Skip to content

Case Detail

[Subscribe to updates]
Case TitleSharks Sports & Entertainment LLC v. Federal Transit Administration et al
DistrictNorthern District of California
CitySan Jose
Case Number5:2018cv05988
Date Filed2018-09-28
Date ClosedOpen
JudgeJudge Lucy H. Koh
PlaintiffSharks Sports & Entertainment LLC
Case DescriptionShark Sports & Entertainment submitted a FOIA request to the Federal Transit Administration for records relating to a light-rail parking lot at San Jose Diridon Station. The agency acknowledged receipt of the request. The agency denied the request based on several exemptions, primarily Exemption 5 (privileges). Shark Sports filed an administrative appeal of the decision, but after hearing nothing further from the agency, Shark Sports filed suit.
Complaint issues: Failure to respond within statutory time limit, Adequacy - Search, Litigation - Vaughn index, Litigation - Attorney's fees

DefendantFederal Transit Administration Region IX Office
DefendantK. Jane Williams in her official capacity as Acting Administrator
DefendantEdward Carranza in his official capacity as Acting Regional Administrator
DefendantElaine L. Chao in her official capacity as Secretary, United States Department of Transportation,
DefendantU.S. Attorney - ND. CA
Documents
Docket
Complaint
Complaint attachment 1
Complaint attachment 2
User-contributed Documents
 
