Skip to content

Case Detail

[Subscribe to updates]
Case TitleCAUSE OF ACTION INSTITUTE v. UNITED STATES DEPARTMENT OF COMMERCE
DistrictDistrict of Columbia
CityWashington, DC
Case Number1:2018cv02397
Date Filed2018-10-18
Date ClosedOpen
JudgeJudge James E. Boasberg
PlaintiffCAUSE OF ACTION INSTITUTE
Case DescriptionCause of Action Institute submitted three FOIA requests to the Department of Commerce. The first FOIA request asked for work calendars for Secretary Wilbur Ross and other senior officials. The second FOIA request asked for identifying information for employees or entities involved in reviewing requests for product exclusion from the steel and aluminum tariffs. The third request asked for communications, emails or text messages from 11 identified DOC officials containing a list of keywords. For all three requests, COA asked for a fee waiver. The agency acknowledged receipt of the requests. The agency granted COA's fee waiver request for the first two FOIA requests but did not make a decision as to the third FOIA request. DOC asked COA for clarification as to the scope of the third FOIA request, and COA agreed to a list of search terms proposed by the agency. After hearing nothing further from the agency as to any of the three requests, COA filed suit.
Complaint issues: Failure to respond within statutory time limit, Litigation - Attorney's fees

DefendantDEPARTMENT OF COMMERCE
DefendantUNITED STATES DEPARTMENT OF COMMERCE
Documents
Docket
Complaint
Complaint attachment 1
Complaint attachment 2
Complaint attachment 3
Complaint attachment 4
Complaint attachment 5
Complaint attachment 6
Complaint attachment 7
Complaint attachment 8
Complaint attachment 9
Complaint attachment 10
Complaint attachment 11
Complaint attachment 12
Complaint attachment 13
User-contributed Documents
 
Docket Events (Hide)
Date FiledDoc #Docket Text

2018-10-181COMPLAINT against UNITED STATES DEPARTMENT OF COMMERCE ( Filing fee $ 400 receipt number 0090-5745429) filed by Cause of Action Institute. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit, # 2 Exhibit, # 3 Exhibit, # 4 Exhibit, # 5 Exhibit, # 6 Exhibit, # 7 Exhibit, # 8 Exhibit, # 9 Exhibit, # 10 Civil Cover Sheet, # 11 Summons, # 12 Summons, # 13 Summons)(Valvo, Russel) (Entered: 10/18/2018)
2018-10-182LCvR 26.1 CERTIFICATE OF DISCLOSURE of Corporate Affiliations and Financial Interests by Cause of Action Institute (Valvo, Russel) (Main Document 2 replaced on 10/23/2018) (jf). (Entered: 10/18/2018)
2018-10-183NOTICE of Appearance by Lee A. Steven on behalf of Cause of Action Institute (Steven, Lee) (Entered: 10/18/2018)
2018-10-18Case Assigned to Judge James E. Boasberg. (zmd) (Entered: 10/23/2018)
2018-10-234SUMMONS (3) Issued Electronically as to UNITED STATES DEPARTMENT OF COMMERCE, U.S. Attorney and U.S. Attorney General (Attachments: # 1 Notice and Consent)(jf) (Entered: 10/23/2018)
2018-10-235RETURN OF SERVICE/AFFIDAVIT of Summons and Complaint Executed as to the United States Attorney. Date of Service Upon United States Attorney on 10/23/2018. Answer due for ALL FEDERAL DEFENDANTS by 11/22/2018. (Valvo, Russel) (Entered: 10/23/2018)
2018-10-236RETURN OF SERVICE/AFFIDAVIT of Summons and Complaint Executed on United States Attorney General. Date of Service Upon United States Attorney General 10/23/2018. (Valvo, Russel) (Entered: 10/23/2018)
2018-10-237RETURN OF SERVICE/AFFIDAVIT of Summons and Complaint Executed. UNITED STATES DEPARTMENT OF COMMERCE served on 10/23/2018 (Valvo, Russel) (Entered: 10/23/2018)
Hide Docket Events
by FOIA Project Staff
Skip to toolbar