Skip to content

Case Detail

[Subscribe to updates]
Case TitleSatterlee v. Commissioner of Internal Revenue Service et al
DistrictWestern District of Missouri
CitySpringfield
Case Number6:2018cv03337
Date Filed2018-10-12
Date Closed2019-07-25
JudgeDistrict Judge Roseann Ketchmark
PlaintiffRonald Leroy Satterlee
Case DescriptionRonald Satterlee submitted a FOIA request to the IRS for records concerning the agency's legal basis for collecting debts. After hearing nothing further from the agency, Satterlee filed suit.
Complaint issues: Failure to respond within statutory time limit, Litigation - Recovery of Costs

DefendantCommissioner of Internal Revenue Service
DefendantInternal Revenue Service
DefendantFreedom of Information Request
DefendantUS Department of the Treasury
Documents
Docket
Complaint
Complaint attachment 1
Complaint attachment 2
Complaint attachment 3
Complaint attachment 4
Complaint attachment 5
Complaint attachment 6
Complaint attachment 7
Complaint attachment 8
Opinion/Order [34]
User-contributed Documents
 
Docket Events (Hide)
Date FiledDoc #Docket Text

2018-10-121COMPLAINT against Commissioner of Internal Revenue Service, Freedom of Information Request, Internal Revenue Service, US Department of the Treasury Ronald Leroy Satterlee Filing fee $400. Service due by 1/10/2019 unless otherwise directed by the court. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit 1, # 2 Exhibit 2, # 3 Exhibit 3, # 4 Exhibit 4, # 5 Exhibit 5, # 6 Exhibit 6, # 7 Envelope) NEF mailed to Plaintiff. (Keller, Jeanne) (Additional attachment(s) added on 10/16/2018: # 8 Civil Cover Sheet) (Keller, Jeanne). (Entered: 10/12/2018)
2018-10-15RECEIPT number KCMO073487 in the amount of $400.00 issued to Ronald Saterlee. (Woods, Gloria) (Entered: 10/15/2018)
2018-10-152PRO SE PLAINTIFF'S MOTION to Compel Preparation of a Vaughn Index filed by Ronald Leroy Satterlee. Suggestions in opposition/response due by 10/29/2018 unless otherwise directed by the court. (Attachments: # 1 Envelope) NEF mailed to Plaintiff. (Keller, Jeanne) (Entered: 10/16/2018)
2018-10-16SUMMONS ISSUED as to Commissioner of Internal Revenue Service, Freedom of Information Request, Internal Revenue Service, US Department of the Treasury, U.S. Attorney and U.S. Attorney General. Prepared Summonses issued, and returned to Plaintiff via USPS first class mail. NEF mailed to Plaintiff. (Keller, Jeanne) (Entered: 10/16/2018)
2018-10-223NOTICE OF INCLUSION FOR MEDIATION AND ASSESSMENT PROGRAM (MAP). REVIEW NOTICE AND MAP GENERAL ORDER CAREFULLY FOR IMPORTANT CHANGES, DEADLINES AND REQUIREMENTS. Notice of MAP assignment to an outside mediator. (Attachments: # 1 MAP General Order). Notice, General Order, and NEF mailed to Plaintiff via USPS first class mail. (Keller, Jeanne) (Entered: 10/22/2018)
2018-11-134Pro Se CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE by Ronald Leroy Satterlee on behalf of Plaintiff Ronald Leroy Satterlee. (Attachments: # 1 Envelope) NEF mailed to plaintiff. (Furtak, Rebecca) (Entered: 11/14/2018)
2018-11-195ORDER denying Plaintiff's 2 pro se Motion to Compel Preparation of a Vaughn Index: the Motion is DENIED without prejudice to refiling the motion after a defendant has entered an appearance in this case or defaulted. The Court directs the Clerk of the Court to mail a copy of this Order to Plaintiff Ronald Leroy Satterlee via regular mail. Signed on 11/19/2018 by District Judge Roseann Ketchmark. (Phillips, Caleb) Modified on 11/20/2018 (Furtak, Rebecca). Copy of order mailed to Plaintiff Ronald Leroy Satterlee at HC71, PMB 259A, Ava, MO 65608. (Entered: 11/19/2018)
