Skip to content

Case Detail

[Subscribe to updates]
Case TitleCalista Corporation v. U.S. Department of Health and Human Services
DistrictDistrict of Alaska
CityAnchorage
Case Number3:2018cv00246
Date Filed2018-10-16
Date ClosedOpen
JudgeJohn W. Sedwick
PlaintiffCalista Corporation
Case DescriptionThe Calista Corporation submitted a FOIA request to the Department of Health and Human Services for records concerning grants given by the agency to the Association of Village Counsel Presidents. The agency acknowledged receipt of the request, but denied the request under Exemption 7(A) (ongoing investigation or proceeding). Calista filed an administrative appeal, but after hearing nothing further from the agency, Calista filed suit.
Complaint issues: Failure to respond within statutory time limit, Adequacy - Search, Litigation - Attorney's fees

DefendantU.S. Department of Health and Human Services
Documents
Docket
Complaint
User-contributed Documents
 
Docket Events (Hide)
Date FiledDoc #Docket Text

2018-10-161COMPLAINT for Injunctive and Declaratory Relief against U.S. Department of Health and Human Services (Filing fee $ 400-Receipt #ANC001508), filed by Calista Corporation.(LMH, COURT STAFF) (Entered: 10/17/2018)
2018-10-162Civil Cover Sheet. (LMH, COURT STAFF) (Entered: 10/17/2018)
2018-10-163Corporate Disclosure Statement by Calista Corporation. (LMH, COURT STAFF) (Entered: 10/17/2018)
2018-10-164CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE by Calista Corporation re 3 Corporate Disclosure Statement and 1 Complaint. (LMH, COURT STAFF) (Entered: 10/17/2018)
2018-10-195Unissued summons re Defendant U.S. Department of Health and Human Services. (BJK, COURT STAFF) (Entered: 10/19/2018)
2018-10-19Summons Issued as to U.S. Department of Health and Human Services, U.S. Attorney and U.S. Attorney General.(BJK, COURT STAFF) (Entered: 10/19/2018)
2018-11-086AFFIDAVIT of Service for Complaint served on U.S. Department of Health and Human Services, U.S. Attorney for District of Alaska, and U.S. Attorney General on 10/23/2018, filed by Calista Corporation. (Foster, Laura) (Entered: 11/08/2018)
Hide Docket Events
by FOIA Project Staff
Skip to toolbar