Skip to content

Case Detail

[Subscribe to updates]
Case TitleDIALYSIS PATIENT CITIZENS v. U.S.CENTERS FOR MEDICARE AND MEDICAID
DistrictDistrict of Columbia
CityWashington, DC
Case Number1:2018cv02225
Date Filed2018-09-26
Date ClosedOpen
JudgeJudge Tanya S. Chutkan
PlaintiffDIALYSIS PATIENT CITIZENS
Case DescriptionDialysis Patient Citizens submitted a FOIA request to the Centers for Medicare and Medicaid Services for a notice sent to health centers treating end-stage-renal-disease. DPC also requested a fee waiver and expedited processing. The agency acknowledged receipt of the request. The agency denied the request under Exemption 7(A) (ongoing investigation or proceeding). DPC filed an administrative appeal, but after hearing nothing further from the agency, DPC filed suit.
Complaint issues: Failure to respond within statutory time limit, Litigation - Attorney's fees

DefendantU.S. CENTERS FOR MEDICARE AND MEDICAID SERVICES
Documents
Docket
Complaint
Complaint attachment 1
Complaint attachment 2
Complaint attachment 3
Complaint attachment 4
Complaint attachment 5
Complaint attachment 6
Complaint attachment 7
Complaint attachment 8
Complaint attachment 9
Complaint attachment 10
User-contributed Documents
 
Docket Events (Hide)
Date FiledDoc #Docket Text

2018-09-261COMPLAINT FOR DECLARATORY AND INJUNCTIVE RELIEF against U.S. CENTERS FOR MEDICARE AND MEDICAID SERVICES ( Filing fee $ 400 receipt number 0090-5706909) filed by DIALYSIS PATIENT CITIZENS. (Attachments: # 1 Civil Cover Sheet, # 2 Exhibit A, # 3 Exhibit B, # 4 Exhibit C, # 5 Exhibit D, # 6 Exhibit E, # 7 Exhibit F, # 8 Exhibit G, # 9 Exhibit H, # 10 Exhibit I)(Lieder, Michael) (Entered: 09/26/2018)
2018-09-272REQUEST FOR SUMMONS TO ISSUE re 1 Complaint, filed by Dialysis Patient Citizens. Related document: 1 Complaint, filed by Dialysis Patient Citizens.(Lieder, Michael) (Entered: 09/27/2018)
2018-09-27Case Assigned to Judge Tanya S. Chutkan. (zmd) (Entered: 09/27/2018)
2018-09-283SUMMONS (1) Issued Electronically as to U.S. CENTERS FOR MEDICARE AND MEDICAID SERVICES. (Attachments: # 1 Notice and Consent) (zmd) (Entered: 09/28/2018)
Hide Docket Events
by FOIA Project Staff
Skip to toolbar