Skip to content

Case Detail

[Subscribe to updates]
Case TitleRamirez v. U.S. Department of Justice et al
DistrictWestern District of Texas
CityEl Paso
Case Number3:2018cv00308
Date Filed2018-10-16
Date Closed2019-02-27
JudgeJudge Frank Montalvo
PlaintiffJesus Rene Ramirez
DefendantU.S. Department of Justice
DefendantU.S. Department of Justice Executive Office for U.S. Attorneys
DefendantU.S. Department of Justice U.S. Attorney Office Western District of Texas
DefendantU.S. Department of Justice U.S. Attorney Office Western District of Texas El Paso Division
Documents
Docket
Complaint
Complaint attachment 1
User-contributed Documents
 
Docket Events (Hide)
Date FiledDoc #Docket Text

2018-10-16If ordered by the court, all referrals will be assigned to Magistrate Judge Torres (mn) (Entered: 10/17/2018)
2018-10-161MOTION to Proceed in forma pauperis by Jesus Rene Ramirez. (Attachments: # 1 Supplement, # 2 Civil Cover Sheet)(mn) (Additional attachment(s) added on 10/17/2018: # 3 Complaint for Injuctive Relief) (mn). (Additional attachment(s) added on 10/17/2018: # 4 Exhibit 1-8) (mn). (Entered: 10/17/2018)
2018-10-162Petition to the Court by Jesus Rene Ramirez. (mn) (Entered: 10/17/2018)
2018-11-134NOTICE TO THE COURT by Jesus Rene Ramirez (jg1) (Entered: 11/15/2018)
2018-11-143NOTICE re 1 MOTION to Proceed in forma pauperis (jg1) (Entered: 11/15/2018)
2019-02-275ORDER GRANTING 1 Motion for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis Signed by Judge Frank Montalvo. (jg1) (Entered: 02/28/2019)
2019-02-276COMPLAINT, filed by Jesus Rene Ramirez. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibits)(jg1) (Entered: 02/28/2019)
2019-02-277ORDER DENYING 2 Motion Signed by Judge Frank Montalvo. (jg1) (Entered: 02/28/2019)
2019-02-278FINAL JUDGMENT. Signed by Judge Frank Montalvo. (jg1) (Entered: 02/28/2019)
Hide Docket Events
by FOIA Project Staff
Skip to toolbar