Skip to content

Case Detail

[Subscribe to updates]
Case TitleGreco et al v. Department of the Air Force of the United States of America, The
DistrictDistrict of Vermont
CityBurlington
Case Number2:2018cv00169
Date Filed2018-10-19
Date ClosedOpen
JudgeJudge Christina Reiss
PlaintiffRosanne Greco
PlaintiffRichard Joseph
PlaintiffJames Leas
Case DescriptionRoseanne Greco, Richard Joseph and James Leas submitted FOIA requests to the Vermont Air National Guard. The request was referred to the Department of the Air Force, but after hearing nothing further from the agency, Greco, Joseph, and Leas filed suit.
Complaint issues: Failure to respond within statutory time limit, Litigation - Recovery of Costs

DefendantDepartment of the Air Force of the United States of America, The
Documents
Docket
Complaint
Complaint attachment 1
Complaint attachment 2
Complaint attachment 3
Complaint attachment 4
Complaint attachment 5
Complaint attachment 6
User-contributed Documents
 
Docket Events (Hide)
Date FiledDoc #Docket Text

2018-10-191COMPLAINT against Department of the Air Force of the United States of America, The filed by Rosanne Greco, Richard Joseph, James Leas.Summonses issued. (Attachments: # 1 Attachment A, # 2 Attachment B, # 3 Attachment C, # 4 Attachment D, # 5 Attachment E, # 6 Civil Cover Sheet) (pac) (Entered: 10/19/2018)
2018-10-292SUMMONS RETURNED Executed. The Department of the Air Force of the United States of America (Secretary of the Air Force) served on 10/29/2018.(Dumont, James) Text clarified on 11/5/2018 (law). (Entered: 10/29/2018)
2018-10-293SUMMONS RETURNED Executed. The Department of the Air Force of the United States of America (U.S. Attorney General).(Dumont, James) (Entered: 10/29/2018)
2018-10-294SUMMONS RETURNED Executed. The Department of the Air Force of the United States of America (Vermont U.S. Attorney) served on 10/19/2018, answer due 12/18/2018 .(Dumont, James) Text clarified on 11/5/2018 (law). (Entered: 10/29/2018)
2018-10-305NOTICE OF DOCKET ENTRY CORRECTION re: 2 Summons Returned Executed. Docket text has been clarified to show The Department of the Air Force of the United States of America served on 10/19/2018, answer due 12/18/2018. (jlh) Date served clarified on 11/5/2018 (law). (Entered: 10/30/2018)
2018-11-056NOTICE OF DOCKET ENTRY CORRECTION re: 4 Summons Returned Executed, 5 Notice of Docket Entry Correction.The docket text of both entries have been clarified to indicate Department of The Air Force of the United States of America was served on 10/ 19 /2018, answer due 12/18/2018. (law) (Entered: 11/05/2018)
Hide Docket Events
by FOIA Project Staff
Skip to toolbar