Skip to content

Case Detail

[Subscribe to updates]
Case TitleENVIRONMENTAL INTEGRITY PROJECT v. UNITED STATES ENVIRONMENTAL PROTECTION AGENCY
DistrictDistrict of Columbia
CityWashington, DC
Case Number1:2018cv02284
Date Filed2018-10-02
Date ClosedOpen
JudgeJudge Amy Berman Jackson
PlaintiffENVIRONMENTAL INTEGRITY PROJECT
Case DescriptionThe Environmental Integrity Project submitted a FOIA request to the EPA for records concerning the agency's Rule of Law and Core Mission IT investments. The agency acknowledged receipt of the request, but after hearing nothing further from the agency, EIP filed suit.
Complaint issues: Failure to respond within statutory time limit, Litigation - Attorney's fees

DefendantUNITED STATES ENVIRONMENTAL PROTECTION AGENCY
Documents
Docket
Complaint
Complaint attachment 1
Complaint attachment 2
Complaint attachment 3
Complaint attachment 4
Complaint attachment 5
User-contributed Documents
 
Docket Events (Hide)
Date FiledDoc #Docket Text

2018-10-021COMPLAINT against UNITED STATES ENVIRONMENTAL PROTECTION AGENCY ( Filing fee $ 400 receipt number 0090-5717873) filed by ENVIRONMENTAL INTEGRITY PROJECT. (Attachments: # 1 Civil Cover Sheet, # 2 Exhibit Combined A - F, # 3 Summons for US EPA, # 4 Summons for USAO DC, # 5 Summons for US Attorney General)(Lam, Sylvia) (Entered: 10/02/2018)
2018-10-022Corporate Disclosure Statement by ENVIRONMENTAL INTEGRITY PROJECT. (Lam, Sylvia) (Entered: 10/02/2018)
2018-10-04Case Assigned to Judge Amy Berman Jackson. (zmd) (Entered: 10/04/2018)
2018-10-043SUMMONS (3) Issued Electronically as to UNITED STATES ENVIRONMENTAL PROTECTION AGENCY, U.S. Attorney and U.S. Attorney General (Attachments: # 1 Notice and Consent) (zmd) (Entered: 10/04/2018)
2018-10-294RETURN OF SERVICE/AFFIDAVIT of Summons and Complaint Executed. UNITED STATES ENVIRONMENTAL PROTECTION AGENCY served on 10/15/2018 (Attachments: # 1 Certified mail receipt, # 2 Electronic confirmation)(Lam, Sylvia) (Entered: 10/29/2018)
2018-10-295RETURN OF SERVICE/AFFIDAVIT of Summons and Complaint Executed on United States Attorney General. Date of Service Upon United States Attorney General 10/15/2018. (Attachments: # 1 Certified mail receipt, # 2 Electronic confirmation)(Lam, Sylvia) (Entered: 10/29/2018)
2018-10-296RETURN OF SERVICE/AFFIDAVIT of Summons and Complaint Executed as to the United States Attorney. Date of Service Upon United States Attorney on 10/15/2018. Answer due for ALL FEDERAL DEFENDANTS by 11/14/2018. (Attachments: # 1 Certified mail receipt, # 2 Electronic confirmation)(Lam, Sylvia) (Entered: 10/29/2018)
Hide Docket Events
by FOIA Project Staff
Skip to toolbar