Skip to content

Case Detail

[Subscribe to updates]
Case TitleCAUSE OF ACTION INSTITUTE v. UNITED STATES DEPARTMENT OF JUSTICE
DistrictDistrict of Columbia
CityWashington, DC
Case Number1:2018cv02373
Date Filed2018-10-15
Date ClosedOpen
JudgeJudge Amy Berman Jackson
PlaintiffCAUSE OF ACTION INSTITUTE
Case DescriptionCause of Action Institute submitted a FOIA request to the Department of Justice for records concerning Executive Order 13,457. The agency acknowledged receipt of the request and various components provided records. The Office of Information Policy located 143 pages. It disclosed 32 pages entirely and 11 pages with redactions labeled "non-responsive. OIP also withheld 71 pages under Exemption 5 (privileges). COA filed an administrative appeal arguing that OIP had improperly separated portions of documents into separate records. OIP denied COA's appeal. COA then filed suit.
Complaint issues: Litigation - Attorney's fees, Agency Record

DefendantUNITED STATES DEPARTMENT OF JUSTICE
Documents
Docket
Complaint
Complaint attachment 1
Complaint attachment 2
Complaint attachment 3
Complaint attachment 4
Complaint attachment 5
Complaint attachment 6
Complaint attachment 7
Complaint attachment 8
Complaint attachment 9
Complaint attachment 10
Complaint attachment 11
Complaint attachment 12
Complaint attachment 13
Complaint attachment 14
User-contributed Documents
 
Docket Events (Hide)
Date FiledDoc #Docket Text

2018-10-151COMPLAINT against UNITED STATES DEPARTMENT OF JUSTICE ( Filing fee $ 400 receipt number 0090-5738133) filed by CAUSE OF ACTION INSTITUTE. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit, # 2 Exhibit, # 3 Exhibit, # 4 Exhibit, # 5 Exhibit, # 6 Exhibit, # 7 Exhibit, # 8 Exhibit, # 9 Exhibit, # 10 Exhibit, # 11 Civil Cover Sheet, # 12 Summons AG, # 13 Summons DOJ, # 14 Summons US Atty)(Valvo, Russel) (Entered: 10/15/2018)
2018-10-152LCvR 26.1 CERTIFICATE OF DISCLOSURE of Corporate Affiliations and Financial Interests by CAUSE OF ACTION INSTITUTE (Valvo, Russel)Modified on 10/17/2018 (zrdj). (Entered: 10/15/2018)
2018-10-153NOTICE of Appearance by Ryan Patrick Mulvey on behalf of CAUSE OF ACTION INSTITUTE (Mulvey, Ryan) (Entered: 10/15/2018)
2018-10-17Case Assigned to Judge Amy Berman Jackson. (zrdj) (Entered: 10/17/2018)
2018-10-174SUMMONS (3) Issued Electronically as to UNITED STATES DEPARTMENT OF JUSTICE, U.S. Attorney and U.S. Attorney General (Attachments: # 1 Notice and Consent)(zrdj) (Entered: 10/17/2018)
2018-10-185ENTERED IN ERROR.....NOTICE of Appearance by Lee A. Steven on behalf of CAUSE OF ACTION INSTITUTE (Steven, Lee) (Main Document 5 replaced on 10/23/2018) (znmw). Modified on 10/23/2018 (znmw). (Entered: 10/18/2018)
2018-10-186NOTICE of Appearance by Lee A. Steven on behalf of CAUSE OF ACTION INSTITUTE (Steven, Lee) (Main Document 6 replaced on 10/23/2018) (znmw). (Entered: 10/18/2018)
2018-10-23NOTICE OF CORRECTED DOCKET ENTRY: Docket Entry 5 Notice of Appearance was entered in error and refiled by counsel as Docket Entry ] 6 Notice of Appearance. (znmw) (Entered: 10/23/2018)
2018-10-257NOTICE of Appearance by Damon William Taaffe on behalf of UNITED STATES DEPARTMENT OF JUSTICE (Taaffe, Damon) (Entered: 10/25/2018)
2018-10-258RETURN OF SERVICE/AFFIDAVIT of Summons and Complaint Executed on United States Attorney General. Date of Service Upon United States Attorney General 10/17/2018. (Steven, Lee) Modified on 10/26/2018 to correct served date (jf). (Entered: 10/25/2018)
2018-10-259RETURN OF SERVICE/AFFIDAVIT of Summons and Complaint Executed as to the United States Attorney. Date of Service Upon United States Attorney on 10/22/2018. Answer due for ALL FEDERAL DEFENDANTS by 11/21/2018. (Steven, Lee) (Entered: 10/25/2018)
2018-10-2510RETURN OF SERVICE/AFFIDAVIT of Summons and Complaint Executed. UNITED STATES DEPARTMENT OF JUSTICE served on 10/22/2018 (Steven, Lee) (Entered: 10/25/2018)
Hide Docket Events
by FOIA Project Staff
Skip to toolbar