Skip to content

Case Detail

[Subscribe to updates]
Case TitleGiffords Law Center to Prevent Gun Violence v. United States Department of Justice et al
DistrictNorthern District of California
CityOakland
Case Number4:2018cv06171
Date Filed2018-10-09
Date ClosedOpen
JudgeMagistrate Judge Donna M. Ryu
PlaintiffGiffords Law Center to Prevent Gun Violence
Case DescriptionThe Giffords Law Center to Prevent Gun Violence submitted FOIA requests to the Department of Justice and the Bureau of Alcohol, Tobacco and Firearms for records concerning communications between the agencies and the NRA and other gun-rights organizations. The Giffords Center also requested inclusion in the news media fee category. After hearing nothing further from the agencies, the Giffords Center filed suit.
Complaint issues: Failure to respond within statutory time limit, Adequacy - Search, Litigation - Vaughn index, Litigation - Attorney's fees

DefendantUnited States Department of Justice
DefendantBureau of Alcohol, Tobacco, Firearms and Explosives
Documents
Docket
Complaint
Complaint attachment 1
User-contributed Documents
 
Docket Events (Hide)
Date FiledDoc #Docket Text

2018-10-091COMPLAINT for Injunctive Relief against All Defendants ( Filing fee $ 400, receipt number 0971-12745469.). Filed byGiffords Law Center to Prevent Gun Violence. (Attachments: # 1 Civil Cover Sheet)(Shearer, Hannah) (Filed on 10/9/2018) (Entered: 10/09/2018)
2018-10-092Proposed Summons. (Shearer, Hannah) (Filed on 10/9/2018) (Entered: 10/09/2018)
2018-10-093Civil Cover Sheet by Giffords Law Center to Prevent Gun Violence (Corrected Civil Cover Sheet) . (Shearer, Hannah) (Filed on 10/9/2018) (Entered: 10/09/2018)
2018-10-094Case assigned to Magistrate Judge Donna M. Ryu. Counsel for plaintiff or the removing party is responsible for serving the Complaint or Notice of Removal, Summons and the assigned judge's standing orders and all other new case documents upon the opposing parties. For information, visit E-Filing A New Civil Case at http://cand.uscourts.gov/ecf/caseopening. Standing orders can be downloaded from the court's web page at www.cand.uscourts.gov/judges. Upon receipt, the summons will be issued and returned electronically. Counsel is required to send chambers a copy of the initiating documents pursuant to L.R. 5-1(e)(7). A scheduling order will be sent by Notice of Electronic Filing (NEF) within two business days. Consent/Declination due by 10/23/2018. (jmlS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 10/9/2018) (Entered: 10/09/2018)
2018-10-095Initial Case Management Scheduling Order with ADR Deadlines: Case Management Statement due by 1/9/2019. Initial Case Management Conference set for 1/16/2019 01:30 PM in Oakland, Courtroom 4, 3rd Floor. (jjbS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 10/9/2018) (Entered: 10/10/2018)
2018-10-106Summons Issued as to Bureau of Alcohol, Tobacco, Firearms and Explosives, United States Department of Justice, U.S. Attorney and U.S. Attorney General (jjbS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 10/10/2018) (Entered: 10/10/2018)
2018-10-117MOTION for leave to appear in Pro Hac Vice ( Filing fee $ 310, receipt number 0971-12753803.) filed by Giffords Law Center to Prevent Gun Violence. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit Certificate of Good Standing)(Shah, Nitin) (Filed on 10/11/2018) (Entered: 10/11/2018)
2018-10-128ORDER by Magistrate Judge Donna M. Ryu granting 7 Nitin Shah's Motion for admission Pro Hac Vice. (ig, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 10/12/2018) (Entered: 10/12/2018)
2018-10-239SUMMONS Returned Executed (FOIA) by Giffords Law Center to Prevent Gun Violence. Bureau of Alcohol, Tobacco, Firearms and Explosives served on 10/15/2018, answer due 11/14/2018; United States Department of Justice served on 10/15/2018, answer due 11/14/2018. (Attachments: # 1 Declaration)(Shah, Nitin) (Filed on 10/23/2018) (Entered: 10/23/2018)
2018-10-2310CONSENT/DECLINATION to Proceed Before a US Magistrate Judge by Giffords Law Center to Prevent Gun Violence.. (Shah, Nitin) (Filed on 10/23/2018) (Entered: 10/23/2018)
2018-11-1411Federal Defendants' ANSWER to Complaint for Injunctive Relief byBureau of Alcohol, Tobacco, Firearms and Explosives, United States Department of Justice. (Wang, Jennifer) (Filed on 11/14/2018) (Entered: 11/14/2018)
Hide Docket Events
by FOIA Project Staff
Skip to toolbar