Skip to content

Case Detail

[Subscribe to updates]
Case TitleFriends of Animals v. United States Fish and Wildlife Service
DistrictDistrict of Colorado
CityDenver
Case Number1:2018cv02520
Date Filed2018-10-02
Date ClosedOpen
JudgeJudge Christine M. Arguello
PlaintiffFriends of Animals
Case DescriptionFriends of Animals submitted a FOIA request to U.S. Fish and Wildlife Service for permits issued to import African elephant trophies from Zimbabwe. The agency acknowledged receipt of the request, but after hearing nothing further from the agency, Friends of Animals filed suit.
Complaint issues: Failure to respond within statutory time limit, Litigation - Attorney's fees

DefendantUnited States Fish and Wildlife Service an agency of the United States
Documents
Docket
Complaint
Complaint attachment 1
Complaint attachment 2
Complaint attachment 3
Complaint attachment 4
User-contributed Documents
 
Docket Events (Hide)
Date FiledDoc #Docket Text

2018-10-021COMPLAINT against United States Fish and Wildlife Service (Filing fee $ 400,Receipt Number 1082-6323942)Attorney Jennifer E. Best added to party Friends of Animals(pty:pla), filed by Friends of Animals. (Attachments: # 1 Civil Cover Sheet, # 2 Summons U.S. Attorney, # 3 Summons U.S. Fish and Wildlife Service, # 4 Summons Attorney General)(Best, Jennifer) (Entered: 10/02/2018)
2018-10-022Case assigned to Judge Christine M. Arguello and drawn to Magistrate Judge Kristen L. Mix. Text Only Entry (dbera, ) (Entered: 10/02/2018)
2018-10-023SUMMONS issued by Clerk. (Attachments: # 1 Summons, # 2 Summons, # 3 Magistrate Judge Consent Form) (dbera, ) (Entered: 10/02/2018)
2018-10-034ORDER REFERRING CASE to Magistrate Judge Kristen L. Mix. Magistrate Judge Mix is designated to conduct NDISPO proceedings pursuant to 28 U.S.C. § 636(b)(1)(A) and (B) and Fed. R. Civ. P. 72(a) and (b). The parties should expect to be given a firm trial setting that is 90 to 120 days from the date of the final pretrial conference, and should be available for trial accordingly. FURTHER, Court-sponsored alternative dispute resolution is governed by D.C.COLO.LCivR 16.6. On the recommendation or informal request of the magistrate judge or on the request of the parties by motion, the Court may direct the parties to engage in an early neutral evaluation, a settlement conference, or another alternative dispute resolution proceeding. SO ORDERED by Judge Christine M. Arguello on 10/3/2018. Text Only Entry (cmasec) (Entered: 10/03/2018)
2018-10-235SUMMONS Returned Executed upon defendant(s) United States Fish and Wildlife Service served on 10/11/2018, answer due 12/10/2018. (Best, Jennifer) (Entered: 10/23/2018)
2018-10-266NOTICE of Entry of Appearance by Chandra Miriam Kurien on behalf of United States Fish and Wildlife ServiceAttorney Chandra Miriam Kurien added to party United States Fish and Wildlife Service(pty:dft) (Kurien, Chandra) (Entered: 10/26/2018)
2018-11-057STIPULATION for Extension of Time to Answer or Respond to the Complaint by Defendant United States Fish and Wildlife Service. United States Fish and Wildlife Service answer due 11/27/2018. (Kurien, Chandra) (Entered: 11/05/2018)
Hide Docket Events
by FOIA Project Staff
Skip to toolbar