2019-01-156PRO SE MOTION for extension of time to make service of process filed by Ronald Leroy Satterlee. Suggestions in opposition/response due by 1/29/2019 unless otherwise directed by the court. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit, # 2 Envelope). Copy of NEF mailed to plaintiff Satterlee.(Siegert, Karen) (Entered: 01/15/2019)
2019-01-157ORDER granting 6 Plaintiff's Motion for Extension of Time to Serve Defendants. Return of service of all Defendants is due no more than thirty days after the United States Government Shutdown concludes. The Court directs the Clerk of the Court to mail a copy of this Order to Plaintiff via regular mail. Signed on 1/15/2019 by District Judge Roseann Ketchmark. (Stout, Courtney) (Main Document 7 replaced on 1/16/2019 to reflect the Court's directive to the Clerk of Court to return the summons filed with Plaintiff's Motion to Plaintiff via regular mail) (Stout, Courtney). Modified on 1/16/2019 (Stout, Courtney). Modified on 1/17/2019 copy of order and summons mailed to plaintiff Satterlee (Siegert, Karen). (Entered: 01/15/2019)
2019-01-228CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE by Ronald Leroy Satterlee on behalf of Plaintiff Ronald Leroy Satterlee. (Attachments: # 1 Envelope)NEF mailed to defendant.(Furtak, Rebecca) (Entered: 01/22/2019)
2019-01-30SUMMONS REISSUED as to Commissioner of Internal Revenue Service, Internal Revenue Service, US Department of the Treasury, U.S. Attorney, U.S. Attorney General, and U.S. Secretary of The Treasury. Emailed to Plaintiff for service. (Furtak, Rebecca) (Entered: 01/30/2019)
2019-01-31SUMMONS REISSUED as to Internal Revenue Service - Federal Payment Levy Program, and emailed to Plaintiff. (Keller, Jeanne) (Entered: 01/31/2019)
2019-02-079Pro Se CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE by Ronald Leroy Satterlee on behalf of Plaintiff Ronald Leroy Satterlee. (Attachments: # 1 Envelope) NEF mailed to plaintiff.(Furtak, Rebecca) (Entered: 02/07/2019)
2019-03-0610MOTION to dismiss for lack of jurisdiction filed by Catriona Madalyn Coppler on behalf of Freedom of Information Request, Internal Revenue Service. Suggestions in opposition/response due by 3/20/2019 unless otherwise directed by the court. (Attachments: # 1 Memorandum in Support, # 2 Declaration of Denise Higley, # 3 Declaration of Paul Levitan)(Attorney Catriona Madalyn Coppler added to party Freedom of Information Request(pty:dft), Attorney Catriona Madalyn Coppler added to party Internal Revenue Service(pty:dft))(Coppler, Catriona) (Entered: 03/06/2019)
2019-03-0611ANSWER to 1 Complaint,, on behalf of US Department of the Treasury.(Attorney Catriona Madalyn Coppler added to party US Department of the Treasury(pty:dft))(Coppler, Catriona) (Entered: 03/06/2019)
2019-03-0612RULE 16 NOTICE. Proposed scheduling order due by 4/20/2019. Rule 26 conference due by 4/6/2019. The Clerk's Office is directed to mail a copy of this Order to Plaintiff. Signed on 3/6/2019 by District Judge Roseann Ketchmark. (Stout, Courtney) (Entered: 03/06/2019)
2019-03-2113ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE. Plaintiff's show cause response due by 4/4/2019. The Court directs the Clerk of the Court to mail a copy of this Order to Plaintiff. Signed on 3/21/2019 by District Judge Roseann Ketchmark. (Phillips, Caleb) Modified on 3/21/2019 copy of order mailed to pla Ronald Satterlee (Siegert, Karen). (Entered: 03/21/2019)
