Skip to content

Case Detail

[Subscribe to updates]
Case TitleCENTER FOR PUBLIC INTEGRITY v. U.S. DEPARTMENT OF DEFENSE
DistrictDistrict of Columbia
CityWashington, DC
Case Number1:2018cv02434
Date Filed2018-10-24
Date ClosedOpen
JudgeChief Judge Beryl A. Howell
PlaintiffCENTER FOR PUBLIC INTEGRITY
Case DescriptionThe Center for Public Integrity submitted FOIA requests to the Department of Defense for records concerning Keith Payne and the National Institute for Public Policy. Two requests were for records concerning the 2018 Nuclear Posture Review. The other requests were for records concerning a national security program at Missouri State University. The agency acknowledged receipt of the requests, but after hearing nothing further from the agency, CPI filed suit.
Complaint issues: Failure to respond within statutory time limit, Litigation - Attorney's fees

DefendantU.S. DEPARTMENT OF DEFENSE
Documents
Docket
Complaint
Complaint attachment 1
Complaint attachment 2
Complaint attachment 3
Complaint attachment 4
User-contributed Documents
 
Docket Events (Hide)
Date FiledDoc #Docket Text

2018-10-241COMPLAINT against U.S. DEPARTMENT OF DEFENSE ( Filing fee $ 400 receipt number 0090-5756238) filed by CENTER FOR PUBLIC INTEGRITY. (Attachments: # 1 Civil Cover Sheet, # 2 Summons DoD, # 3 Summons US Atty, # 4 Summons Atty Gen)(Smith, Peter) (Entered: 10/24/2018)
2018-10-242LCvR 26.1 CERTIFICATE OF DISCLOSURE of Corporate Affiliations and Financial Interests by CENTER FOR PUBLIC INTEGRITY (Smith, Peter) (Entered: 10/24/2018)
2018-10-24Case Assigned to Chief Judge Beryl A. Howell. (zsb) (Entered: 10/25/2018)
2018-10-253SUMMONS (3) Issued Electronically as to U.S. DEPARTMENT OF DEFENSE, U.S. Attorney and U.S. Attorney General. (Attachment: # 1 Notice and Consent)(zjd) (Entered: 10/25/2018)
2018-10-254STANDING ORDER. Signed by Chief Judge Beryl A. Howell on October 25, 2018. (lcbah4) (Entered: 10/25/2018)
2018-10-265RETURN OF SERVICE/AFFIDAVIT of Summons and Complaint Executed as to the United States Attorney. Date of Service Upon United States Attorney on 10/26/2018. Answer due for ALL FEDERAL DEFENDANTS by 11/25/2018. (Smith, Peter) (Entered: 10/26/2018)
2018-11-056ENTERED IN ERROR.....RETURN OF SERVICE/AFFIDAVIT of Summons and Complaint Executed. U.S. DEPARTMENT OF DEFENSE served on 10/31/2018, RETURN OF SERVICE/AFFIDAVIT of Summons and Complaint Executed on United States Attorney General. Date of Service Upon United States Attorney General 11/01/2018. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit Return Receipt - DoD, # 2 Exhibit Return Receipt - AttyGen)(Smith, Peter) Modified on 11/9/2018 (zrdj). (Entered: 11/05/2018)
2018-11-09NOTICE OF CORRECTED DOCKET ENTRY: re 6 Summons Returned Executed as to Federal Defendant, Summons Returned Executed as to U.S. Attorney General, was entered in error (Wrong Case number on the document) and counsel is instructed to refile said pleading in the correct case. (zrdj) (Entered: 11/09/2018)
2018-11-097RETURN OF SERVICE/AFFIDAVIT of Summons and Complaint Executed., RETURN OF SERVICE/AFFIDAVIT of Summons and Complaint Executed on United States Attorney General. Date of Service Upon United States Attorney General 11/01/2018. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit Return Receipt - DoD, # 2 Exhibit Return Receipt - Atty Gen)(Smith, Peter) (Entered: 11/09/2018)
Hide Docket Events
by FOIA Project Staff
Skip to toolbar