Skip to content

Case Detail

[Subscribe to updates]
Case TitleFRIENDS OF CEDAR MESA v. U.S. DEPARTMENT OF THE INTERIOR et al
DistrictDistrict of Columbia
CityWashington, DC
Case Number1:2018cv02465
Date Filed2018-10-25
Date ClosedOpen
JudgeJudge Trevor N. McFadden
PlaintiffFRIENDS OF CEDAR MESA
Case DescriptionThe Friends of Cedar Mesa submitted a FOIA request to the Department of the Interior and the Bureau of Land Management for records concerning BLM's March 2018 Competitive Oil and Gas Lease in the Canyon Country District of Utah. Friends also requested expedited processing. The agency acknowledged receipt of the request and denied Friends' request for expedited processing. After hearing nothing further from the agency, Friends filed suit.
Complaint issues: Failure to respond within statutory time limit, Adequacy - Search, Litigation - Attorney's fees

DefendantU.S. DEPARTMENT OF THE INTERIOR a department of the United States
DefendantU.S. DEPARTMENT OF THE INTERIOR
DefendantBUREAU OF LAND MANAGEMENT an agency of the United States
DefendantBUREAU OF LAND MANAGEMENT
Documents
Docket
Complaint
Complaint attachment 1
Complaint attachment 2
Complaint attachment 3
User-contributed Documents
 
Docket Events (Hide)
Date FiledDoc #Docket Text

2018-10-251COMPLAINT against ALL DEFENDANTS ( Filing fee $ 400 receipt number 0090-5759343) filed by FRIENDS OF CEDAR MESA. (Attachments: # 1 Civil Cover Sheet, # 2 Summons DOI, # 3 Summons BLM)(Eubanks, William) (Entered: 10/25/2018)
2018-10-252LCvR 26.1 CERTIFICATE OF DISCLOSURE of Corporate Affiliations and Financial Interests of Plaintiff by FRIENDS OF CEDAR MESA (Eubanks, William) (Entered: 10/25/2018)
2018-10-253MOTION for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice :Attorney Name- Todd C. Tucci, :Firm- Advocates for the West, :Address- PO Box 1612, Boise, ID 83702. Phone No. - (208) 342-7024, x. 202. Filing fee $ 100, receipt number 0090-5759364. Fee Status: Fee Paid. by FRIENDS OF CEDAR MESA (Attachments: # 1 Declaration, # 2 Text of Proposed Order)(Eubanks, William) (Entered: 10/25/2018)
2018-10-254MOTION for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice :Attorney Name- Sarah K. Stellberg, :Firm- Advocates for the West, :Address- PO Box 1612, Boise, ID 83702. Phone No. - (208) 342-7024, x209. Filing fee $ 100, receipt number 0090-5759373. Fee Status: Fee Paid. by FRIENDS OF CEDAR MESA (Attachments: # 1 Declaration, # 2 Text of Proposed Order)(Eubanks, William) (Entered: 10/25/2018)
2018-10-25Case Assigned to Judge Trevor N. McFadden. (zmd) (Entered: 10/26/2018)
2018-10-295STANDING ORDER Establishing Procedures for Cases Before Judge Trevor N. McFadden. The parties are hereby ORDERED to read and comply with the directives in the attached standing order. Signed by Judge Trevor N. McFadden on 10/29/2018. (lctnm2) (Entered: 10/29/2018)
2018-10-29MINUTE ORDER granting 3 Motion for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice; granting 4 Motion for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice. Attorneys Todd C. Tucci and Sarah K. Stellberg shall promptly register for this Court's CM/ECF system. Signed by Judge Trevor N. McFadden on 10/29/2018. (lctnm2) (Entered: 10/29/2018)
2018-10-316SUMMONS (2) Issued Electronically as to BUREAU OF LAND MANAGEMENT, U.S. DEPARTMENT OF THE INTERIOR. (Attachments: # 1 Summons 2nd, # 2 Notice and Consent) (zmd) (Entered: 10/31/2018)
Hide Docket Events
by FOIA Project Staff
Skip to toolbar