or after June 1, 2017, excluding the following: (1) cases exempted by Rule 26(a)(1)(B), (2) actions brought by a person in the custody of the United States, a state, or a state subdivision, regardless of whether an attorney is recruited, (3) actions under the Private Securities Litigation Reform Act, (4) patent cases governed by the Local Patent Rules, and (5) cases transferred for consolidated administration in the District by the Judicial Panel on Multidistrict Litigation ("Exempt Cases").For all cases to which the Project applies, Judge Lee requires (1) each attorney appearing on behalf of Plaintiff(s) to file a "Certification by Attorney Regarding Discovery Obligations Under Mandatory Initial Discovery Pilot Project" form within 28 days after the filing of the Complaint and (2) each attorney appearing on behalf of Defendant(s) to file the certification form with the Answer. The parties are directed to file a joint initial status report four business days prior to the initial status hearing. The certification form and initial status report requirements are set forth in Judge Lee's standing order regarding the "Mandatory Initial Discovery Pilot Project" available on the Courts website. For all Exempt Cases, the parties are directed to file a joint initial status report four business days prior to the initial status hearing in accordance with the standing order governing "Initial Status Report in Cases Exempt from the Mandatory Initial Discovery Pilot Project" also available on the Court's website. Mailed notice (ca, ) (Entered: 09/28/2018)
2018-10-017CERTIFICATE Certification form regarding MIDP (Van Dril, Hanan) (Entered: 10/01/2018)
2018-10-038SUMMONS Returned Executed by Arab American Action Network as to All Defendants., SUMMONS Returned Executed by Arab American Action Network as to All Defendants on 10/3/2018, answer due 10/24/2018 (Van Dril, Hanan). (Docket text modified by the Clerk's office) Modified on 10/4/2018 (mc, ). (Entered: 10/03/2018)
2018-11-079STATUS Report JOINT INITIAL STATUS REPORT by Arab American Action Network (Van Dril, Hanan) (Entered: 11/07/2018)
2018-11-1310MINUTE entry before the Honorable John Z. Lee:Status hearing held on 11/13/18. The government reports that they are conducting a search for the records requested in the FOIA request and will file their answer on Monday. The Court will not set a MIDP deadline at this time. Status hearing set for 1/22/19 at 9:00 a.m. Mailed notice (ca, ) (Entered: 11/14/2018)
2018-11-1911DESIGNATION of Jimmy Lorenzo Arce as U.S. Attorney for Defendants Department of Homeland Security, Department of Justice, Federal Bureau of Investigation (Arce, Jimmy) (Entered: 11/19/2018)
2018-11-1912MOTION by Defendants Department of Homeland Security, Department of Justice, Federal Bureau of Investigation for extension of time to file answer Defendant's Unopposed Motion to Extend Deadline to File Answer (Arce, Jimmy) (Entered: 11/19/2018)
2018-11-1913NOTICE of Motion by Jimmy Lorenzo Arce for presentment of motion for extension of time to file answer 12 before Honorable John Z. Lee on 11/27/2018 at 09:00 AM. (Arce, Jimmy) (Entered: 11/19/2018)
2018-11-2014MINUTE entry before the Honorable John Z. Lee:The Court grants Defendants' unopposed motion to extend the deadline to file a responsive pleading to Plaintiff's complaint 12 to and including December 3, 2018. No appearance on the motion is necessary.Mailed notice (ca, ) (Entered: 11/20/2018)
2018-12-0315ANSWER to Complaint by Department of Homeland Security, Department of Justice, Federal Bureau of Investigation(Arce, Jimmy) (Entered: 12/03/2018)
2018-12-2616GENERAL ORDER 18-0028 dated 12/26/18: IT IS HEREBY ORDERED, effective December 26, 2018, that all civil litigation involving as a party the United States of America, is immediately suspended, postponed and held in abeyance continuing for a period of fourteen (14) days from the date of entry of this General Order (For Further Details See Attached Order). Signed by the Honorable Ruben Castillo on 12/26/2018: Mailed notice. (rp, ) (Entered: 12/28/2018)
2019-01-0217MINUTE entry before the Honorable John Z. Lee:In light of General Order 18-0028, the Court exercises its discretion to prevent undue prejudice to any litigant during the government shutdown and strikes without prejudice all pending motions, subject to refiling after the suspension of civil litigation in which the United States is involved as a civil litigant has been lifted. In the same vein, the Court also strikes all status hearings, including the 1/22/19 status hearing at 9:00 a.m., which will be reset once the suspension has been lifted. Mailed notice (ca, ) (Entered: 01/02/2019)
2019-01-0818MOTION by Attorney Aaron P. Wenzloff to withdraw as attorney for Arab American Action Network. No party information provided (Wenzloff, Aaron) (Entered: 01/08/2019)
2019-01-0819NOTICE of Motion by Aaron Paul Wenzloff for presentment of motion to withdraw as attorney 18 before Honorable John Z. Lee on 1/15/2019 at 09:00 AM. (Wenzloff, Aaron) (Entered: 01/08/2019)
2019-01-0820AMENDED GENERAL ORDER 18-0028 dated 01/08/2019: On December 26, 2018, General Order 18-0028 was entered. It appearing that the lapse of congressional appropriations funding the federal government continues, therefore General Order 18-0028 is now amended. (For Further Details See Attached Order). Signed by the Honorable Ruben Castillo on 1/8/2019: Mailed notice. (sm, ) (Entered: 01/08/2019)
2019-01-0921MINUTE entry before the Honorable John Z. Lee:Motion to withdraw as attorney 18 is granted. Aaron Paul Wenzloff is granted leave to withdraw as counsel. No appearance is required on the motion.Mailed notice (ca, ) (Entered: 01/09/2019)
2019-01-2822MINUTE entry before the Honorable John Z. Lee:Pursuant to General Order 19-0004 and the lifting of the stay, the Court notes that there are no pending deadlines in this case and sets a status hearing for February 13, 2019 at 9:00 a.m.Mailed notice (ca, ) (Entered: 01/28/2019)
2019-01-2823GENERAL ORDER 19-0004: RESETTING OF DEADLINES IN CIVIL MATTERS INVOLVING THE UNITED STATES AS A PARTY. IT APPEARING THAT as a result of the partial federal government shutdown, this Court amended General Order 18-0028 suspending as of December 21, 2018, all civil litigation in which the United States of America, its agencies, its officers, or employees were parties, with the stated intention of clarifying schedules in such cases upon the expiration of the lapse in appropriations; and IT FURTHER APPEARING THAT appropriations having been restored to fund the Department of Justice and other Executive Branch agencies, with employees beginning to report for work beginning on January 28, 2019; accordingly IT IS THEREFORE ORDERED that the stay entered by General Order 18-0028 is hereby lifted, and any and all deadlines in the affected civil litigation (whether established by order, rule, or agreement.), including but not limited to any scheduled discovery and pleading dates, are extended by 42 days. (For Further Details See Attached Order). Signed by the Honorable Ruben Castillo on 1/28/2019: Mailed notice. (mgw, ) (Entered: 01/28/2019)
2019-02-1124ATTORNEY Appearance for Plaintiff Arab American Action Network by Wallace Bertram Hilke (Hilke, Wallace) (Entered: 02/11/2019)
2019-02-1325MINUTE entry before the Honorable John Z. Lee: Status hearing held on 2/13/19. The government reports that the agency intends to produce responsive documents to Plaintiff by the end of April. This case is stayed. Status hearing set for 4/30/19 at 9:00 am.Mailed notice (ca, ) (Entered: 02/13/2019)
Hide Docket Events
by FOIA Project Staff
Skip to toolbar