Skip to content

Case Detail

[Subscribe to updates]
Case TitleSTATE OF NEW JERSEY V. UNITED STATES DEPARTMENT OF INTERIOR
DistrictDistrict of Columbia
CityWashington, DC
Case Number1:2018cv02338
Date Filed2018-10-10
Date ClosedOpen
JudgeJudge Timothy J. Kelly
PlaintiffSTATE OF NEW JERSEY
Case DescriptionThe State of New Jersey submitted a FOIA request to the Department of the Interior for records concerning the agency's decision to allow off-shore drilling on the Atlantic coast but had exempted Florida. New Jersey also requested a fee waiver. The agency acknowledged receipt of the request but after hearing nothing further from the agency, New Jersey filed suit.
Complaint issues: Failure to respond within statutory time limit, Adequacy - Search, Litigation - Vaughn index, Litigation - Attorney's fees

DefendantUNITED STATES DEPARTMENT OF INTERIOR
Documents
Docket
Complaint
Complaint attachment 1
Complaint attachment 2
Complaint attachment 3
User-contributed Documents
 
Docket Events (Hide)
Date FiledDoc #Docket Text

2018-10-101COMPLAINT State of New Jersey against DEPARTMENT OF INTERIOR ( Filing fee $ 400 receipt number 0090-5729826) filed by STATE OF NEW JERSEY. (Attachments: # 1 Civil Cover Sheet, # 2 Summons, # 3 Certificate of Service)(Kinney, Robert) (Entered: 10/10/2018)
2018-10-10Case Assigned to Judge Timothy J. Kelly. (zsb) (Entered: 10/10/2018)
2018-10-102SUMMONS (1) Issued Electronically as to UNITED STATES DEPARTMENT OF INTERIOR. (Attachment: # 1 Notice and Consent)(zsb) (Entered: 10/10/2018)
2018-11-053NOTICE of Appearance by Jennifer Lauren Moriarty on behalf of STATE OF NEW JERSEY (Moriarty, Jennifer) (Entered: 11/05/2018)
2018-11-134NOTICE of Appearance by Joshua M. Kolsky on behalf of UNITED STATES DEPARTMENT OF INTERIOR (Kolsky, Joshua) (Entered: 11/13/2018)
2018-11-135ANSWER to Complaint by UNITED STATES DEPARTMENT OF INTERIOR.(Kolsky, Joshua) (Entered: 11/13/2018)
2018-11-15MINUTE ORDER: Before the Court in this FOIA case is a complaint and an answer. It is hereby ORDERED that the parties shall meet, confer, and file a joint proposed schedule for briefing or disclosure by November 29, 2018. Signed by Judge Timothy J. Kelly on 11/15/2018. (lctjk2) (Entered: 11/15/2018)
2018-11-296Joint STATUS REPORT (Proposed Schedule) by UNITED STATES DEPARTMENT OF INTERIOR. (Kolsky, Joshua) (Entered: 11/29/2018)
2018-11-30MINUTE ORDER: In light of the parties' 6 Joint Status Report, it is hereby ORDERED that the parties shall continue to file joint status reports every 45 days, beginning on January 14, 2019, until further order of the Court. Signed by Judge Timothy J. Kelly on 11/30/2018. (lctjk2) (Entered: 11/30/2018)
2018-12-177NOTICE OF SUBSTITUTION OF COUNSEL by Paul Cirino on behalf of UNITED STATES DEPARTMENT OF INTERIOR Substituting for attorney Joshua M. Kolsky (Cirino, Paul) (Entered: 12/17/2018)
2019-01-118Unopposed MOTION to Stay , Unopposed MOTION for Extension of Time to All Deadlines by UNITED STATES DEPARTMENT OF INTERIOR (Attachments: # 1 Text of Proposed Order)(Pfaffenroth, Peter) (Entered: 01/11/2019)
2019-01-11MINUTE ORDER: It is hereby ORDERED that the deadline set forth in the Court's Minute Order of November 30, 2018, to submit a joint status report by January 14, 2019, is extended to February 11, 2019. Signed by Judge Timothy J. Kelly on 1/11/2019. (lctjk2) (Entered: 01/11/2019)
2019-01-29MINUTE ORDER denying Defendant's 8 Unopposed Motion to Stay. In light of the restoration of funding to the Department of Justice, it is hereby ORDERED that Defendant's motion is DENIED AS MOOT. Signed by Judge Timothy J. Kelly on 1/29/2019. (lctjk2) (Entered: 01/29/2019)
2019-02-119Joint STATUS REPORT by UNITED STATES DEPARTMENT OF INTERIOR. (Cirino, Paul) (Entered: 02/11/2019)
2019-02-11MINUTE ORDER: In light of the parties' 9 Joint Status Report, it is hereby ORDERED that the parties shall file a further joint status report on March 28, 2019, and every 45 days thereafter until the Court orders otherwise. Signed by Judge Timothy J. Kelly on 2/11/2019. (lctjk2) (Entered: 02/11/2019)
2019-03-2810Consent MOTION for Extension of Time to File Joint Status Report by UNITED STATES DEPARTMENT OF INTERIOR (Attachments: # 1 Text of Proposed Order)(Cirino, Paul) (Entered: 03/28/2019)
2019-03-29MINUTE ORDER granting Defendant's 10 Consent Motion for Extension of Time. It is hereby ORDERED, for good cause shown, that Defendant's motion is GRANTED. The deadline for the parties to file their next joint status report is extended to April 4, 2019. Signed by Judge Timothy J. Kelly on 3/29/2019. (lctjk2) (Entered: 03/29/2019)
2019-04-0411Joint STATUS REPORT by UNITED STATES DEPARTMENT OF INTERIOR. (Cirino, Paul) (Entered: 04/04/2019)
2019-04-05MINUTE ORDER: In light of the parties' 11 Joint Status Report, it is hereby ORDERED that the parties shall file a further joint status report on May 20, 2019, and every 45 days thereafter until the Court orders otherwise. Signed by Judge Timothy J. Kelly on 4/5/2019. (lctjk2) (Entered: 04/05/2019)
Hide Docket Events
by FOIA Project Staff
Skip to toolbar