Skip to content

Case Detail

[Subscribe to updates]
Case TitleWESTERN VALUES PROJECT et al v. UNITED STATES DEPARTMENT OF THE INTERIOR
DistrictDistrict of Columbia
CityWashington, DC
Case Number1:2018cv02336
Date Filed2018-10-10
Date ClosedOpen
JudgeJudge Christopher R. Cooper
PlaintiffWESTERN VALUES PROJECT
PlaintiffAMERICAN OVERSIGHT
Case DescriptionWestern Values Project submitted FOIA requests to the Department of the Interior for records concerning Secretary Ryan Zinke's compliance with his ethical obligations, including travel expenses. American Oversight also submitted a FOIA request to the Department of the Interior for records concerning communications between the agency and governmental entities in Puerto Rico. The agency acknowledged receipt of the requests, but after hearing nothing further from agency as to any of the requests, Western Values Project and American Oversight filed suit.
Complaint issues: Failure to respond within statutory time limit, Adequacy - Search, Litigation - Attorney's fees

DefendantUNITED STATES DEPARTMENT OF THE INTERIOR
Documents
Docket
Complaint
Complaint attachment 1
Complaint attachment 2
Complaint attachment 3
Complaint attachment 4
Complaint attachment 5
Complaint attachment 6
Complaint attachment 7
Complaint attachment 8
Complaint attachment 9
Complaint attachment 10
Complaint attachment 11
Complaint attachment 12
Complaint attachment 13
Complaint attachment 14
Complaint attachment 15
Complaint attachment 16
Complaint attachment 17
User-contributed Documents
 
Docket Events (Hide)
Date FiledDoc #Docket Text

2018-10-101COMPLAINT against UNITED STATES DEPARTMENT OF THE INTERIOR ( Filing fee $ 400 receipt number 0090-5729755) filed by WESTERN VALUES PROJECT, AMERICAN OVERSIGHT. (Attachments: # 1 Civil Cover Sheet, # 2 Summons USAO, # 3 Summons Attorney General, # 4 Summons DOI, # 5 Exhibit 1, # 6 Exhibit 2, # 7 Exhibit 3, # 8 Exhibit 4, # 9 Exhibit 5, # 10 Exhibit 6, # 11 Exhibit 7, # 12 Exhibit 8, # 13 Exhibit 9, # 14 Exhibit 10, # 15 Exhibit 11, # 16 Exhibit 12, # 17 Exhibit 13)(Wood, Hart) (Entered: 10/10/2018)
2018-10-102LCvR 26.1 CERTIFICATE OF DISCLOSURE of Corporate Affiliations and Financial Interests by AMERICAN OVERSIGHT, WESTERN VALUES PROJECT (Wood, Hart) (Entered: 10/10/2018)
2018-10-11Case Assigned to Judge Christopher R. Cooper. (zmd) (Entered: 10/11/2018)
2018-10-163SUMMONS (3) Issued Electronically as to UNITED STATES DEPARTMENT OF THE INTERIOR, U.S. Attorney and U.S. Attorney General (Attachments: # 1 Notice and Consent) (zmd) (Entered: 10/16/2018)
2018-11-014RETURN OF SERVICE/AFFIDAVIT of Summons and Complaint Executed as to the United States Attorney. Date of Service Upon United States Attorney on 10/16/2018. Answer due for ALL FEDERAL DEFENDANTS by 11/15/2018. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit A)(Wood, Hart) (Entered: 11/01/2018)
Hide Docket Events
by FOIA Project Staff
Skip to toolbar