Docket Events (Hide)
Date FiledDoc #Docket Text

2018-09-281COMPLAINT For Injunctive Relief against Edward Carranza, Elaine L. Chao, Federal Transit Administration, K. Jane Williams ( Filing fee $ 400, receipt number 0971-12722257.). Filed bySharks Sports & Entertainment LLC. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit A - D, # 2 Civil Cover Sheet)(Kraus, Edward) (Filed on 9/28/2018) (Entered: 09/28/2018)
2018-09-282Proposed Summons. (Kraus, Edward) (Filed on 9/28/2018) (Entered: 09/28/2018)
2018-10-013Case assigned to Judge Nathanael M. Cousins. Counsel for plaintiff or the removing party is responsible for serving the Complaint or Notice of Removal, Summons and the assigned judge's standing orders and all other new case documents upon the opposing parties. For information, visit E-Filing A New Civil Case at http://cand.uscourts.gov/ecf/caseopening. Standing orders can be downloaded from the court's web page at www.cand.uscourts.gov/judges. Upon receipt, the summons will be issued and returned electronically. Counsel is required to send chambers a copy of the initiating documents pursuant to L.R. 5-1(e)(7). A scheduling order will be sent by Notice of Electronic Filing (NEF) within two business days. Consent/Declination due by 10/15/2018. (srnS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 10/1/2018) (Entered: 10/01/2018)
2018-10-014Initial Case Management Scheduling Order with ADR Deadlines: Case Management Statement due by 12/26/2018. Initial Case Management Conference set for 1/2/2019 10:00 AM in San Jose, Courtroom 7, 4th Floor. (sfbS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 10/1/2018) (Entered: 10/01/2018)
2018-10-015Summons Issued as to Edward Carranza, Elaine L. Chao, Federal Transit Administration, K. Jane Williams. (sfbS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 10/1/2018) (Entered: 10/01/2018)
2018-10-026Certificate of Interested Entities by Sharks Sports & Entertainment LLC identifying Other Affiliate San Jose Sharks, Other Affiliate Hasso Plattner, Other Affiliate Sharks Ice, Other Affiliate San Jose Arena Management, LLC, Other Affiliate Sharks Minor Holdings LLC, Other Affiliate Graywolf LLC, Other Affiliate Russell Trust, Other Affiliate Staedler Family Trust for Sharks Sports & Entertainment LLC. (Kraus, Edward) (Filed on 10/2/2018) (Entered: 10/02/2018)
2018-10-117*Filing Error* CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE by Sharks Sports & Entertainment LLC re 1 Complaint, 5 Summons Issued Alex G. Tse, Acting U.S. Attorney (Kraus, Edward) (Filed on 10/11/2018) Modified on 10/12/2018 (sfbS, COURT STAFF). (Entered: 10/11/2018)
2018-10-118*Filing Error* CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE by Sharks Sports & Entertainment LLC re 1 Complaint, 5 Summons Issued Matthew J. Welbes, FTA (Kraus, Edward) (Filed on 10/11/2018) Modified on 10/12/2018 (sfbS, COURT STAFF). (Entered: 10/11/2018)
2018-10-119*Filing Error* CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE by Sharks Sports & Entertainment LLC re 1 Complaint, 5 Summons Issued Federal Transit Administration; K. Jane Williams; Edward Carranza Jr.; Elaine L. Chao, Jeff Sessions, Attorney General of the United States (Kraus, Edward) (Filed on 10/11/2018) Modified on 10/12/2018 (sfbS, COURT STAFF). (Entered: 10/11/2018)
2018-10-1110CONSENT/DECLINATION to Proceed Before a US Magistrate Judge by Sharks Sports & Entertainment LLC.. (Kraus, Edward) (Filed on 10/11/2018) (Entered: 10/11/2018)
2018-10-1111CLERK'S NOTICE OF IMPENDING REASSIGNMENT TO A U.S. DISTRICT COURT JUDGE: The Clerk of this Court will now randomly reassign this case to a District Judge because a party has not consented to the jurisdiction of a Magistrate Judge. You will be informed by separate notice of the district judge to whom this case is reassigned. ALL HEARING DATES PRESENTLY SCHEDULED BEFORE THE CURRENT MAGISTRATE JUDGE ARE VACATED. This is a text only docket entry; there is no document associated with this notice. (lmh, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 10/11/2018) (Entered: 10/11/2018)
2018-10-1212ORDER REASSIGNING CASE. Case reassigned to Judge Lucy H. Koh for all further proceedings pursuant to Clerk's Notice of Impending Reassignment to a U.S. District Court Judge. This case is assigned to a judge who participates in the Cameras in the Courtroom Pilot Project. See General Order 65 and http://cand.uscourts.gov/cameras. Magistrate Judge Nathanael M. Cousins remains as referral judge assigned to the case. Reassignment Order signed by Executive Committee on 10/12/2018. (Attachments: # 1 Notice of Eligibility for Video Recording) (bwS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 10/12/2018) (Entered: 10/12/2018)
2018-10-1213**CLERK'S NOTICE FOLLOWING CASE REASSIGNMENT TO THE HONORABLE LUCY H. KOH** Following the case reassignment to Hon. Lucy H. Koh, an Initial Case Management Conference is set for 2/13/2019 at 2:00 PM in Courtroom 8, 4th floor, in San Jose, California. A Joint Case Management Conference Statement is due 7 days before the scheduled conference date. See Civil L.R. 16-9 and Civil L.R. 16-10(a). The Court does not issue a revised Initial Case Management Scheduling Order with ADR Deadlines. The parties shall familiarize themselves with the Scheduling Notes and Standing Orders for the Hon. Lucy H. Koh: http://cand.uscourts.gov/lhk. (This is a text only docket entry, there is no document associated with this notice.) (iymS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 10/12/2018) (Entered: 10/12/2018)
2018-10-12Electronic filing error . Incorrect event used. [err101] Please re-file in its entirety. Re-File as Summons Returned Executed. Re: 8 Certificate of Service filed by Sharks Sports & Entertainment LLC, 7 Certificate of Service filed by Sharks Sports & Entertainment LLC, 9 Certificate of Service, filed by Sharks Sports & Entertainment LLC (sfbS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 10/12/2018) (Entered: 10/12/2018)
2018-10-1514SUMMONS Returned Executed (FOIA) by Sharks Sports & Entertainment LLC. U.S. Attorney - ND. CA served on 10/3/2018, answer due 11/2/2018. (Kraus, Edward) (Filed on 10/15/2018) (Entered: 10/15/2018)
2018-10-1515SUMMONS Returned Executed (FOIA) by Sharks Sports & Entertainment LLC. Federal Transit Administration served on 10/3/2018, answer due 11/2/2018. (Supplemental Certificate of Service) (Kraus, Edward) (Filed on 10/15/2018) (Entered: 10/15/2018)
2018-10-1516SUMMONS Returned Executed (FOIA) by Sharks Sports & Entertainment LLC. Edward Carranza served on 10/2/2018, answer due 11/1/2018; Elaine L. Chao served on 10/2/2018, answer due 11/1/2018; Federal Transit Administration served on 10/2/2018, answer due 11/2/2018; K. Jane Williams served on 10/2/2018, answer due 11/1/2018. (Kraus, Edward) (Filed on 10/15/2018) (Entered: 10/15/2018)
2018-10-2217STIPULATION extending time to respond to complaint filed by Edward Carranza, Elaine L. Chao, Federal Transit Administration, K. Jane Williams. (Cormier, Claire) (Filed on 10/22/2018) (Entered: 10/22/2018)
Hide Docket Events
by FOIA Project Staff
Skip to toolbar