Skip to content

Case Detail

[Subscribe to updates]
Case TitlePOBLETE TAMARGO LLP v. U.S. DEPARTMENT OF STATE
DistrictDistrict of Columbia
CityWashington, DC
Case Number1:2018cv02335
Date Filed2018-10-10
Date ClosedOpen
JudgeJudge Ketanji Brown Jackson
PlaintiffPOBLETE TAMARGO LLP
Case DescriptionThe law firm of Poblete Tamargo, LLP submitted two FOIA requests to the Department of State for records concerning the government's position on claims against the government of Cuba. The law firm also requested expedited processing. The agency acknowledged receipt of the request and denied the law firm's requests for expedited processing. The law firm made several inquires pertaining to the status of its requests but was told that the requests were still being processed. Poblete Tamargo then filed suit.
Complaint issues: Failure to respond within statutory time limit, Adequacy - Search, Litigation - Vaughn index, Public Interest Fee Waiver, Litigation - Attorney's fees

DefendantU.S. DEPARTMENT OF STATE
Documents
Docket
Complaint
Complaint attachment 1
Complaint attachment 2
Complaint attachment 3
Complaint attachment 4
Complaint attachment 5
Complaint attachment 6
User-contributed Documents
 
Docket Events (Hide)
Date FiledDoc #Docket Text

2018-10-101COMPLAINT against U.S. DEPARTMENT OF STATE ( Filing fee $ 400 receipt number 0090-5729709) filed by POBLETE TAMARGO LLP. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit A, # 2 Exhibit B, # 3 Exhibit C, # 4 Exhibit D, # 5 Civil Cover Sheet, # 6 Summons)(Poblete, Jason) (Entered: 10/10/2018)
2018-10-112ENTERED IN ERROR.....RETURN OF SERVICE/AFFIDAVIT of Summons and Complaint Executed. STATE DEPARTMENT served on 10/10/2018 (Poblete, Jason) Modified on 10/11/2018 (zmd). (Entered: 10/11/2018)
2018-10-11NOTICE OF CORRECTED DOCKET ENTRY: re 2 Summons Returned Executed as to Federal Defendant was entered in error and counsel was instructed file electronically the Return of Service/Affidavit after counsel has confirmation that the summons has been executed on the defendants. (zmd) (Entered: 10/11/2018)
2018-10-11Case Assigned to Judge Ketanji Brown Jackson. (zmd) (Entered: 10/11/2018)
2018-10-12SUMMONS Not Issued as to U.S. DEPARTMENT OF STATE, U.S. Attorney, U.S. Attorney General. (zmd) (Entered: 10/12/2018)
2018-10-123REQUEST FOR SUMMONS TO ISSUE filed by POBLETE TAMARGO LLP. (Attachments: # 1 Summons US Attorney General, # 2 Summons US Attorney (DC))(Poblete, Jason) (Entered: 10/12/2018)
2018-10-164SUMMONS (3) Issued Electronically as to U.S. DEPARTMENT OF STATE, U.S. Attorney and U.S. Attorney General (Attachments: # 1 Notice and Consent) (zmd) (Entered: 10/16/2018)
2018-10-195RETURN OF SERVICE/AFFIDAVIT of Summons and Complaint Executed as to the United States Attorney. Date of Service Upon United States Attorney on 10/16/2018. ( Answer due for ALL FEDERAL DEFENDANTS by 11/15/2018.), RETURN OF SERVICE/AFFIDAVIT of Summons and Complaint Executed. U.S. DEPARTMENT OF STATE served on 10/16/2018, RETURN OF SERVICE/AFFIDAVIT of Summons and Complaint Executed on United States Attorney General. Date of Service Upon United States Attorney General 10/16/2018. (Attachments: # 1 Certificate of Service Dept. of State, # 2 Certificate of Service Attorney General)(Poblete, Jason) (Entered: 10/19/2018)
2018-10-196GENERAL ORDER AND GUIDELINES APPLICABLE TO FOIA CASES ASSIGNED TO JUDGE KETANJI BROWN JACKSON. The Court will hold the parties and counsel responsible for following these directives, and parties and counsel should pay particular attention to the Court's instructions for processing and production of records, batching motions, and filing exhibits. Failure to adhere to this Order may, when appropriate, result the imposition of sanctions and/or sua sponte denial of non-conforming motions. Signed by Judge Ketanji Brown Jackson on 10/19/2018. (lckbj1) (Entered: 10/19/2018)
2018-11-097NOTICE of Appearance by Jeremy S. Simon on behalf of U.S. DEPARTMENT OF STATE (Simon, Jeremy) (Entered: 11/09/2018)
2018-11-098NOTICE of Intention to File Answer by U.S. DEPARTMENT OF STATE (Simon, Jeremy) (Entered: 11/09/2018)
Hide Docket Events
by FOIA Project Staff
Skip to toolbar