2019-03-2114PRO SE MOTION to Disregard Fiscal Services Response and Order Full and Complete Compliance with Privacy Act and Federal Regulations Under Which Fiscal Services is Regulated filed by Ronald Leroy Satterlee. Suggestions in opposition/response due by 4/4/2019 unless otherwise directed by the court. (Attachments: # 1 Envelope)(Siegert, Karen) (Entered: 03/21/2019)
2019-03-2115PRO SE MOTION to Compel Preparation of a Vaughn Index filed by Ronald Leroy Satterlee. Suggestions in opposition/response due by 4/4/2019 unless otherwise directed by the court. (Attachments: # 1 Envelope)(Siegert, Karen) (Entered: 03/21/2019)
2019-03-2116PRO SE MOTION to Disregard Defendant's 10 MOTION to Dismiss this Complaint for Injunctive Relief filed by Ronald Leroy Satterlee. Suggestions in opposition/response due by 4/4/2019 unless otherwise directed by the court. (Attachments: # 1 Envelope)(Related document(s) 10 ) (Siegert, Karen) (Entered: 03/21/2019)
2019-03-2117PRO SE SUGGESTIONS in support re 16 MOTION for order to Disregard re 10 MOTION to dismiss for lack of jurisdiction on behalf of Plaintiff Ronald Leroy Satterlee. (Attachments: # 1 Appendix, # 2 Envelope)(Related document(s) 16 ) (Siegert, Karen) (Entered: 03/21/2019)
2019-03-2118PRO SE CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE by Ronald Leroy Satterlee re 17 Suggestions in Support of Motion, 16 MOTION for order to Disregard re 10 MOTION to dismiss for lack of jurisdiction on behalf of Plaintiff Ronald Leroy Satterlee. Related document: 17 Suggestions in Support of Motion, filed by Ronald Leroy Satterlee, 16 MOTION for order to Disregard re 10 MOTION to dismiss for lack of jurisdiction filed by Ronald Leroy Satterlee.(Siegert, Karen) (Entered: 03/21/2019)
2019-04-0219REPLY SUGGESTIONS to motion re 10 MOTION to dismiss for lack of jurisdiction filed by Catriona Madalyn Coppler on behalf of Defendants Freedom of Information Request, Internal Revenue Service. (Related document(s) 16 ) (Coppler, Catriona) Modified on 4/3/2019 clarifying docket text (Siegert, Karen). (Entered: 04/02/2019)
2019-04-0220SUGGESTIONS in opposition re 15 MOTION to compel filed by Catriona Madalyn Coppler on behalf of Defendants Freedom of Information Request, Internal Revenue Service, US Department of the Treasury. Reply suggestions due by 4/16/2019 unless otherwise directed by the court. (Related document(s) 15 ) (Coppler, Catriona) (Entered: 04/02/2019)
2019-04-0221SUGGESTIONS in opposition re 14 MOTION for order to Disregard filed by Catriona Madalyn Coppler on behalf of Defendant US Department of the Treasury. Reply suggestions due by 4/16/2019 unless otherwise directed by the court. (Related document(s) 14 ) (Coppler, Catriona) (Entered: 04/02/2019)
2019-04-0922Pro Se REPLY SUGGESTIONS to motion re 15 MOTION to compel on behalf of Plaintiff Ronald Leroy Satterlee. (Attachments: # 1 Envelope)(Related document(s) 15 ) NEF mailed to Plaintiff.(Furtak, Rebecca) (Entered: 04/09/2019)
2019-04-0923Pro Se REPLY SUGGESTIONS to motion re 14 MOTION for order to Disregard on behalf of Plaintiff Ronald Leroy Satterlee. (Attachments: # 1 Envelope)(Related document(s) 14 ) NEF mailed to Plaintiff.(Furtak, Rebecca) (Entered: 04/09/2019)
2019-04-0924Pro Se SUGGESTIONS in opposition re 10 MOTION to dismiss for lack of jurisdiction on behalf of Plaintiff Ronald Leroy Satterlee. Reply suggestions due by 4/23/2019 unless otherwise directed by the court. (Attachments: # 1 Envelope)(Related document(s) 10 ) NEF mailed to Plaintiff.(Furtak, Rebecca) (Entered: 04/09/2019)
2019-04-1625Joint PROPOSED SCHEDULING ORDER by Internal Revenue Service, US Department of the Treasury. (Attachments: # 1 Certificate of Service)(Coppler, Catriona) (Entered: 04/16/2019)
