Skip to content

Case Detail

[Subscribe to updates]
Case TitleDEMOCRACY FORWARD FOUNDATION v. UNITED STATES DEPARTMENT OF VETERANS AFFAIRS
DistrictDistrict of Columbia
CityWashington, DC
Case Number1:2018cv02346
Date Filed2018-10-11
Date ClosedOpen
JudgeJudge Trevor N. McFadden
PlaintiffDEMOCRACY FORWARD FOUNDATION
Case DescriptionDemocracy Forward Foundation submitted a FOIA request to the Department of Veterans Affairs for records concerning the role played by non-governmental individuals in top-level decisionmaking at the agency. DFF also requested a fee waiver. The agency acknowledged receipt of the request. The Veterans Health Administration denied DFF's fee waiver request as to the portion of the request to which VHA would respond. After hearing nothing further from the agency, DFF filed suit.
Complaint issues: Failure to respond within statutory time limit, Adequacy - Search, Litigation - Vaughn index, Public Interest Fee Waiver, Litigation - Attorney's fees

DefendantUNITED STATES DEPARTMENT OF VETERANS AFFAIRS
Documents
Docket
Complaint
Complaint attachment 1
Complaint attachment 2
Complaint attachment 3
Complaint attachment 4
Complaint attachment 5
User-contributed Documents
 
Docket Events (Hide)
Date FiledDoc #Docket Text

2018-10-111COMPLAINT against UNITED STATES DEPARTMENT OF VETERANS AFFAIRS ( Filing fee $ 400 receipt number 0090-5732299) filed by DEMOCRACY FORWARD FOUNDATION. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit, # 2 Civil Cover Sheet, # 3 Summons, # 4 Summons, # 5 Summons)(Grogg, Adam) (Attachment 2 replaced on 10/12/2018) (zjd) (Entered: 10/11/2018)
2018-10-112LCvR 26.1 CERTIFICATE OF DISCLOSURE of Corporate Affiliations and Financial Interests by DEMOCRACY FORWARD FOUNDATION (Grogg, Adam) (Main Document 2 replaced on 10/12/2018) (zjd). (Entered: 10/11/2018)
2018-10-12Case Assigned to Judge Colleen Kollar-Kotelly. (zjd) (Entered: 10/12/2018)
2018-10-123SUMMONS (3) Issued Electronically as to UNITED STATES DEPARTMENT OF VETERANS AFFAIRS, U.S. Attorney and U.S. Attorney General. (Attachment: # 1 Notice and Consent)(zjd) (Entered: 10/12/2018)
2018-10-124Case randomly reassigned to Judge Trevor N. McFadden. Judge Colleen Kollar-Kotelly is no longer assigned to the case. (ztnr) (Entered: 10/12/2018)
2018-10-125STANDING ORDER Establishing Procedures for Cases Before Judge Trevor N. McFadden. The parties are hereby ORDERED to read and comply with the directives in the attached standing order. Signed by Judge Trevor N. McFadden on 10/12/2018. (lctnm2) (Entered: 10/12/2018)
2018-10-226RETURN OF SERVICE/AFFIDAVIT of Summons and Complaint Executed as to the United States Attorney. Date of Service Upon United States Attorney on 10/19/2018. ( Answer due for ALL FEDERAL DEFENDANTS by 11/18/2018.), RETURN OF SERVICE/AFFIDAVIT of Summons and Complaint Executed on United States Attorney General., RETURN OF SERVICE/AFFIDAVIT of Summons and Complaint Executed. UNITED STATES DEPARTMENT OF VETERANS AFFAIRS served on 10/17/2018 (Attachments: # 1 Declaration)(Grogg, Adam) (Entered: 10/22/2018)
Hide Docket Events
by FOIA Project Staff
Skip to toolbar