Skip to content

Case Detail

[Subscribe to updates]
Case TitleHutcheson v. United States Customs and Border Protection et al
DistrictWestern District of Michigan
CitySouthern Division
Case Number1:2018cv01172
Date Filed2018-10-16
Date ClosedOpen
JudgeDistrict Judge Paul L. Maloney
PlaintiffEleanor Margaret Hutcheson
Case DescriptionEleanor Hutcheson, a Canadian citizen and lawful permanent resident of the United States, submitted FOIA requests to U.S. Customs and Border Protection and the Department of State for records about herself. She told the agencies that she needed the records to respond to a request for evidence from U.S. Citizenship and Immigration Services. The agencies acknowledged receipt of the requests, but after hearing nothing further from the agency, Hutcheson filed suit.
Complaint issues: Failure to respond within statutory time limit, Litigation - Attorney's fees

DefendantUnited States Customs and Border Protection
DefendantUnited States Department of Homeland Security
DefendantUnited States Department of State
DefendantUnited States Citizenship and Immigration Services
Documents
Docket
Complaint
User-contributed Documents
 
Docket Events (Hide)
Date FiledDoc #Docket Text

2018-10-161COMPLAINT against United States Department of Homeland Security, United States Customs and Border Protection, United States Department of State filed by Eleanor Margaret Hutcheson (Asch, Marc) Modified text on 10/17/2018 (jlg) (Entered: 10/16/2018)
2018-10-16FILING FEE PAID re 1 by plaintiff Eleanor Margaret Hutcheson in the amount of $400, receipt number 0646-4265274 (Asch, Marc) (Entered: 10/16/2018)
2018-10-162PROPOSED SUMMONS to be issued re 1 (Asch, Marc) (Entered: 10/16/2018)
2018-10-183NOTICE that this case has been assigned Paul L. Maloney (mg) (Entered: 10/18/2018)
2018-10-184(DISREGARD) SUMMONS ISSUED as to defendants United States Customs and Border Protection, United States Department of Homeland Security, United States Department of State, U.S. Attorney and U.S. Attorney General (mg) Modified text on 10/25/2018 (mg). (Entered: 10/18/2018)
2018-10-185MOTION to amend/correct 4 summons by plaintiff Eleanor Margaret Hutcheson; (Asch, Marc) (Entered: 10/18/2018)
2018-10-246AMENDED COMPLAINT against All Defendants filed by Eleanor Margaret Hutcheson (Asch, Marc) (Entered: 10/24/2018)
2018-10-247PROPOSED SUMMONS to be issued re 6 (Asch, Marc) (Entered: 10/24/2018)
2018-10-258CORRECTED FIRST AMENDED COMPLAINT against All Defendants filed by Eleanor Margaret Hutcheson (Asch, Marc) (Entered: 10/25/2018)
2018-10-259CORRECTED SUMMONS ISSUED as to defendants United States Citizenship and Immigration Services, United States Customs and Border Protection, United States Department of Homeland Security, United States Department of State, U.S. Attorney and U.S. Attorney General (mg) Modified text on 10/25/2018 (mg). (Entered: 10/25/2018)
2018-11-1010EMERGENCY MOTION for document access by plaintiff Eleanor Margaret Hutcheson; (Asch, Marc) (Entered: 11/10/2018)
2018-11-1011BRIEF in support of EMERGENCY MOTION for document access 10 filed by Eleanor Margaret Hutcheson (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit A, # 2 Exhibit B, # 3 Exhibit C, # 4 Exhibit D, # 5 Exhibit E, # 6 Exhibit F, # 7 Exhibit G, # 8 Exhibit H, # 9 Exhibit I, # 10 Exhibit J) (Asch, Marc) (Entered: 11/10/2018)
2018-11-1012CERTIFICATE regarding compliance with LCivR 7.1(d) re EMERGENCY MOTION for document access 10 filed by Eleanor Margaret Hutcheson (Asch, Marc) (Entered: 11/10/2018)
2018-11-1013CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE by plaintiff Eleanor Margaret Hutcheson re Brief in Support of a Motion, 11 , EMERGENCY MOTION for document access 10 , Certificate Regarding Motion Concurrence 12 (Asch, Marc) (Entered: 11/10/2018)
2018-11-1014CERTIFICATE regarding compliance with LCivR 7.1(d) re EMERGENCY MOTION for document access 10 filed by Eleanor Margaret Hutcheson (Asch, Marc) (Entered: 11/10/2018)
2018-11-1315SUMMONS returned executed on All Defendants, US Attorney and US Attorney General; service upon defendant, All Defendants (Asch, Marc) (Entered: 11/13/2018)
2018-11-1416ORDER; Defendant response due by 12/5/2018; signed by District Judge Paul L. Maloney (Judge Paul L. Maloney, cmc) (Entered: 11/14/2018)
2018-11-1417CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE by plaintiff Eleanor Margaret Hutcheson re Order 16 (Asch, Marc) (Entered: 11/14/2018)
Hide Docket Events
by FOIA Project Staff
Skip to toolbar