2019-04-1626SCHEDULING ORDER. The Clerk's Office is directed to mail a copy of this Order to Plaintiff. Signed on 4/16/2019 by District Judge Roseann Ketchmark. (Stout, Courtney) Modified on 4/17/2019 (Furtak, Rebecca). Copy of Order mailed to Ronald Satterlee at HC71, PMB 259A, Ava, MO 65608. (Entered: 04/16/2019)
2019-04-2327REPLY SUGGESTIONS to motion re 10 MOTION to dismiss for lack of jurisdiction filed by Catriona Madalyn Coppler on behalf of Defendants Freedom of Information Request, Internal Revenue Service. (Related document(s) 10 ) (Coppler, Catriona) (Entered: 04/23/2019)
2019-04-2628PRO SE NOTICE of filing Plaintiff's Opposition to Defendants' Reply Suggestion in Support of the Joint Motion to Dismiss by the Internal Revenue Service and Department of the Treasury by Ronald Leroy Satterlee re 27 Reply Suggestions to Motion, (Attachments: # 1 Envelope)(Siegert, Karen) (Entered: 04/26/2019)
2019-05-2429MOTION to dismiss for lack of jurisdiction , or in the Alternative , MOTION for summary judgment filed by Catriona Madalyn Coppler on behalf of US Department of the Treasury. Suggestions in opposition/response due by 6/7/2019 unless otherwise directed by the court. Suggestions in opposition/response due by 6/14/2019 unless otherwise directed by the court. (Coppler, Catriona) (Entered: 05/24/2019)
2019-05-2430SUGGESTIONS in support re 29 MOTION to dismiss for lack of jurisdiction , or in the Alternative MOTION for summary judgment filed by Catriona Madalyn Coppler on behalf of Defendant US Department of the Treasury. (Attachments: # 1 Declaration of Thomas Kobielus, # 2 Exhibit A to the Kobielus Declaration, # 3 Exhibit B to the Kobielus Declaration, # 4 Exhibit C to the Kobielus Declaration)(Related document(s) 29 ) (Coppler, Catriona) (Entered: 05/24/2019)
2019-06-1131ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE. Plaintiff's Show Cause Response due by 6/25/2019. The Clerk's Office is directed to mail a copy of this Order to Plaintiff via regular mail. Signed on 6/11/2019 by District Judge Roseann Ketchmark. (Stout, Courtney) Modified on 6/12/2019 (Furtak, Rebecca). Copy of Order mailed to Plaintiff. (Entered: 06/11/2019)
2019-06-1932PRO SE SUGGESTIONS in opposition re 29 MOTION to dismiss for lack of jurisdiction , or in the Alternative MOTION for summary judgment on behalf of Plaintiff Ronald Leroy Satterlee. Reply suggestions due by 7/3/2019 unless otherwise directed by the court. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit A, # 2 Envelope)(Related document(s) 29 ) NEF mailed to Plaintiff. (Keller, Jeanne) (Entered: 06/19/2019)
2019-07-1233REPLY SUGGESTIONS to motion re 29 MOTION to dismiss for lack of jurisdiction , or in the Alternative MOTION for summary judgment filed by Catriona Madalyn Coppler on behalf of Defendant US Department of the Treasury. (Related document(s) 29 ) (Coppler, Catriona) (Entered: 07/12/2019)
2019-07-2434ORDER granting 29 Defendant's Motion for Summary Judgment. The Clerk's Office is directed to mail a copy of this Order to Plaintiff. Signed on 7/24/2019 by District Judge Roseann Ketchmark. (Stout, Courtney) Modified on 7/25/2019 (Furtak, Rebecca).Copy of Order mailed to Ronal Satterlee at HC71, PMB 259A, Ava, MO 65608. (Entered: 07/24/2019)
2019-07-2535CLERK'S JUDGMENT (Wheeler, LaTandra). The Court directs the Clerk of the Court to mail a copy of this Order to Plaintiff via regular mail. Modified on 7/26/2019 copy of judgment mailed to plaintiff Ronald Satterlee (Siegert, Karen). (Entered: 07/25/2019)
Hide Docket Events
by FOIA Project Staff
Skip to toolbar