Skip to content

Case Detail

[Subscribe to updates]
Case TitleDISTRICT OF COLUMBIA v. UNITED STATES IMMIGRATION AND CUSTOMS ENFORCEMENT
DistrictDistrict of Columbia
CityWashington, DC
Case Number1:2018cv02410
Date Filed2018-10-22
Date ClosedOpen
JudgeJudge Tanya S. Chutkan
PlaintiffDISTRICT OF COLUMBIA
Case DescriptionThe District of Columbia submitted a FOIA request to U.S. Immigration and Customs Enforcement for records concerning the agency's detention of 12 D.C. residents in July 2018 and policies related to immigration enforcement actions. The agency acknowledged receipt of the request and invoked a 10-day extension. After hearing nothing further from the agency, the District of Columbia filed suit.
Complaint issues: Failure to respond within statutory time limit, Litigation - Attorney's fees

DefendantUNITED STATES IMMIGRATION AND CUSTOMS ENFORCEMENT
Documents
Docket
Complaint
Complaint attachment 1
Complaint attachment 2
Complaint attachment 3
Complaint attachment 4
Complaint attachment 5
User-contributed Documents
 
Docket Events (Hide)
Date FiledDoc #Docket Text

2018-10-221COMPLAINT against UNITED STATES IMMIGRATION AND CUSTOMS ENFORCEMENT (Fee Status:Filing Fee Waived) filed by DISTRICT OF COLUMBIA. (Attachments: # 1 Civil Cover Sheet, # 2 Summons, # 3 Exhibit A, # 4 Exhibit B, # 5 Exhibit C)(Rock, Jimmy) (Attachment 1 replaced on 10/23/2018) (jf). (Entered: 10/22/2018)
2018-10-22Case Assigned to Judge Tanya S. Chutkan. (zmd) (Entered: 10/23/2018)
2018-10-242SUMMONS (1) Issued Electronically as to UNITED STATES IMMIGRATION AND CUSTOMS ENFORCEMENT. (Attachment: # 1 Notice and Consent)(zjd) (Entered: 10/24/2018)
Hide Docket Events
by FOIA Project Staff
Skip to toolbar