Skip to content

Case Detail

[Subscribe to updates]
Case TitleSoutheastern Legal Foundation, Inc. v. United States Department of State
DistrictNorthern District of Georgia
CityAtlanta
Case Number1:2018cv04661
Date Filed2018-10-05
Date ClosedOpen
JudgeJudge Steve C. Jones
PlaintiffSoutheastern Legal Foundation, Inc.
Case DescriptionThe Southeastern Legal Foundation submitted a FOIA request to the Department of State for records concerning extradition requests made under the 1978 Extradition Treaty between the United States and Mexico. SLF also requested a fee waiver. The agency acknowledged receipt of the request but after hearing nothing further from the agency, SLF filed suit.
Complaint issues: Failure to respond within statutory time limit, Litigation - Attorney's fees

DefendantUnited States Department of State
Documents
Docket
Complaint
Complaint attachment 1
Complaint attachment 2
Complaint attachment 3
Complaint attachment 4
User-contributed Documents
 
Docket Events (Hide)
Date FiledDoc #Docket Text

2018-10-051COMPLAINT filed by Southeastern Legal Foundation, Inc.. (Filing fee $400.00, receipt number 113E-8191148) (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit - A, # 2 Exhibit -B, # 3 Exhibit -C, # 4 Civil Cover Sheet)(eop) Please visit our website at http://www.gand.uscourts.gov/commonly-used-forms to obtain Pretrial Instructions and Pretrial Associated Forms which includes the Consent To Proceed Before U.S. Magistrate form. (Entered: 10/10/2018)
2018-10-052Electronic Summons Issued as to United States Department of State, Michael Pompeo. (eop) (Entered: 10/10/2018)
2018-10-053Electronic Summons Issued as to Jeff Sessions. (eop) (Entered: 10/10/2018)
2018-10-054Electronic Summons Issued as to United States Attorney's Office. (eop) (Entered: 10/10/2018)
2018-10-055Certificate of Interested Persons by Southeastern Legal Foundation, Inc.. (eop) (Entered: 10/10/2018)
2018-11-026Return of Service Executed by Southeastern Legal Foundation, Inc.. United States Department of State served on 10/17/2018, answer due 12/17/2018. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit Proof of Service - U.S. Department of State, # 2 Exhibit Proof of Service - U.S. Attorney General, # 3 Exhibit Proof of Service - U.S. Attorney NDGA)(Hermann, Kimberly) (Entered: 11/02/2018)
2018-11-147Unopposed MOTION for Extension of Time to File Answer re 1 Complaint, with Brief In Support by United States Department of State. (Attachments: # 1 Text of Proposed Order)(Manship, Flora) (Entered: 11/14/2018)
2018-11-148ORDER granting 7 Motion for Extension of Time to Answer. Defendant shall have up to and including December 14, 2018, to file its responsive pleading in this case. Signed by Judge Steve C. Jones on 11/14/2018. (rjs) (Entered: 11/14/2018)
Hide Docket Events
by FOIA Project Staff
Skip to toolbar