Skip to content

Case Detail

[Subscribe to updates]
Case TitleAMERICAN OVERSIGHT v. FEDERAL EMERGENCY MANAGEMENT AGENCY
DistrictDistrict of Columbia
CityWashington, DC
Case Number1:2018cv02470
Date Filed2018-10-26
Date ClosedOpen
JudgeJudge Amit P. Mehta
PlaintiffAMERICAN OVERSIGHT
Case DescriptionAmerican Oversight submitted a FOIA request to the Federal Emergency Management Agency for records concerning the provision of emergency meals for victims of Hurricanes Maria and Irma. American Oversight submitted a second FOIA request to FEMA for records concerning the provision of emergency fuel because of Hurricanes Maria and Irma. American Oversight submitted a third FOIA request to FEMA for records concerning hurricane preparedness assessments for Puerto Rico and the U.S. Virgin Islands. The agency acknowledged receipt of the requests, but after hearing nothing further from the agency, American Oversight filed suit.
Complaint issues: Failure to respond within statutory time limit, Adequacy - Search, Litigation - Vaughn index, Litigation - Attorney's fees

DefendantFEDERAL EMERGENCY MANAGEMENT AGENCY
Documents
Docket
Complaint
Complaint attachment 1
Complaint attachment 2
Complaint attachment 3
Complaint attachment 4
User-contributed Documents
 
Docket Events (Hide)
Date FiledDoc #Docket Text

2018-10-261COMPLAINT against FEDERAL EMERGENCY MANAGEMENT AGENCY ( Filing fee $ 400 receipt number 0090-5760288) filed by AMERICAN OVERSIGHT. (Attachments: # 1 Civil Cover Sheet, # 2 Summons, # 3 Summons, # 4 Summons)(Evers, Austin) (Entered: 10/26/2018)
2018-10-262LCvR 26.1 CERTIFICATE OF DISCLOSURE of Corporate Affiliations and Financial Interests by AMERICAN OVERSIGHT (Evers, Austin) (Entered: 10/26/2018)
2018-10-26Case Assigned to Judge Amit P. Mehta. (zmd) (Entered: 10/26/2018)
2018-10-313SUMMONS (3) Issued Electronically as to FEDERAL EMERGENCY MANAGEMENT AGENCY, U.S. Attorney and U.S. Attorney General (Attachments: # 1 Summons 2nd, # 2 Summons 3rd, # 3 Notice and Consent) (zmd) (Entered: 10/31/2018)
2018-11-024MOTION for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice :Attorney Name- Katherine M. Anthony, :Firm- American Oversight, :Address- 1030 15th St. NW, B255, Washington, DC 20005. Phone No. - (202) 897-3918. Fax No. - (202) 871-6523 Filing fee $ 100, receipt number 0090-5772439. Fee Status: Fee Paid. by AMERICAN OVERSIGHT (Attachments: # 1 Declaration, # 2 Text of Proposed Order)(Evers, Austin) (Entered: 11/02/2018)
2018-11-05MINUTE ORDER granting 4 Motion for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice. Katherine M. Anthony is hereby admitted pro hac vice to appear in this matter on behalf of Plaintiff. Signed by Judge Amit P. Mehta on 11/05/2018. (lcapm1) (Entered: 11/05/2018)
2018-11-135RETURN OF SERVICE/AFFIDAVIT of Summons and Complaint Executed as to the United States Attorney. Date of Service Upon United States Attorney on 11/1/2018. ( Answer due for ALL FEDERAL DEFENDANTS by 12/1/2018.), RETURN OF SERVICE/AFFIDAVIT of Summons and Complaint Executed on United States Attorney General. Date of Service Upon United States Attorney General 11/05/2018., RETURN OF SERVICE/AFFIDAVIT of Summons and Complaint Executed. FEDERAL EMERGENCY MANAGEMENT AGENCY served on 11/5/2018 (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit A)(Anthony, Katherine) (Entered: 11/13/2018)
Hide Docket Events
by FOIA Project Staff
Skip to toolbar